Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-46160

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lisa S Gretchko
Case #: 2:24-ap-04312
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Aug 06, 2024
Terminated:Dec 11, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
City of Sumter
PO Box 1449 21 N. Main Street
Sumter, SC 29150
Represented By
City of Sumter
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Represented By
Jeffrey H. Bigelman
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info
David P. Miller
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
18 18 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Wed 12/11 9:19 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding without Prejudice Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 12/11 1:19 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:24-ap-4312 : Dismissed. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Wed 12/11 1:19 PM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-4312 Closed. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Saturday, November 09, 2024
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 11/10 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 11/09/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thursday, November 07, 2024
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (DETROIT CASE ONLY) Thu 11/07 3:02 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. A Copy of this Related Document will be mailed by the BNC to Danny C. Crowe, 2019 Park Street, Columbia, SC 29201 Related [+] (jmk)
Related: [-] 15 Order to Extend
15 15 order Extend (Sua Sponte) Thu 11/07 3:00 PM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for City of Sumter to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint to 12/11/2024 Related [+]. (jmk)
Related: [-] 14 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
14 14 misc Stipulation Thu 11/07 10:32 AM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Danny C. Crowe Re: Entry of Order Extending Time for City of Sumter to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 10/19 12:33 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 10/18/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 BNC Certificate of Mailing
court Minute Entry. Motion Withdrawn Fri 10/18 12:31 PM
Minute Entry. Motion Withdrawn. Related [+] (London, Cheryl)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (DETROIT CASE ONLY) Wed 10/16 12:55 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing to Defendant's Attorney Danny C. Crowe 2019 Park St, Columbia, SC 29201. Related [+] (nlt)
Related: [-] 11 Order to Extend
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
11 11 order Extend (Sua Sponte) Tue 10/15 1:04 PM
Stipulated Order(1) Withdrawing Trustee's Motion For Default Judgment, (2) Cancelling October 18, 2024 Hearing Regrading Trustee's Motion For Default Judgment, (3) Setting Aside Clerk's Entry of Default, And (4) Extending Time For City of Sumter to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint Related [+]. (nlt)
Related: [-] 10 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Monday, October 14, 2024
10 10 misc Stipulation Mon 10/14 11:09 AM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Danny C. Crowe Re: Entry of Order (1) Withdrawing Trustee's Motion for Default Judgment, (2) Cancelling Hearing Regarding Trustee's Motion for Default Judgment, (3) Setting Aside Clerk's Entry of Default, and (4) Extending Time for City of Sumter to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 28, 2024
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Sun 09/29 12:26 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Notice of Hearing Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/28/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 Notice of Hearing (AP)
Thursday, September 26, 2024
8 8 court Notice of Hearing (AP) Thu 09/26 4:22 PM
Notice of In Person Hearing. Related [+] Hearing to be held on 10/18/2024 at 01:00 PM Courtroom 1975, 211 W. Fort St. for7 , (Lewis, C)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
7 7 motion Default Judgment Tue 09/24 2:59 PM
Motion for Default Judgment against the Defendant, City of Sumter Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 09/13 12:33 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 09/12/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Clerk's Entry of Default
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
5 5 court Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 09/10 1:13 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default of City of Sumter - Default Judgment Motion due by 9/24/2024. (KEC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 08/06 3:28 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 08/06 3:22 PM
Summons Service Executed on City of Sumter 8/6/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 08/06 12:53 PM
Summons Issued on City of Sumter Answer Due 09/5/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 08/06 12:52 PM
Adversary case 24-04312 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Kenneth Nathan, Trustee against City of Sumter. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]