Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-46160

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lisa S Gretchko
Case #: 2:24-ap-04336
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Aug 07, 2024
Terminated:Jan 23, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
Markley Boston, LLC
One Summer Street, 5th Floor
Boston, MA 02110
Represented By
Markley Boston, LLC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
Represented By
Jeffrey H. Bigelman
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info
David P. Miller
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, February 07, 2025
18 18 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (sorder) Fri 02/07 2:56 PM
Stipulated Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 17
17 17 motion Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Fri 02/07 10:32 AM
Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding By and Between David P. Miller and Alex F. Mattera with Prejudice . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
16 16 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Compromise) Thu 01/23 1:33 PM
Upon Entry of the Order Approving the Application to Compromise in the Bankruptcy Case Entered on 01/21/2025, this Adversary Proceeding is Dismissed Without Prejudice. So Ordered by /s/ Judge Lisa S. Gretchko. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
15 15 court Copy of Thu 01/23 1:32 PM
Copy of: Order Authorizing Trustee to Compromise and Settle Claims Against Markley Boston, LLC (Filed in Bankruptcy 22-46160 (cmcl)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Thu 01/23 1:33 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:24-ap-4336 : Settled. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 01/23 1:34 PM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-4336 Closed. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 29, 2024
14 14 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sat 11/30 12:27 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/29/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 13 BNC Certificate of Mailing
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (Generic) Wed 11/27 3:35 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. A copy of this Related Document will be mailed by the BNC to Attorney for Defendant Alex F. Mattera 100 Summer Street, 22nd Floor Boston, MA 02110 Related [+] (nlt)
Related: [-] 12 Order (Generic)
12 12 2 pgs order order (Generic) Wed 11/27 3:31 PM
Order Setting Aside Clerk's Entry of Default and Extending Time For Markley Boston, LLC To Answer Plaintiff's Complaint Related [+]. (nlt)
Related: [-] 11 Stipulation
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
11 11 misc Stipulation Tue 11/26 1:27 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Alex F. Mattera Re: Entry of Order Setting Aside Default and Extending Time for Markley Boston, LLC to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 22, 2024
10 10 misc Stipulation Fri 11/22 4:59 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Alex F. Mattera Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order Extending Time for Markley Boston, LLC to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
9 9 misc Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Tue 10/22 2:27 PM
Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 10/11 12:30 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 10/10/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Clerk's Entry of Default
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
7 7 court Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 10/08 1:09 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default of Markley Boston, LLC - Default Judgment Motion due by 10/22/2024. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 05, 2024
6 6 order stipulated order Thu 09/05 4:00 PM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for Markley Boston, LLC to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint Related [+]. (KEC)
Related: [-] 5 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee
5 5 misc Stipulation Thu 09/05 3:26 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Alex F. Mattera Re: Entry of Order Extending Time for Markley Boston, LLC to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
court Certificate of Mailing (generic virtual) Thu 09/05 4:09 PM
Certificate of Mailing: A Copy of this Related Document was Mailed on 9/5/24 by the United States Postal Service to the Defendant, Markley Boston LLC C/o Alex Mattera, at 100 Summer Street 22nd Floor Boston MA 02110 . Related [+] (KEC)
Related: [-] 6 Stipulated Order
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 08/07 10:58 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan, Trustee. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
3 3 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 08/07 10:50 AM
Summons Service Executed on Markley Boston, LLC 8/7/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Wed 08/07 9:55 AM
Summons Issued on Markley Boston, LLC Answer Due 09/6/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 08/07 9:55 AM
Adversary case 24-04336 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Kenneth Nathan, Trustee against Markley Boston, LLC. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]