Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-46160

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lisa S Gretchko
Case #: 2:24-ap-04326
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Aug 06, 2024
Terminated:Oct 02, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Dominion Energy South Carolina, Inc
Represented By
Dominion Energy South Carolina, Inc
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Nathan
Represented By
Yuliy Osipov
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info
David P. Miller
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info
Jeffrey H. Bigelman
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
court Close Adversary Case Wed 10/02 8:27 AM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-4326 Closed. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 01, 2024
10 10 misc Certificate of Service Tue 10/01 1:00 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan Related [+]. (Miller, David)
Related: [-] 9 Notice of Voluntary Dismissal
9 9 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 10/01 12:54 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 10/02 8:26 AM
Disposition of Adversary 2:24-ap-4326 : Dismissed. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 23, 2024
8 8 order Extend (Sua Sponte) Fri 08/23 4:55 PM
Order Extending Time For Dominion Energy South Carolina, Inc To Answer Plaintiff's Complaint Related [+]. (nlt)
Related: [-] 7 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan
7 7 misc Stipulation Fri 08/23 4:29 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and David B. Wheeler Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order Extending Time for Dominion Energy South Carolina, Inc., to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Fri 08/23 11:12 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Defendant Dominion Energy South Carolina, Inc. (Wheeler, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 08/07 12:56 PM
Summons Service Executed on Dominion Energy South Carolina, Inc 8/7/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 08/07 12:55 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Osipov, Yuliy)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 08/07 9:17 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 08/06 5:15 PM
Summons Issued on Dominion Energy South Carolina, Inc Answer Due 09/5/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 08/06 5:15 PM
Adversary case 24-04326 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Kenneth Nathan against Dominion Energy South Carolina, Inc. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A