Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-46160

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lisa S Gretchko
Case #: 2:24-ap-04329
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Aug 06, 2024
Terminated:Oct 03, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
VICTORY MACHINE & FABRICATION, LLC
Represented By
VICTORY MACHINE & FABRICATION, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Nathan
Represented By
Yuliy Osipov
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info
Jeffrey H. Bigelman
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info
David P. Miller
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, October 03, 2024
utility Disposition of Adversary Thu 10/03 8:01 AM
Disposition of Adversary 2:24-ap-4329 : Granted by Default Judgment. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 10/03 8:02 AM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-4329 Closed. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
9 9 order Default Judgment Thu 10/03 8:00 AM
Default Judgment Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 8
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
8 8 motion Default Judgment Tue 09/24 2:39 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Against Defendant Victory Machine & Fabrication, LLC Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit C
Thursday, September 12, 2024
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 09/13 12:33 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 09/12/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 6 Clerk's Entry of Default
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
6 6 court Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 09/10 1:16 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default of Victory Machine & Fabrication, LLC - Default Judgment Motion due by 9/24/2024. (KEC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 08/07 3:09 PM
Summons Service Executed on VICTORY MACHINE & FABRICATION, LLC 8/7/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 08/07 3:07 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Osipov, Yuliy)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 08/07 9:19 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 08/06 5:37 PM
Summons Issued on VICTORY MACHINE & FABRICATION, LLC Answer Due 09/5/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 08/06 5:37 PM
Adversary case 24-04329 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Kenneth Nathan against VICTORY MACHINE & FABRICATION, LLC. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A