Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-46160

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lisa S Gretchko
Case #: 2:24-ap-04305
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Aug 05, 2024
Terminated:Nov 05, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Polyfill, LLC
Represented By
Polyfill, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Nethan
Represented By
David P. Miller
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info
Jeffrey H. Bigelman
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Friday, November 15, 2024
19 19 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (sorder) Fri 11/15 4:37 PM
Stipulated Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 18
18 18 motion Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Fri 11/15 1:09 PM
Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding By and Between David P. Miller and Ronald M. McMillan . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
17 17 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Compromise) Tue 11/05 3:02 PM
Upon Entry of the Order Approving the Application to Compromise in the Bankruptcy Case Entered on 10/30/2024, this Adversary Proceeding is Dismissed Without Prejudice. So Ordered by /s/ Judge Lisa S. Gretchko. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
16 16 court Copy of Tue 11/05 3:01 PM
Copy of: Order Authorizing Trustee to Compromise and Settle Claims Against Polyfill, LLC (cmcl)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 11/05 3:02 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:24-ap-4305 : Settled. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 11/05 3:03 PM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-4305 Closed. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
15 15 misc Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Wed 09/25 3:21 PM
Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 19, 2024
14 14 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 09/19 3:38 PM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Polyfill, LLC. (McMillan, Ronald)
Related: [-]
13 13 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 09/19 3:37 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Defendant Polyfill, LLC. (McMillan, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 22, 2024
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 08/23 7:35 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 08/22/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Improper Service of Summons/Complaint on Defendant
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
11 11 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 08/20 3:54 PM
Summons Service Executed on Polyfill, LLC 8/20/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
10 10 court Reissued Summons (auto) Tue 08/20 3:39 PM
Related: [-]
9 9 cmp Request for Reissued Summons Tue 08/20 3:39 PM
Request for Reissued Summons filed by David P. Miller on behalf of Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
8 8 order Improper Service of Summons/Complaint on Defendant Tue 08/20 3:03 PM
Order Regarding Improper Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendant Polyfill, LLC . Proper Service of Summons and Complaint Due on 8/27/2024. (jmk)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 08/06 1:53 PM
Summons Service Executed on Polyfill, LLC 8/6/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 08/06 1:52 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Osipov, Yuliy)
Related: [-]
5 5 court Reissued Summons (auto) Tue 08/06 1:09 PM
Related: [-]
4 4 cmp Request for Reissued Summons Tue 08/06 1:09 PM
Request for Reissued Summons filed by David P. Miller on behalf of Kenneth Nathan. (KEC)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
3 3 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 08/05 3:39 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nethan. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 08/05 1:08 PM
Summons Issued on Polyfill, LLC Answer Due 09/4/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 08/05 1:08 PM
Adversary case 24-04305 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Kenneth Nethan against Polyfill, LLC. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A