Nathan v. Aunde Corporation
Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-46160
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-46160
Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Lisa S Gretchko |
Case #: | 2:24-ap-04301 |
Nature of Suit | 12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference 13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer |
Case Filed: | Aug 05, 2024 |
Terminated: | Oct 02, 2024 |
Last checked: never |
Defendant
Aunde Corporation
|
Represented By
|
Plaintiff
Kenneth Nathan
|
Represented By
|
Docket last updated: 7 hours ago |
Wednesday, October 02, 2024 | ||
9 | 9
![]() Default Judgment . (cmcl) |
|
utility
Disposition of Adversary
Wed 10/02 2:31 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:24-ap-4301 : Granted by Default Judgment. (cmcl) |
||
court
Close Adversary Case
Wed 10/02 2:33 PM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-4301 Closed. (cmcl) |
||
Tuesday, September 24, 2024 | ||
8 | 8
![]() Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendant Aunde Corporation Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan (Miller, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |
||
Thursday, September 12, 2024 | ||
7 | 7
![]() BNC Certificate of Mailing. No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 09/12/2024. (Admin.) |
|
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
6 | 6
![]() Clerk's Entry of Default of Aunde Corporation - Default Judgment Motion due by 9/24/2024. (KEC) |
|
Tuesday, August 06, 2024 | ||
5 | 5
![]() Summons Service Executed on Aunde Corporation 8/6/2024 (Miller, David) |
|
4 | 4
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Osipov, Yuliy) |
|
Monday, August 05, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
![]() Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Bigelman, Jeffrey) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Summons Issued on Aunde Corporation Answer Due 09/4/2024 (Miller, David) |
|
1 | 1
![]() Adversary case 24-04301 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Kenneth Nathan against Aunde Corporation. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Miller, David) |
|
Att: 1
![]() |