Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-46160

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lisa S Gretchko
Case #: 2:24-ap-04304
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Aug 05, 2024
Terminated:Oct 02, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Ox Industries
Represented By
Ox Industries
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Nathan
Represented By
Jeffrey H. Bigelman
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info
David P. Miller
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
9 9 order Default Judgment Wed 10/02 2:47 PM
Default Judgment Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 8
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 10/02 2:47 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:24-ap-4304 : Granted by Default Judgment. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Wed 10/02 2:48 PM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-4304 Closed. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
8 8 motion Default Judgment Tue 09/24 2:21 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendant Ox Industries Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit C
Thursday, September 12, 2024
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 09/13 12:33 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 09/12/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Clerk's Entry of Default
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
6 6 court Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 09/10 1:12 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default of Ox Industries - Default Judgment Motion due by 9/24/2024. (KEC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 08/06 2:54 PM
Summons Service Executed on Ox Industries 8/6/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 08/06 2:52 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Osipov, Yuliy)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
3 3 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 08/05 3:38 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 08/05 1:00 PM
Summons Issued on Ox Industries Answer Due 09/4/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 08/05 1:00 PM
Adversary case 24-04304 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Kenneth Nathan against Ox Industries. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A