Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-46160

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lisa S Gretchko
Case #: 2:24-ap-04330
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Aug 06, 2024
Terminated:Oct 30, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
THE REYNOLDS COMPANY
Represented By
THE REYNOLDS COMPANY
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Nathan
Represented By
David P. Miller
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info
Jeffrey H. Bigelman
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info
Yuliy Osipov
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, October 30, 2024
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 10/30 8:54 AM
Disposition of Adversary 2:24-ap-4330 : Dismissed. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Wed 10/30 8:54 AM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-4330 Closed. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
13 13 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 10/29 4:54 PM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 28, 2024
12 12 order stipulated order Tue 10/29 8:09 AM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for the Reynolds Company to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 11 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan
11 11 misc Stipulation Mon 10/28 5:02 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Jeremy M. Campana Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order Extending Time for The Reynolds Company to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
10 10 order stipulated order Mon 10/07 4:19 PM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for the Reynolds Company to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 9 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan
9 9 misc Stipulation Mon 10/07 2:38 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Jeremy M. Campana Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order Extending Time for The Reynolds Company to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 04, 2024
8 8 order stipulated order Wed 09/04 2:20 PM
Order Extending Time for The Reynolds Company to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint Related [+]. (KEC)
Related: [-] 7 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan
7 7 misc Stipulation Wed 09/04 12:07 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Jeremy M. Campana Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order Extending Time for The Reynolds Company to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Fri 08/16 3:11 PM
Amended Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan Related [+]. (Miller, David)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued (auto)
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 08/07 3:17 PM
Summons Service Executed on THE REYNOLDS COMPANY 8/7/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 08/07 3:15 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Osipov, Yuliy)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 08/07 9:19 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Tue 08/06 5:43 PM
Summons Issued on THE REYNOLDS COMPANY Answer Due 09/5/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 08/06 5:43 PM
Adversary case 24-04330 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Kenneth Nathan against THE REYNOLDS COMPANY. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A