Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-46160

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lisa S Gretchko
Case #: 2:24-ap-04281
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2024
Terminated:Aug 12, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Service Properties Trust
CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY 84 STATE ST
BOSTON, MA 02109
Represented By
Service Properties Trust
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Represented By
Kenneth A. Nathan
Nathan Law, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, August 12, 2024
6 6 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Mon 08/12 3:01 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal and Certificate of Service Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Mon 08/12 3:09 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:24-ap-4281 : Dismissed. (KEC)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Mon 08/12 3:10 PM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-4281 Closed. (KEC)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 08/09 3:01 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 08/07 2:27 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 08/06 3:08 PM
Summons Service Executed on Service Properties Trust 8/6/2024 (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 08/02 6:00 PM
Summons Issued on Service Properties Trust Answer Due 09/3/2024 (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/02 6:00 PM
Adversary case 24-04281 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Kenneth Nathan, Trustee against Service Properties Trust. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]