Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-46160

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lisa S Gretchko
Case #: 2:24-ap-04319
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Aug 06, 2024
Terminated:Jan 23, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
VisTech Manufacturing Solutions, LLC
1156 Scenic Drive #120
Modesto, CA 95350
Represented By
VisTech Manufacturing Solutions, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Represented By
Jeffrey H. Bigelman
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info
David P. Miller
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
17 17 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (sorder) Wed 02/05 4:14 PM
Stipulated Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 16
16 16 motion Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Wed 02/05 2:23 PM
Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding By and Between David P. Miller and Elliot M. Smith with Prejudice . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
15 15 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Compromise) Thu 01/23 1:29 PM
Upon Entry of the Order Approving the Application to Compromise in the Bankruptcy Case Entered on 01/21/2025, this Adversary Proceeding is Dismissed Without Prejudice. So Ordered by /s/ Judge Lisa S. Gretchko. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
14 14 court Copy of Thu 01/23 1:28 PM
Copy of: Order Authorizing Trustee to Compromise and Settle Claims Against Vistech Manufacturing Solutions, LLC (Filed in bankruptcy 22-46160 (cmcl)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Thu 01/23 1:28 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:24-ap-4319 : Settled. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 01/23 1:30 PM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-4319 Closed. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 20, 2025
13 13 order Extend (Sua Sponte) Tue 01/21 7:33 AM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for Vistech Manufacturing Solutions, LLC to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint to 2/20/2025 Related [+]. (jmk)
Related: [-] 12 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
12 12 misc Stipulation Mon 01/20 2:33 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Elliot M. Smith Re: Entry of Order Extending Time for Vistech Manufacturing Solutions, LLC to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
11 11 order stipulated order Thu 11/21 1:33 PM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for Vistech Manufacturing Solutions, LLC to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 10 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
10 10 misc Stipulation Thu 11/21 12:05 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Elliot M. Smith Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order Extending Time for Vistech Manufacturing Solutions, LLC to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
9 9 misc Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Fri 11/01 10:58 AM
Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
8 8 order stipulated order Tue 10/01 8:48 AM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for Vistech Manufacturing Solutions, LLC to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 7 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
7 7 misc Stipulation Mon 09/30 2:58 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Elliot M. Smith Re: Entry of Order Extending Time for Vistech Manufacturing Solutions, LLC to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
6 6 order Extend (Sua Sponte) Tue 08/20 3:49 PM
Order Extending Time for Vistech Manufacturing Solutions, LLC to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint to 10/7/2024 Related [+]. (jmk)
Related: [-] 5 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
5 5 misc Stipulation Tue 08/20 10:40 AM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Elliot M. Smith Re: Entry of Order Extending Time for Vistech Manufacturing Solutions, LLC to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Tue 08/06 3:32 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 08/06 3:26 PM
Summons Service Executed on VisTech Manufacturing Solutions, LLC 8/6/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 08/06 1:11 PM
Summons Issued on VisTech Manufacturing Solutions, LLC Answer Due 09/5/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 08/06 1:11 PM
Adversary case 24-04319 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Kenneth Nathan, Trustee against VisTech Manufacturing Solutions, LLC. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]