Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:22-bk-46160

Michigan Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Lisa S Gretchko
Case #: 2:24-ap-04342
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
Case Filed:Aug 07, 2024
Terminated:Jan 30, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
OLSTEN STAFFING SERVICES CORP
Represented By
OLSTEN STAFFING SERVICES CORP
contact info
Plaintiff
Kenneth Nathan
Represented By
Yuliy Osipov
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info
Jeffrey H. Bigelman
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info
David P. Miller
Osipov Bigelman, P.C.
contact info


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Wednesday, February 19, 2025
28 28 order Dismiss Adversary Proceeding (sorder) Thu 02/20 8:59 AM
Order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 27
27 27 motion Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding Wed 02/19 10:03 AM
Stipulated Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding By and Between David P. Miller and Henk Taylor . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 30, 2025
26 26 order Dismissing Adversary Proceeding (Compromise) Thu 01/30 11:22 AM
Upon Entry of the Order Approving the Application to Compromise in the Bankruptcy Case Entered on 01/29/2025, this Adversary Proceeding is Dismissed Without Prejudice. So Ordered by /s/ Judge Lisa S. Gretchko. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
utility Disposition of Adversary Thu 01/30 11:20 AM
Disposition of Adversary 2:24-ap-4342 : Settled. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
court Close Adversary Case Thu 01/30 11:23 AM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-4342 Closed. (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
25 25 court Copy of Thu 01/30 11:20 AM
Copy of: Order Authorizing Trustee to Compromise and Settle Claims Against Adecco, Inc. (AP 24-4334 and Olsten Staffing Services (AP 24-4342 (Filed in Bankruptcy Case 22-46160 (cmcl)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 20, 2025
24 24 order Extend (Sua Sponte) Tue 01/21 7:41 AM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for Olsten Staffing Services Corp to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint to 2/20/2025 Related [+]. (jmk)
Related: [-] 23 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan
23 23 misc Stipulation Mon 01/20 3:17 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Henk Taylor Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order Extending Time for Olsten Staffing Services Corp to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 28, 2024
22 22 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Fri 11/29 12:35 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 11/28/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 21 BNC Certificate of Mailing
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
21 21 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (Generic) Tue 11/26 12:25 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. A copy of this Related Document will be mailed by the BNC to Defendant's Attorney Henk Taylor 2555 E. Camelback Road, Suite 800 Phoenix, AZ 85016 Related [+] (nlt)
Related: [-] 20 Order to Extend
20 20 order Extend (Sua Sponte) Tue 11/26 12:22 PM
Stipulated Order Extending Time For Olsten Staffing Services Corp To Answer Plaintiff's Complaint Related [+]. (nlt)
Related: [-] 19 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan
Monday, November 25, 2024
19 19 misc Stipulation Mon 11/25 5:40 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Henk Taylor Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order Extending Time for Olsten Staffing Services Corp., to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Monday, November 04, 2024
18 18 misc Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Mon 11/04 11:15 AM
Notice of Pending Settlement of an Adversary Proceeding Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Sunday, October 13, 2024
17 17 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 10/14 12:24 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 10/13/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 16 BNC Certificate of Mailing
Friday, October 11, 2024
16 16 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (DETROIT CASE ONLY) Fri 10/11 2:18 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. A Copy of this Related Order will be mailed by the BNC to the Defendant, Olsten Staffing Services Corp c/o Warner Angle Hallam Jackson & Formanek PLC Attn. Henk Taylor, 2555 E. Camelback Road, Suite 800, Phoenix, AZ 85016 Related [+] (jmk)
Related: [-] 15 Stipulated Order
Thursday, October 10, 2024
15 15 order stipulated order Fri 10/11 8:10 AM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for Olsten Staffing Services Corp to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint. Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 14 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan
14 14 misc Stipulation Thu 10/10 3:29 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Henk Taylor Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order Extending Time for Olsten Staffing Services Corp to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Saturday, September 28, 2024
13 13 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Sun 09/29 12:26 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 09/28/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 12 BNC Certificate of Mailing
Thursday, September 26, 2024
12 12 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (DETROIT CASE ONLY) Thu 09/26 9:53 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing to Attorney for Defendant Henk Taylor, 2555 E. Camelback Rd, Ste 800, Phoenix, AZ 85016. Related [+] (nlt)
Related: [-] 11 Stipulated Order
Monday, September 23, 2024
11 11 order stipulated order Mon 09/23 4:56 PM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for Olsten Staffing Services Corp to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint Related [+]. (cmcl)
Related: [-] 10 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan
10 10 misc Stipulation Mon 09/23 11:01 AM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Henk Taylor Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order Extending Time for Olsten Staffing Services Corp to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Sunday, September 08, 2024
9 9 court BNC Certificate of Mailing Mon 09/09 12:27 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. Related [+] No. of Notices: 0. Notice Date 09/08/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 8 BNC Certificate of Mailing
Friday, September 06, 2024
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing (DETROIT CASE ONLY) Fri 09/06 3:14 PM
BNC Certificate of Mailing. A Copy of this Related Document will be mailed by the BNC to the Defendant, Olsten Staffing Services Corp c/o Warner Angle Hallam Jackson & Formanek PLC, Attn: Henk Taylor, 2555 E. Camelback Road, Suite 800, Phoenix, AZ 85016. Related [+] (jmk)
Related: [-] 7 Stipulated Order
7 7 order stipulated order Fri 09/06 3:08 PM
Stipulated Order Extending Time for Olsten Staffing Services Corp to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint Related [+]. (KEC)
Related: [-] 6 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan
6 6 misc Stipulation Fri 09/06 2:46 PM
Stipulation By and Between David P. Miller and Henk Taylor Re: Stipulation to Entry of Order Extending Time for Olsten Staffing Services Corp to Answer Plaintiff's Complaint . Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Wed 08/07 4:22 PM
Summons Service Executed on OLSTEN STAFFING SERVICES CORP 8/7/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
4 4 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 08/07 4:21 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Osipov, Yuliy)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Wed 08/07 12:32 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Plaintiff Kenneth Nathan. (Bigelman, Jeffrey)
Related: [-]
2 2 court Summons Issued (auto) Wed 08/07 11:07 AM
Summons Issued on OLSTEN STAFFING SERVICES CORP Answer Due 09/6/2024 (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Wed 08/07 11:06 AM
Adversary case 24-04342 (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)), (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)): Complaint by Kenneth Nathan against OLSTEN STAFFING SERVICES CORP. Receipt Number DEFERRED, Fee Amount of $ 350 is Deferred. (Miller, David)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A