Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-46160

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lisa S Gretchko
Case #: 2:24-ap-04282
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Shaw Industries Inc
CORPORATION SERVICE COMPANY 84 STATE ST
BOSTON, MA 02109
Represented By
Shaw Industries Inc
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Represented By
Kenneth A. Nathan
Nathan Law, PLC
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, April 10, 2025
11 11 misc Declaration Thu 04/10 2:36 PM
Declaration - Plaintiff's Notice of Election (pursuant to ECF No 863 in Main BK Proceeding Case No. 22-46160 Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
10 10 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Mon 09/30 3:10 PM
Statement of Corporate Ownership Filed by Defendant Shaw Industries Inc Related [+]. (Lerner, David)
Related: [-] 9 Answer to Complaint
9 9 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 09/30 2:07 PM
Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses Filed by Shaw Industries Inc.(Lerner, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Certificate of Service
Friday, August 16, 2024
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Fri 08/16 5:30 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee Related [+]. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-] 7 Stipulated Order
Thursday, August 15, 2024
7 7 order stipulated order Thu 08/15 3:33 PM
Order Extending Time for Shaw Industries Inc to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint Related [+]. (KEC)
Related: [-] 6 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
6 6 misc Stipulation Thu 08/15 12:00 PM
Stipulation By and Between Plaintiff, Kenneth Nathan, Trustee and Defendant Shaw Industries Inc Re: Extending Time for Shaw Industries Inc to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint [to September 30, 2024] . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
5 5 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 08/09 3:02 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 08/07 2:27 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 08/06 3:07 PM
Summons Service Executed on Shaw Industries Inc 8/6/2024 (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Fri 08/02 6:04 PM
Summons Issued on Shaw Industries Inc Answer Due 09/3/2024 (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Fri 08/02 6:04 PM
Adversary case 24-04282 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Kenneth Nathan, Trustee against Shaw Industries Inc. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Nathan, Kenneth)
Related: [-]