Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-46160

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lisa S Gretchko
Case #: 2:24-ap-04325
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Aug 06, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Dayton Power & Light Co.
Represented By
Dayton Power & Light Co.
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Nathan
Represented By
David P. Miller
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info
Yuliy Osipov
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info
Jeffrey H. Bigelman
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, August 29, 2024
9 9 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Thu 08/29 11:38 AM
Statement of Corporate Ownership Corporate Affiliates added to case: DPL Inc. Filed by Defendant Dayton Power & Light Co.. (Neuman, Eric)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Certificate of Service Thu 08/29 11:33 AM
Certificate of Service of Answer Filed by Defendant Dayton Power & Light Co. Related [+]. (Neuman, Eric)
Related: [-] 7 Answer to Complaint
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Thu 08/29 11:29 AM
Answer to Complaint Filed by Dayton Power & Light Co.. (Neuman, Eric)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 08/29 11:27 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Defendant Dayton Power & Light Co.. (Neuman, Eric)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 08/07 12:39 PM
Summons Service Executed on Dayton Power & Light Co. 8/7/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 08/07 12:38 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Osipov, Yuliy)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 08/07 9:16 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 08/06 5:08 PM
Summons Issued on Dayton Power & Light Co. Answer Due 09/5/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 08/06 5:08 PM
Adversary case 24-04325 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Kenneth Nathan against Dayton Power & Light Co.. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A