Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-46160

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lisa S Gretchko
Case #: 2:24-ap-04308
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Aug 05, 2024
Terminated:Mar 06, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
AGM Automotive
Represented By
AGM Automotive
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Nathan
Represented By
Yuliy Osipov
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info
Jeffrey H. Bigelman
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info
David P. Miller
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, March 27, 2025
28 28 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (order) Fri 03/28 8:41 AM
Stipulated Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 27
Thursday, March 20, 2025
27 27 motion Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Thu 03/20 11:57 AM
Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding By and Between David P. Miller and Michael S. Tucker . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
26 26 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Compromise) Thu 03/06 12:29 PM
Upon Entry of the Order Approving the Application to Compromise in the Bankruptcy Case Entered on 03/05/2025, this Adversary Proceeding is Dismissed Without Prejudice. So Ordered by /s/ Judge Lisa S. Gretchko. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Thu 03/06 12:33 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:24-ap-4308 : Dismissed. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 03/06 12:33 PM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-4308 Closed. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
25 25 court Copy of Thu 03/06 12:15 PM
Copy of: Order Authorizing Trustee to Compromise and Settle Claims Against AGM Automotive, LLC (Adv. Pro. No. 24-4308 (Filed in Bankruptcy case 22-46160 (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
24 24 misc Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Tue 02/18 5:22 PM
Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, February 06, 2025
23 23 order stipulated order Fri 02/07 7:56 AM
Stipulated Order Extending Time AGM Automotive to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint and Opt Out of Preference Procedures. Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 22 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan
22 22 misc Stipulation Thu 02/06 3:16 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Michael S. Tucker Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order Extending Time for AGM Autorotative to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint and Opt Out of Preference Procedures . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
21 21 order stipulated order Tue 01/14 8:55 AM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for AGM Automotive to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint and Opt Out of Preference Procedures. Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 20 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan
20 20 misc Stipulation Mon 01/13 12:29 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Michael S. Tucker Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order Extending Time for AGM Automotive to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint and Opt Out of Preference Procedures . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
19 19 order stipulated order Tue 12/10 4:09 PM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for AGM Automotive to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint and Opt Out of Preference Procedures. Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 18 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan
18 18 misc Stipulation Tue 12/10 11:38 AM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Michael S. Tucker Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order Extending Time for AGM Automotive to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint and Opt Out of Preference Procedures . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (Generic) Wed 11/27 3:23 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. A copy of this Related Document will be mailed by the BNC to Michael S. Tucker 1660 West 2nd Street Suite 1100 Cleveland, OH 44113-1448 Related [+] (nlt)
Related: [-] 16 Order to Extend
16 16 order Extend (Sua Sponte) Wed 11/27 3:20 PM
Order Extending Time For AGM Automotive To Answer Plaintiff's Complaint And Opt Out Of Preference Procedures Related [+]. (nlt)
Related: [-] 15 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan
15 15 misc Stipulation Wed 11/27 2:24 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Michael S. Tucker Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order Extending Time for AGM Automotive to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint and Opt Out of Preference Procedures . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 11/08 12:33 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 11/07/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 Clerk's Entry of Default
13 13 order stipulated order Thu 11/07 2:55 PM
Stipulated Order (1) Setting Aside Clerk's Default, and (2) Extending Time for AGM Automotive to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Related [+]. (jmk)
Related: [-] 11 Clerk's Entry of Default,12 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan
12 12 misc Stipulation Thu 11/07 11:40 AM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Michael S. Tucker Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order (1) Setting Aside Clerk's Entry of Default, and (2) Extending Time for AGM Automotive to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
11 11 court Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 11/05 2:09 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default of AGM Automotive - Default Judgment Motion due by 11/19/2024. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
10 10 order stipulated order Mon 10/07 4:22 PM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for AGM Automotive to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint and Opt Out of Preference Procedures. Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 9 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan
9 9 misc Stipulation Mon 10/07 2:31 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Michael S. Tucker Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order Extending Time for AGM Automotive to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint and Opt Out of Preference Procedures . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
8 8 order stipulated order Mon 09/09 4:18 PM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for AGM Automotive to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint and Opt Out of Preference Procedures Related [+]. (KEC)
Related: [-] 7 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan
Friday, September 06, 2024
7 7 misc Stipulation Fri 09/06 12:18 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Michael S. Tucker Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order Extending Time for AGM Automotive to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint and Opt Out of Preference Procedures . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Fri 08/16 3:06 PM
Amended Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan Related [+]. (Miller, David)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued (auto)
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 08/06 1:16 PM
Summons Service Executed on AGM Automotive 8/6/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 08/06 1:15 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Osipov, Yuliy)
Related: [-]
Monday, August 05, 2024
3 3 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Mon 08/05 3:40 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Mon 08/05 1:35 PM
Summons Issued on AGM Automotive Answer Due 09/4/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Mon 08/05 1:35 PM
Adversary case 24-04308 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Kenneth Nathan against AGM Automotive. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A