Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-46160

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lisa S Gretchko
Case #: 2:24-ap-04313
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Aug 06, 2024
Terminated:Feb 03, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc.
1 Applied Plaza
Cleveland, OH 44115
Represented By
Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Represented By
David P. Miller
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info
Jeffrey H. Bigelman
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, February 06, 2025
23 23 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (sorder) Thu 02/06 1:55 PM
Stipulated Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 22
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
22 22 motion Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Wed 02/05 5:24 PM
Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding By and Between David P. Miller and Matthew J. Kerschner with Prejudice . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
21 21 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Compromise) Mon 02/03 4:06 PM
Upon Entry of the Order Approving the Application to Compromise in the Bankruptcy Case Entered on 01/21/2025, this Adversary Proceeding is Dismissed Without Prejudice. So Ordered by /s/ Judge Lisa S. Gretchko. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Mon 02/03 4:05 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:24-ap-4313 : Settled. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Mon 02/03 4:06 PM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-4313 Closed. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
20 20 court Copy of Mon 02/03 4:05 PM
Copy of: Order Authorizing Trustee to Compromise and Settle Claims Against: (1) Reko International Group, Inc. (AP 24-4339 , (2) Groz-Beckert USA, Inc. (AP 24-4268 , (3) Bridge Logistics Inc (AP 24-4233 , (4) Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc. (AP 24-4313 , AND (5) Woodbridge Foam Corporation (AP 24-4263 (Filed in Bankruptcy case 22-46160 (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 26, 2024
19 19 order Extend (Sua Sponte) Thu 12/26 4:42 PM
Order Extending Time For Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc. To Answer Plaintiff's Amended Complaint Related [+]. (nlt)
Related: [-] 18 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
18 18 misc Stipulation Thu 12/26 3:33 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Matthew J. Kerschner Re: Entry of Order Extending Time for Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Amended Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
17 17 order stipulated order Fri 11/22 8:17 AM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 16 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
16 16 misc Stipulation Wed 11/20 4:30 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Matthew J. Kerschner Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order Extending Time for Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Amended Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
15 15 misc Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Tue 11/05 2:20 PM
Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
14 14 order stipulated order Thu 10/24 3:44 PM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 13 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
13 13 misc Stipulation Thu 10/24 12:29 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Matthew J. Kerschner Re: Entry of Order Extending Time for Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
court Certificate of Mailing (generic virtual) Tue 09/24 8:02 AM
Certificate of Mailing: A Copy of this Related Document was Mailed on 09/24/2024 by the United States Postal Service to the non-ECF Participants at the Respective Address Appearing in the Records of the Court. Related [+] (cmcl)
Related: [-] 12 Stipulated Order
Monday, September 23, 2024
12 12 order stipulated order Tue 09/24 7:57 AM
Stipulated Order Extending Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Amended Complaint. Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 11 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
11 11 misc Stipulation Mon 09/23 5:28 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Matthew J. Kerschner Re: Entry of Order Extending Time for Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Amended Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 01, 2024
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 09/02 12:26 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 09/01/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 9 BNC Certificate of Mailing
Friday, August 30, 2024
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (DETROIT CASE ONLY) Fri 08/30 2:24 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. A Copy of this Related Document will be mailed by the BNC to the Defendant, Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc. C/O Matthew J. Kerschner, One Applied Plaza, Cleveland, OH 44115. Related [+] (jmk)
Related: [-] 8 Order to Extend
8 8 order Extend (Sua Sponte) Fri 08/30 2:19 PM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Amended Complaint to 9/26/2024 Related [+]. (jmk)
Related: [-] 7 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
7 7 misc Stipulation Fri 08/30 12:55 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Matthew J. Kerschner Re: Entry of Order Extending Time for Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc. to Answer Plaintiff's Amended Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 14, 2024
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Wed 08/14 11:58 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee Related [+]. (Miller, David)
Related: [-] 5 Amended Complaint
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Wed 08/14 11:53 AM
Amended Complaint by David P. Miller on behalf of Kenneth Nathan, Trustee against Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc.. Related [+]. (Miller, David)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 24-04313 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Kenneth Nathan, Trustee against Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc.. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 08/06 3:28 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 08/06 3:22 PM
Summons Service Executed on Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc. 8/6/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 08/06 12:56 PM
Summons Issued on Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc. Answer Due 09/5/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 08/06 12:56 PM
Adversary case 24-04313 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Kenneth Nathan, Trustee against Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc.. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]