Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-46160

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lisa S Gretchko
Case #: 2:24-ap-04335
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Aug 07, 2024
Terminated:Dec 23, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
T&A Enterprises Ohio, LLC
11261 STATE ROUTE 274
LEWISTOWN, OH 43333
Represented By
T&A Enterprises Ohio, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Represented By
Jeffrey H. Bigelman
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info
David P. Miller
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Thursday, December 26, 2024
23 23 misc Certificate of Service Thu 12/26 11:42 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee Related [+]. (Miller, David)
Related: [-] 22 Order on Motion for Default Judgment
Monday, December 23, 2024
22 22 order Default Judgment Mon 12/23 2:33 PM
Default Judgment Related [+]. (jmk)
Related: [-] 20
utility Disposition of Adversary Mon 12/23 2:35 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:24-ap-4335 : Granted by Default Judgment. (jmk)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Mon 12/23 2:36 PM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-4335 Closed. (jmk)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 16, 2024
21 21 misc Certification of Non-Response Mon 12/16 12:44 PM
Certification of Non-Response Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee Related [+]. (Miller, David)
Related: [-] 20 Motion for Default Judgment against the Defendants, Todd Kinninger, d/b/a T&A Enterprises, and Amy Kinninger, d/b/a T&A Enterprises
Tuesday, December 03, 2024
20 20 motion Default Judgment Tue 12/03 3:24 PM
Motion for Default Judgment against the Defendants, Todd Kinninger, d/b/a T&A Enterprises, and Amy Kinninger, d/b/a T&A Enterprises Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
19 19 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 11/22 12:34 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 11/21/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 18 Clerk's Entry of Default
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
18 18 court Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 11/19 3:08 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default of Amy Kinninger, d/b/a T&A Enterprises , Todd Kinninger, d/b/a T&A Enterprises (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 20, 2024
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 10/21 12:23 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 10/20/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 BNC Certificate of Mailing
Friday, October 18, 2024
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (DETROIT CASE ONLY) Fri 10/18 9:28 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing to Defendants Amy Kinninger, d/b/a T&A Enterprises11261 STATE ROUTE 274LEWISTOWN, OH 43333 and Todd Kinninger, d/b/a T&A Enterprises11261 STATE ROUTE 274LEWISTOWN, OH 43333. Related [+] (nlt)
Related: [-] 15 Stipulated Order
court Minute Entry. Motion Withdrawn Fri 10/18 12:31 PM
Minute Entry. Motion Withdrawn. Related [+] (London, Cheryl)
Related: [-] 12 Motion for Default Judgment Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Thursday, October 17, 2024
15 15 order stipulated order Thu 10/17 11:54 AM
Stipulated Order (1) Withdrawing Trustee's Motion for Default Judgment, (2) Cancelling Hearing Regarding Trustee's Motion for Default Judgment, (3) Setting Aside Clerk's Entry of Default, and (4) Extending Time for Todd Kinninger, dba T&A Enterprises and Amy Kinninger, dba T&A Enterprises to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 14 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
14 14 misc Stipulation Thu 10/17 10:38 AM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Terrence G. Stolly Re: Entry of Order (1) Withdrawing Trustee's Motion for Default Judgment, (2) Cancelling Hearing Regarding Trustee's Motion for Default Judgment, (3) Setting Aside Clerk's Entry of Default, and (4) Extending Time for Todd Kinninger, d/b/a T&A Enterprises, and Amy Kinninger, d/b/a T&A Enterprises to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
13 13 court Notice of Hearing (AP) Tue 10/08 5:28 PM
Notice of In-Person Hearing . Related [+] Hearing to be held on 10/18/2024 at 01:00 PM Courtroom 1975, 211 W. Fort St. for12 , (London, Cheryl)
Related: [-] 12 Motion for Default Judgment filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Friday, September 27, 2024
12 12 motion Default Judgment Fri 09/27 5:24 PM
Motion for Default Judgment against the Defendants, Todd Kinninger, d/b/a T&A Enterprises, and Amy Kinninger, d/b/a T&A Enterprises Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
11 11 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 09/27 12:30 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 09/26/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 10 Clerk's Entry of Default
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
10 10 court Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 09/24 2:28 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default of Amy Kinninger, d/b/a T&A Enterprises, and Todd Kinninger, d/b/a T&A Enterprises Related [+] Default Judgment Motion due by 10/8/2024. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 5 Amended Complaint filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Monday, September 23, 2024
utility Disposition of Adversary Mon 09/23 12:12 PM
ENTERED IN ERROR. Please disregard this entry. Disposition of Adversary 2:24-ap-4335 : Dismissed. (cmcl) MODIFIED on 9/23/2024 (adeld)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, August 20, 2024
9 9 notice Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Tue 08/20 11:40 AM
Notice of Voluntary Dismissal Of Claims Against T&A Enterprises Ohio, LLC ONLY Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
8 8 cmp Summons Service Executed Tue 08/20 11:38 AM
Summons Service Executed on Amy Kinninger, d/b/a T&A Enterprises 8/20/2024; Todd Kinninger, d/b/a T&A Enterprises 8/20/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
7 7 court Reissued Summons (auto) Tue 08/20 11:35 AM
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Request for Reissued Summons Tue 08/20 11:35 AM
Request for Reissued Summons filed by David P. Miller on behalf of Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Amended Complaint Tue 08/20 11:33 AM
Amended Complaint by David P. Miller on behalf of Kenneth Nathan, Trustee against Amy Kinninger, d/b/a T&A Enterprises, Todd Kinninger, d/b/a T&A Enterprises, T&A Enterprises Ohio, LLC. Related [+]. (Miller, David)
Related: [-] 1 Adversary case 24-04335 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Kenneth Nathan, Trustee against T&A Enterprises Ohio, LLC. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 08/07 10:58 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 08/07 10:49 AM
Summons Service Executed on T&A Enterprises Ohio, LLC 8/7/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Wed 08/07 9:53 AM
Summons Issued on T&A Enterprises Ohio, LLC Answer Due 09/6/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 08/07 9:53 AM
Adversary case 24-04335 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Kenneth Nathan, Trustee against T&A Enterprises Ohio, LLC. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]