Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-46160

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lisa S Gretchko
Case #: 2:24-ap-04338
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Aug 07, 2024
Terminated:Oct 04, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Kelly Services, Inc.
Represented By
Kelly Services, Inc.
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Nathan
Represented By
David P. Miller
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info
Jeffrey H. Bigelman
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info
Yuliy Osipov
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Friday, October 04, 2024
10 10 order Default Judgment Fri 10/04 11:51 AM
Default Judgment Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 9
utility Disposition of Adversary Fri 10/04 11:53 AM
Disposition of Adversary 2:24-ap-4338 : Granted by Default Judgment. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Fri 10/04 11:55 AM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-4338 Closed. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
9 9 motion Default Judgment Tue 09/24 3:24 PM
Motion for Default Judgment Against Kelly Services, Inc Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit C
Thursday, September 12, 2024
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 09/13 12:33 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 09/12/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 7 Clerk's Entry of Default
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
7 7 court Clerk's Entry of Default Tue 09/10 1:19 PM
Clerk's Entry of Default of Kelly Services, Inc. - Default Judgment Motion due by 9/24/2024. (KEC)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 16, 2024
6 6 misc Certificate of Service Fri 08/16 3:14 PM
Amended Certificate of Service Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan Related [+]. (Miller, David)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint,2 Summons Issued (auto)
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 08/07 3:54 PM
Summons Service Executed on Kelly Services, Inc. 8/7/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 08/07 3:52 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Osipov, Yuliy)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 08/07 12:30 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Wed 08/07 10:46 AM
Summons Issued on Kelly Services, Inc. Answer Due 09/6/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 08/07 10:46 AM
Adversary case 24-04338 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Kenneth Nathan against Kelly Services, Inc.. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A