Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-46160

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lisa S Gretchko
Case #: 2:24-ap-04333
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Aug 07, 2024
Terminated:Feb 25, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Labonte's Landscaping
465 College St
Lewiston, ME 04240
Represented By
Labonte's Landscaping
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Represented By
Jeffrey H. Bigelman
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info
David P. Miller
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, March 13, 2025
28 28 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 03/14 12:32 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/13/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 27 BNC Certificate of Mailing
Tuesday, March 11, 2025
27 27 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (Generic) Tue 03/11 11:18 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. A copy of this Related Document will be mailed by the BNC to Labonte's Landscaping 465 College St Lewiston, ME 04240-5221 Related [+] (cmcl)
Related: [-] 26 Order on Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding
Monday, March 10, 2025
26 26 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (order) Mon 03/10 11:38 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding with Prejudice Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 25
Friday, March 07, 2025
25 25 motion Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Fri 03/07 10:33 AM
Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding By and Between David P. Miller and Randy J. Creswell with Prejudice . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, February 25, 2025
24 24 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Compromise) Tue 02/25 12:30 PM
Upon Entry of the Order Approving the Application to Compromise in the Bankruptcy Case Entered on 02/19/2025, this Adversary Proceeding is Dismissed Without Prejudice. So Ordered by /s/ Judge Lisa S. Gretchko. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Tue 02/25 12:31 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:24-ap-4333 : Dismissed. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Tue 02/25 12:31 PM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-4333 Closed. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 21, 2025
court Minute Entry. Matter Settled Fri 02/21 4:00 PM
Minute Entry. Matter Settled. Related [+] (London, Cheryl)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
23 23 court Copy of Fri 02/21 9:31 AM
Copy of: Order Authorizing Trustee to Compromise and Settle Claims Against Mark Labonte d/b/a Labonte's Landscaping (Adv. Pro. No. 24-4333 (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 17, 2025
court Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned (AP) Fri 01/17 3:28 PM
Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned. Related [+] Hearing scheduled 02/21/2025 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 1975, 211 W. Fort St.. (London, Cheryl)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Thursday, January 16, 2025
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 01/17 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 01/16/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 BNC Certificate of Mailing
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (Generic) Tue 01/14 3:29 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. A copy of this Related Document will be mailed by the BNC to Defendant's Attorney Randy J. Creswell PO Box 7340 Portland, ME 04112-7340 Related [+] (nlt)
Related: [-] 20 Order to Adjourn/Reschedule/Continue Hearing
Sunday, January 12, 2025
20 20 order Adjourn/Reschedule/Continue Hearing Mon 01/13 8:55 AM
Stipulated Order Adjourning Hearing Regarding Trustee's Motion for Default Judgment Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 2/21/2025 at 01:00 PM Courtroom 1975, 211 W. Fort St. for7 , (cmcl)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Friday, January 10, 2025
19 19 misc Stipulation Fri 01/10 10:51 AM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Randy J. Creswell Re: Entry of Order Adjourning Hearing Regarding Trustee's Motion for Default Judgment . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 13, 2024
court Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned (AP) Fri 12/13 2:18 PM
Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned. Related [+] Hearing scheduled 01/17/2025 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 1975, 211 W. Fort St.. (London, Cheryl)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Sunday, December 08, 2024
18 18 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 12/09 12:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 12/08/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 17 BNC Certificate of Mailing
Friday, December 06, 2024
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (Generic) Fri 12/06 9:04 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. A copy of this Related Document will be mailed by the BNC to Defendant's Attorney Randy J. Creswell PO Box 7340 Portland, Maine 04112-7340 Related [+] (nlt)
Related: [-] 16 Order to Adjourn/Reschedule/Continue Hearing
Thursday, December 05, 2024
16 16 order Adjourn/Reschedule/Continue Hearing Thu 12/05 5:09 PM
Stipulated Order Adjourning Hearing Regarding Trustee's Motion For Default Judgment Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 1/17/2025 at 01:00 PM Courtroom 1975, 211 W. Fort St. for7 , (nlt)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee, RE:15 Stipulation
Wednesday, December 04, 2024
15 15 misc Stipulation Wed 12/04 4:33 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Randy J. Creswell Re: Entry of Order Adjourning Hearing Regarding Trustees Motion for Entry of Default Judgment . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
14 14 misc Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Wed 12/04 3:56 PM
Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 08, 2024
13 13 audio . Fri 11/08 5:05 PM
PDF with attached Audio File. Court Date & Time [ 11/8/2024 1:14:03 PM ]. File Size [ 976 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:02:02 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
court Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned (AP) Fri 11/08 3:39 PM
Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned. Related [+] Hearing scheduled 12/13/2024 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 1975, 211 W. Fort St.. (London, Cheryl)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Saturday, October 19, 2024
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 10/20 12:26 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 10/19/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 11 BNC Certificate of Mailing
Friday, October 18, 2024
court Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned (AP) Fri 10/18 12:31 PM
Minute Entry. Hearing Adjourned. Related [+] Hearing scheduled 11/08/2024 at 01:00 PM at Courtroom 1975, 211 W. Fort St.. (London, Cheryl)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Thursday, October 17, 2024
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (DETROIT CASE ONLY) Thu 10/17 10:25 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. A Copy of this Related Document will be mailed by the BNC to the Defendant, LaBonte's Landscaping, c/o Creswell Law, Attn Randy J. Creswell, PO Box 7340, Portland, Maine 04112-7340 Related [+] (jmk)
Related: [-] 10 Order to Adjourn/Reschedule/Continue Hearing
10 10 order Adjourn/Reschedule/Continue Hearing Thu 10/17 9:19 AM
Order Adjourning Hearing Regarding Trustee's Motion for Default Judgment Related [+]. Hearing to be held on 11/8/2024 at 01:00 PM Courtroom 1975, 211 W. Fort St. for7 , (cmcl)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Wednesday, October 16, 2024
9 9 misc Stipulation Wed 10/16 3:12 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Randy J. Creswell Re: Entry of Order Adjourning Hearing Regarding Trustee's Motion for Default Judgment . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
8 8 court Notice of Hearing (AP) Tue 10/08 5:27 PM
Notice of In-Person Hearing . Related [+] Hearing to be held on 10/18/2024 at 01:00 PM Courtroom 1975, 211 W. Fort St. for7 , (London, Cheryl)
Related: [-] 7 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
7 7 motion Default Judgment Tue 09/24 3:04 PM
Motion for Default Judgment against the Defendant Labonte's Landscaping Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 09/13 12:33 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 09/12/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 5 Clerk's Entry of Default
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
5 5 court Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 09/10 1:17 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default of Labonte's Landscaping - Default Judgment Motion due by 9/24/2024. (KEC)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 08/07 10:57 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 08/07 10:48 AM
Summons Service Executed on Labonte's Landscaping 8/7/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Wed 08/07 9:46 AM
Summons Issued on Labonte's Landscaping Answer Due 09/6/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 08/07 9:46 AM
Adversary case 24-04333 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Kenneth Nathan, Trustee against Labonte's Landscaping. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]