Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-46160

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lisa S Gretchko
Case #: 2:24-ap-04317
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Aug 06, 2024
Terminated:Aug 12, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Livingstone Partners LLC
443 N Clark St # 200
Chicago, IL 60654
Represented By
Livingstone Partners LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Represented By
Jeffrey H. Bigelman
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info
David P. Miller
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Monday, August 12, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Mon 08/12 9:15 AM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-4317 Closed. (KEC)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
5 5 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Fri 08/09 11:25 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Mon 08/12 9:14 AM
Disposition of Adversary 2:24-ap-4317 : Dismissed. (KEC)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 08/06 3:30 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 08/06 3:24 PM
Summons Service Executed on Livingstone Partners LLC 8/6/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 08/06 1:07 PM
Summons Issued on Livingstone Partners LLC Answer Due 09/5/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 08/06 1:07 PM
Adversary case 24-04317 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Kenneth Nathan, Trustee against Livingstone Partners LLC. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]