Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-46160

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lisa S Gretchko
Case #: 2:24-ap-04300
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Aug 05, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Almighty Waste, Inc.
Represented By
Almighty Waste, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Nathan
Represented By
David P. Miller
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info
Jeffrey H. Bigelman
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/30/2025 1:08 PM EDT
Monday, October 28, 2024
15 15 answer Answer to Complaint Mon 10/28 5:08 PM
Answer to Complaint and Affirmative Defenses Filed by Almighty Waste, Inc..(Lerner, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Cert of Service
Friday, October 18, 2024
court Minute Entry. Motion Withdrawn Fri 10/18 12:31 PM
Minute Entry. Motion Withdrawn. Related [+] (London, Cheryl)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan
Sunday, October 13, 2024
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 10/14 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/13/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 BNC Certificate of Mailing
Friday, October 11, 2024
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (DETROIT CASE ONLY) Fri 10/11 11:26 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing to Defendant's Attorney, Daniel L. Cummings P.O. Box 4600 2 Canal Plaza, Portland, ME 04112-4600. Related [+] (nlt)
Related: [-] 12 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Thursday, October 10, 2024
12 12 order Default Judgment Thu 10/10 5:22 PM
Stipulated Order (1) Withdrawing Trustee's Motion for Default Judgment, (2) Cancelling October 18, 2024 Hearing Regarding Trustee's Motion for Default Judgment, (3) Setting Aside Clerk's Entry of Default, and (4) Extending Time for Almighty Waste, Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint Related [+]. (Clark, J)
Related: [-] 9 11 Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Daniel L. Cummings Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order (1) Withdrawing Trustee's Motion for Default Judgment, (2) Cancelling Hearing Regarding Trustee's Motion for Default, (3) Setting Aside Clerk's Entry of Default, and (4) Extending Time for Almighty Waste, Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint
11 11 misc Stipulation Thu 10/10 10:54 AM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Daniel L. Cummings Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order (1) Withdrawing Trustee's Motion for Default Judgment, (2) Cancelling Hearing Regarding Trustee's Motion for Default, (3) Setting Aside Clerk's Entry of Default, and (4) Extending Time for Almighty Waste, Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
10 10 court Notice of Hearing (AP) Wed 10/02 2:09 PM
Notice of In-Person Hearing . Related [+] Hearing to be held on 10/18/2024 at 01:00 PM Courtroom 1975, 211 W. Fort St. for9 , (London, Cheryl)
Related: [-] 9 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
9 9 motion Default Judgment Tue 09/24 3:04 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendant Almighty Waste, Inc. Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit C
Thursday, September 12, 2024
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 09/13 12:33 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 09/12/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Clerk's Entry of Default
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
7 7 court Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 09/10 1:07 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default of Almighty Waste, Inc. - Default Judgment Motion due by 9/24/2024. (KEC)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Fri 08/16 1:27 PM
Amended Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan Related [+]. (Miller, David)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued (auto)
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 08/06 3:48 PM
Summons Service Executed on Almighty Waste, Inc. 8/6/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 08/06 3:47 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Osipov, Yuliy)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
3 3 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 08/05 3:36 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 08/05 12:29 PM
Summons Issued on Almighty Waste, Inc. Answer Due 09/4/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 08/05 12:29 PM
Adversary case 24-04300 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Kenneth Nathan against Almighty Waste, Inc.. Receipt Number DEFFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A