Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-46160

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lisa S Gretchko
Case #: 2:24-ap-04323
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Aug 06, 2024
Terminated:Jan 15, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Bank of Ningbo Co., LTD
Represented By
Bank of Ningbo Co., LTD
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Nathan
Represented By
Jeffrey H. Bigelman
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info
David P. Miller
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info
Yuliy Osipov
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 01/15 2:31 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:24-ap-4323 : Dismissed. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Wed 01/15 2:32 PM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-4323 Closed. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
12 12 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 01/14 3:05 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 20, 2024
11 11 audio . Fri 09/20 5:05 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 9/20/2024 2:09:19 PM ]. File Size [ 16280 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:33:55 ]. (Audio Duplicate Docket.). (admin)
Related: [-]
court Minute Entry Fri 09/20 7:51 PM
Minute Entry. Hearing Held. Matter Held in Abeyance until further Order of the Court Related [+] (Lewis, C)
Related: [-] 7 Generic Motion Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Thu 09/19 12:30 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 09/18/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Improper Service of Summons/Complaint on Defendant
Tuesday, September 17, 2024
9 9 court Notice of Hearing (AP) Tue 09/17 3:59 PM
Corrected Notice of In-Person Hearing . Related [+] Hearing to be held on 9/20/2024 at 01:00 PM Courtroom 1975, 211 W. Fort St. for7 , (London, Cheryl)
Related: [-] 7 Generic Motion filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan
8 8 court Notice of Hearing (AP) Tue 09/17 2:55 PM
Notice of In-Person Hearing . Related [+] Hearing to be held on 9/20/2024 at 10:00 AM Courtroom 1975, 211 W. Fort St. for7 , (London, Cheryl)
Related: [-] 7 Generic Motion filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan
Monday, September 16, 2024
7 7 motion generic Motion Mon 09/16 5:05 PM
Ex Parte Motion for Entry of Order Directing Court Clerk to Issue Modified Summons Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
6 6 order Improper Service of Summons/Complaint on Defendant Mon 09/16 2:08 PM
Order Regarding Improper Service of Summons and Complaint on Defendant Bank of Ningbo Co., LTD . Proper Service of Summons and Complaint Due on 9/23/2024. (KEC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 08/07 12:16 PM
Summons Service Executed on Bank of Ningbo Co., LTD 8/7/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 08/07 12:15 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Osipov, Yuliy)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 08/07 9:15 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 08/06 4:56 PM
Summons Issued on Bank of Ningbo Co., LTD Answer Due 09/5/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 08/06 4:56 PM
Adversary case 24-04323 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Kenneth Nathan against Bank of Ningbo Co., LTD. Receipt Number DEFFERED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A