Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-46160

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lisa S Gretchko
Case #: 2:24-ap-04339
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Aug 07, 2024
Terminated:Feb 06, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
REKO INTERNATIONAL GROUP INC
Represented By
REKO INTERNATIONAL GROUP INC
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Nathan
Represented By
Yuliy Osipov
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info
Jeffrey H. Bigelman
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info
David P. Miller
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, February 06, 2025
24 24 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (sorder) Thu 02/06 1:54 PM
Stipulated Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 22
court Close Adversary Case Thu 02/06 1:54 PM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-4339 Closed. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
22 22 motion Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Wed 02/05 3:35 PM
Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding By and Between David P. Miller and Kimberly R. Clayson . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 02/05 3:51 PM
Disposition of Adversary 2:24-ap-4339 : Settled. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 21, 2025
23 23 court Copy of Wed 02/05 3:50 PM
Copy of: Order Authorizing Trustee to Compromise and Settle Claims Against: (1) Reko International Group, Inc. (AP 24-4339 , (2) Groz-Beckert USA, Inc. (AP 24-4268 , (3) Bridge Logistics Inc (AP 24-4233 , (4) Applied Industrial Technologies, Inc. (AP 24-4313 , AND (5) Woodbridge Foam Corporation (AP 24-4263 (Filed in Bankruptcy Case 22-46160 (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 27, 2024
21 21 order Extend (Sua Sponte) Fri 12/27 4:22 PM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for Reko International Group Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to 2/21/2025 Related [+]. (jmk)
Related: [-] 19 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan
20 20 order Extend (Sua Sponte) Fri 12/27 4:20 PM
Stipulated Order Extending Mediation Deadline to 2/21/2025 Related [+]. (jmk)
Related: [-] 18 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan
19 19 misc Stipulation Fri 12/27 3:11 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Judith Greenstone Miller Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order Extending Time for Reko International Group, Inc to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Stipulation Fri 12/27 2:51 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Judith Greenstone Miller Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order Extending Mediation Deadline . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 21, 2024
17 17 order stipulated order Thu 11/21 10:11 AM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for Reko International Group Inc. To Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 16 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
16 16 misc Stipulation Wed 11/20 4:12 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Judith Greenstone Miller Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order Extending Time for Reko International Group, Inc to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Friday, November 01, 2024
15 15 misc Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Fri 11/01 5:26 PM
Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
14 14 order stipulated order Tue 10/08 11:51 AM
Order Extending Time for Reko International Group, Inc., to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint. Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 13 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan
13 13 misc Stipulation Tue 10/08 9:22 AM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Judith Greenstone Miller Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order Extending Time for Reko International Group, Inc. to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
12 12 misc Declaration Mon 09/30 9:03 AM
Declaration Defendant's Election Notice re Mediation (pursuant to ECF No 863 in Main BK Proceeding Case 22-46160 Filed by Defendant Reko International Group Inc. (Clayson, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
11 11 order stipulated order Fri 09/13 10:08 AM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for Reko International Group Inc, to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint Related [+]. (KEC)
Related: [-] 10 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan
Thursday, September 12, 2024
10 10 misc Stipulation Thu 09/12 3:05 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Kimberly R. Clayson Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order Extending Time for Reko International Group, Inc., to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 11, 2024
9 9 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 09/11 8:08 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Defendant Reko International Group Inc. (Clayson, Kimberly)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 09/11 8:00 AM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Defendant Reko International Group Inc. (Miller, Judith)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 30, 2024
7 7 order Extend (Sua Sponte) Fri 08/30 2:29 PM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for Reko International Group Inc, to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint to 9/20/2024 Related [+]. (jmk)
Related: [-] 6 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan
6 6 misc Stipulation Fri 08/30 1:01 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Kimberly R. Clayson Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order Extending Time for Reko International Group, Inc., to Respond to Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 08/07 4:01 PM
Summons Service Executed on REKO INTERNATIONAL GROUP INC 8/7/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 08/07 3:58 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Osipov, Yuliy)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 08/07 12:30 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Wed 08/07 10:53 AM
Summons Issued on REKO INTERNATIONAL GROUP INC Answer Due 09/6/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 08/07 10:53 AM
Adversary case 24-04339 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Kenneth Nathan against REKO INTERNATIONAL GROUP INC. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A