Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:24-bk-20245

California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Christopher M Klein
Case #: 2:24-ap-02168
Nature of Suit21 Bankruptcy - Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property
91 Bankruptcy - Declaratory judgment
Case Filed:Aug 02, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Hillary S. Chhlang
5850 E. Ashley Lane
Stockton, CA 95212
Represented By
Unknown at time of filing
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephen Thomas
Represented By
Richard F. Weiner
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 1:06 PM PDT
Monday, March 10, 2025
29 29 notice Entry Mon 03/10 11:00 AM
Notice of Entry of28 Order [PA-1] (mfrs)
Related: [-]
Sunday, March 09, 2025
28 28 order Generic Order - Links to Non-Motion Mon 03/10 8:23 AM
Order Approving27 Stipulation [PA-1] ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. (mfrs)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
27 27 misc Stipulation Fri 03/07 2:07 PM
Stipulation Re: Consent for Trustee to Sell Real Property and for Distribution of Sale Proceeds [PA-1] Filed by Defendant Loris L. Bakken, Plaintiff Stephen Thomas (mfrs)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
26 26 misc Matter Continued * Wed 02/26 3:46 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:16 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Stephen Thomas (mfrs) [CAE-1]; Status Conference to be held on 5/28/2025 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (ltas)
Related: [-]
Sunday, January 12, 2025
25 25 order Vacating Order Mon 01/13 10:33 AM
PDF with attached Audio File. Copies of recordings on the Docket are NOT the official record of any proceeding, may not be cited as the record, and are provided as a convenience to the public. Instructions for ordering the official record may be found on the Court's website. Court Date & Time [02/21/2025 01:31:00 PM]. File Size [ 1350 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:03:41 ]. (auto)
Related: [-]
24 24 order Civil Minute Order/Order to Continue Hearing Mon 01/13 10:31 AM
Order to Continue Status Conference Re:16 Amended Complaint [CAE-1] ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. Status Conference to be held on 2/21/2025 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (mfrs)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
23 23 audio Audio Docket Entry Fri 01/10 5:14 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Copies of recordings on the Docket are NOT the official record of any proceeding, may not be cited as the record, and are provided as a convenience to the public. Instructions for ordering the official record may be found on the Court's website. Court Date & Time [01/08/2025 01:48:00 PM]. File Size [ 2188 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:06:03 ]. (auto)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 08, 2025
22 22 misc Matter Continued * Fri 01/10 4:02 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status Conference continued Re:16 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Stephen Thomas (mfrs) [CAE-1]; Status Conference to be held on 2/21/2025 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (ltas)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
21 21 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Fri 12/06 9:11 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
20 20 notice BNC Service of Document Wed 12/04 10:47 AM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (mfrs)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Notice of Continued/Rescheduled Hearing/Conference/Trial Wed 12/04 10:46 AM
Notice of Rescheduled Pre-Trial Conference Re:16 Amended Complaint [CAE-1] Pre-Trial Conference set for 2/21/2025 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (mfrs)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 11, 2024
18 18 misc Certificate of Service of Reissued Summons and Complaint Tue 11/12 9:21 AM
Certificate of Service of Reissued Summons and Complaint [CAE-1]4 Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program. (mfrs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 06, 2024
17 17 misc Reissued Summons Wed 11/06 9:46 AM
Copy of Reissued Summons Re:16 Amended Complaint [CAE-1]; Status Conference to be held on 1/8/2025 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (mfrs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
16 16 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 11/06 9:38 AM
Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Stephen Thomas (mfrs)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
15 15 utility BNC Service of Document (Certificate) Fri 10/18 9:20 PM
Certificate of Mailing of Document as provided by the Bankruptcy Noticing Center (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
14 14 notice BNC Service of Document Wed 10/16 8:10 AM
BNC Service of Document as transmitted to BNC for service. (mfrs)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
13 13 order Scheduling Order - Including Modified/Amended Order Wed 10/16 8:09 AM
Scheduling Order Re:1 Complaint - Pre-Trial Conference set for 2/19/2025 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C Discovery due by 1/8/2025. (mfrs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
12 12 misc Matter Held * Tue 10/15 4:26 PM
Civil Minutes -- Status conference Concluded [CAE-1] Re: Status Conference Re: Complaint -1 - (21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)),(91 (Declaratory judgment)) : Complaint 24-02168 by Stephen Thomas against Hillary S. Chhlang. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7384029) (pdes) (auto)
Related: [-]
11 11 audio Audio Docket Entry Thu 10/10 3:08 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Copies of recordings on the Docket are NOT the official record of any proceeding, may not be cited as the record, and are provided as a convenience to the public. Instructions for ordering the official record may be found on the Court's website. Court Date & Time [ 10/10/2024 1:50:46 PM ]. File Size [ 2335 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:06:29 ]. (auto)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
10 10 misc Discovery Plan Mon 10/07 11:03 AM
Discovery Plan Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1] Filed by Defendant Hillary S. Chhlang, Plaintiff Stephen Thomas (mfrs)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Settlement Agreement/Notice of Settlement Agreement Mon 10/07 11:05 AM
Notice of Settlement Agreement Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1] (mfrs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
9 9 misc Initial Disclosures Thu 10/03 9:22 AM
Initial Disclosures Re:1 Complaint Filed by Plaintiff Stephen Thomas (mfrs)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
8 8 order Generic Order - Links to Non-Motion Fri 09/06 9:56 AM
Order Approving7 Stipulation [CAE-1] ; Service by the Deputy Clerk is not required. (msts)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
7 7 misc Stipulation Wed 09/04 2:13 PM
Stipulation to Extend Response Date Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1] Filed by Defendant Hillary S. Chhlang, Plaintiff Stephen Thomas (mfrs)
Related: [-]
virtual Entry - CM - Motion Submitted without Notice of Hearing or Proposed Order Wed 09/04 2:13 PM
This motion/application has been filed without a Notice of Hearing or Proposed Order. In order for this matter to be considered by the court, the filing party must provide a Notice of Hearing or Proposed Order, except for the following types of motions proscribed by Rule 6003 which may not have orders entered within 21 days after the filing of the petition: (a) application for employment under Rule 2014;(b) motion to use, sell, lease or otherwise incur an obligation regarding property of the estate, including a motion to pay all or part of a claim that arose before the filing of the petition, but not a motion under Rule 4001;(c) motion to assume or assign an executory contract or unexpired lease in accordance with section 365. In these instances, please do not submit a proposed order to the court until 21 days after the filing of the petition. This entry is in reference to7 Stipulation (mfrs)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
6 6 cmp Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint Fri 08/09 1:54 PM
Certificate of Service of Summons and Complaint [CAE-1],4 Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program,5 Order to Confer (mfrs)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
5 5 1 pgs order Order to Confer Mon 08/05 9:47 AM
Order to Confer on Initial Disclosures and Setting Deadlines (pdes)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc BDRP Mon 08/05 9:47 AM
Notice of Availability of Bankruptcy Dispute Resolution Program (pdes)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Issued Mon 08/05 9:46 AM
Copy of Summons Issued Re:1 Complaint [CAE-1]; Status Conference Status Conference to be held on 10/10/2024 at 01:30 PM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C (pdes)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 02, 2024
2 2 misc Adversary Cover Sheet Mon 08/05 9:45 AM
Adversary Proceeding Cover Sheet (pdes)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint (Intake) Mon 08/05 9:43 AM
(21 (Validity, priority or extent of lien or other interest in property)),(91 (Declaratory judgment)) : Complaint 24-02168 by Stephen Thomas against Hillary S. Chhlang. (Fee Paid $350.00) (eFilingID: 7384029) (pdes)
Related: [-]