California Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Case #: 2:24-bk-20245
Case Filed:Jan 23, 2024

Create an account to get the full party report for this case.



Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 6:04 PM PDT
Thursday, October 10, 2024
180 180 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Thu 10/10 11:31 AM
Certificate/Proof of Service of175 Motion/Application to Convert Case From Chapter 11 to Chapter 7 [UST-1] (Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required),175 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case [UST-1],176 Notice of Hearing,177 Declaration,178 Memorandum of Points and Authorities,179 Exhibit(s) (mfrs)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
179 179 related Exhibit(s) Thu 10/10 11:21 AM
Exhibit(s) in support of175 Motion/Application to Convert Case From Chapter 11 to Chapter 7 [UST-1] (Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required),175 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case [UST-1] (mfrs)
Related: [-]
178 178 9 pgs related Memorandum of Points and Authorities Thu 10/10 11:20 AM
Memorandum of Points and Authorities in support of175 Motion/Application to Convert Case From Chapter 11 to Chapter 7 [UST-1] (Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required),175 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case [UST-1] (mfrs)
Related: [-]
177 177 related Declaration Thu 10/10 11:19 AM
Declaration of Carla K. Cordero in support of175 Motion/Application to Convert Case From Chapter 11 to Chapter 7 [UST-1] (Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required),175 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case [UST-1] (mfrs)
Related: [-]
176 176 related Notice of Hearing Thu 10/10 11:18 AM
Notice of Hearing Re:175 Motion/Application to Convert Case From Chapter 11 to Chapter 7 [UST-1] (Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required),175 Motion/Application to Dismiss Case [UST-1] to be held on 11/6/2024 at 11:00 AM at Sacramento Courtroom 35, Department C. (mfrs)
Related: [-]
175 175 motion Convert Case (11 to 7) - Including Amended Motion Thu 10/10 9:59 AM
Motion/Application to Convert Case From Chapter 11 to Chapter 7 [UST-1] (Filing Fee Not Paid or Not Required) Filed by U.S. Trustee Tracy Hope Davis (mfrs)
Related: [-]
175 175 motion Dismiss Case - Including Amended Motion Thu 10/10 10:00 AM
Motion/Application to Dismiss Case [UST-1] Filed by U.S. Trustee Tracy Hope Davis (mfrs)
Related: [-]
174 174 related Certificate/Proof of Service - Including Amendments Wed 10/09 1:28 PM
Certificate/Proof of Service of173 Declaration [REA-4] (mfrs)
Related: [-]
173 173 related Declaration Wed 10/09 1:27 PM
Declaration of Sally A. Williams Re:142 Motion to Sell Free and Clear of Liens [REA-4],142 Motion/Application to Pay [REA-4] (mfrs)
Related: [-]