Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:24-bk-11210

Nevada Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Hilary L Barnes
Case #: 2:24-ap-01066
Nature of Suit12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 06, 2024
Terminated:Feb 28, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A., A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION
701 S Carson St. Suite 200
Carson City, NV 89701
Represented By
JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.
contact info
Plaintiff
SHELLEY D KROHN, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE
PO Box 34690
LAS VEGAS, NV 89133
Represented By
JACOB L. HOUMAND
Houmand Law Firm, Ltd.
contact info
HOUMAND LAW FIRM LTD.
contact info
BRADLEY G SIMS
Houmand Law Firm, Ltd.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:06 PM PDT
Sunday, March 02, 2025
34 34 court BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Sun 03/02 9:42 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Related [+] No. of Notices: 2. Notice Date 03/02/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 32 Order of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (BNC)
Friday, February 28, 2025
33 33 court Close Adversary Case Fri 02/28 2:43 PM
Disposition and Closing of Adversary Case (ccc)
Related: [-]
32 32 orderad Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (BNC) Fri 02/28 2:41 PM
Order Approving Stipulation To Dismiss Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice Pursuant To Federal Rule Of Civil Procedure 41 And Federal Rule Of Bankruptcy Procedure 7041(BNC) Related [+] (ccc)
Related: [-] 30 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff SHELLEY D KROHN.
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Thursday, February 27, 2025
31 31 adv_misc Certificate of Service (ADV) Thu 02/27 2:39 PM
Certificate of Service of Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 7041 with Certificate of Service Filed by JACOB L. HOUMAND on behalf of SHELLEY D KROHN Related [+] (HOUMAND, JACOB)
Related: [-] 30 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff SHELLEY D KROHN.
30 30 adv_misc Stipulation (Adv) Thu 02/27 2:37 PM
Stipulation By SHELLEY D KROHN and Between J.P. MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 7041 Filed by JACOB L. HOUMAND on behalf of SHELLEY D KROHN (HOUMAND, JACOB)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 03, 2025
29 29 notice Entry of Order (Adv) Mon 02/03 3:17 PM
Notice of Entry of Order/Judgment with Certificate of Service Filed by BRADLEY G SIMS on behalf of SHELLEY D KROHN Related [+](SIMS, BRADLEY)
Related: [-] 27 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019.
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Monday, January 27, 2025
27 27 order Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 Mon 01/27 3:27 PM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 Related [+](ccc)
Related: [-] 19
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
26 26 1 pgs orderad Order (generic) (Adv) Mon 01/27 11:56 AM
Order Directing Trustee To Submit Proposed Order Granting Relief Requested Related [+] (ccc)
Related: [-] 19 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 filed by Plaintiff SHELLEY D KROHN.
Thursday, January 23, 2025
25 25 court Hearing Sched/Resched (BK) Thu 01/23 3:59 PM
Amended Hearing Scheduled/Rescheduled.Hearing scheduled 1/28/2025 at 02:30 PM at HLB Zoom Teleconference Line. Related [+] (nac)
Related: [-] 19 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 filed by Plaintiff SHELLEY D KROHN
24 24 adv_misc Certificate of Service (ADV) Thu 01/23 10:21 AM
Certificate of Service Filed by BRADLEY G SIMS on behalf of SHELLEY D KROHN Related [+] (SIMS, BRADLEY)
Related: [-] 19 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 filed by Plaintiff SHELLEY D KROHN.
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
23 23 court Notice of Docketing Error (Adv) (BNC) Wed 12/18 10:03 AM
Notice of Docketing Error Related [+] (ccc)
Related: [-] 19 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 filed by Plaintiff SHELLEY D KROHN,20 Declaration filed by Plaintiff SHELLEY D KROHN,21 Notice of Hearing filed by Plaintiff SHELLEY D KROHN.
22 22 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Adv) Wed 12/18 10:02 AM
Hearing Scheduled/Rescheduled. Hearing scheduled 1/28/2025 at 02:30 PM at HLB Zoom Teleconference Line. Related [+] (ccc)
Related: [-] 19 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 filed by Plaintiff SHELLEY D KROHN.
Tuesday, December 17, 2024
21 21 notice Hearing (Adv) Tue 12/17 4:15 PM
Notice of Hearing Hearing Date: 01/28/2025 Hearing Time: 2:30 p.m. Filed by BRADLEY G SIMS on behalf of SHELLEY D KROHN Related [+](SIMS, BRADLEY)
Related: [-] 19 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 filed by Plaintiff SHELLEY D KROHN.
20 20 adv_misc Declaration (ADV) Tue 12/17 4:14 PM
Declaration Of: Shelley D. Krohn In Support of Motion to Approve Compromise Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Filed by BRADLEY G SIMS on behalf of SHELLEY D KROHN Related [+] (SIMS, BRADLEY)
Related: [-] 19 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 filed by Plaintiff SHELLEY D KROHN.
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
19 19 motion Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 Tue 12/17 4:12 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 Filed by BRADLEY G SIMS on behalf of SHELLEY D KROHN (SIMS, BRADLEY)
Related: [-]
Thursday, December 12, 2024
18 18 orderad Stipulated/Agreed Order (Adv) Thu 12/12 8:11 AM
Stipulated/Agreed Order Related [+] (ccc)
Related: [-] 17 Stipulation filed by Defendant JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A..
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
17 17 adv_misc Stipulation (Adv) Wed 12/11 11:54 AM
Stipulation By JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. and Between Plaintiff, Shelley D. Krohn to Extend Time for JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA to Respond to the Complaint Filed by JOEL E. TASCA on behalf of JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. (TASCA, JOEL)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
16 16 orderad Stipulated/Agreed Order (Adv) Wed 11/27 2:03 PM
Stipulated/Agreed Order Related [+] (arv)
Related: [-] 15 Stipulation filed by Defendant JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A..
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
15 15 adv_misc Stipulation (Adv) Tue 11/26 2:08 PM
Stipulation By JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. and Between Plaintiff, Shelley D. Krohn to Extend Time for JP Morgan Chase Bank, NA to Respond to the Complaint Filed by JOEL E. TASCA on behalf of JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. (TASCA, JOEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
14 14 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference) Tue 11/19 8:37 AM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 1/29/2025 at 10:30 AM at HLB Zoom Teleconference Line. Related [+] (ccc)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff SHELLEY D KROHN.
13 13 orderad Stipulated/Agreed Order (Adv) Tue 11/19 8:36 AM
Stipulated/Agreed Order Related [+] (ccc)
Related: [-] 12 Stipulation filed by Defendant JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A..
Thursday, November 14, 2024
12 12 adv_misc Stipulation (Adv) Thu 11/14 3:00 PM
Amended Stipulation By JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. and Between Plaintiff, Shelley D. Krohn, the duly appointed Chapter 7 Trustee Filed by JOEL E. TASCA on behalf of JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. (TASCA, JOEL)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 05, 2024
11 11 adv_misc Stipulation (Adv) Tue 11/05 10:56 AM
Stipulation By JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. and Between Plaintiff, Shelley D. Krohn for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. to Respond to the Complaint Filed by JOEL E. TASCA on behalf of JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. (TASCA, JOEL)
Related: [-]
Friday, October 18, 2024
10 10 adv_misc Stipulation (Adv) Fri 10/18 3:54 PM
Stipulation By JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. and Between Shelley D. Krohn, Chapter 7 Trustee to Extend Time for JP Morgan to Respond to Complaint Filed by JOEL E. TASCA on behalf of JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. Related [+] (TASCA, JOEL)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff SHELLEY D KROHN.
Monday, September 30, 2024
9 9 adv_misc Stipulation (Adv) Mon 09/30 11:26 AM
Stipulation By JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. and Between Shelley D. Krohn, Chapter 7 Trustee to Extend Time for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. to Respond to the Complaint Filed by JOEL E. TASCA on behalf of JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. (TASCA, JOEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 12, 2024
8 8 orderad Stipulated/Agreed Order (Adv) Thu 09/12 9:16 AM
Stipulated/Agreed Order Related [+] (ccc)
Related: [-] 7 Stipulation filed by Defendant JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A..
Tuesday, September 10, 2024
7 7 misc Stipulation Tue 09/10 11:31 AM
Stipulation By JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. and Between Shelley D. Krohn, Chapter 7 Trustee to Extend Time for JP Morgan Chase Bank, N.A. to Respond to Complaint Filed by JOEL E. TASCA on behalf of JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. (TASCA, JOEL)
Related: [-]
Thursday, August 08, 2024
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 08/08 9:52 AM
Summons Service Executed on JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. 8/8/2024 Filed by BRADLEY G SIMS on behalf of SHELLEY D KROHN Related [+] (SIMS, BRADLEY)
Related: [-] 5 Summons Issued.
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
5 5 court Summons Issued Wed 08/07 3:45 PM
Summons Issued on JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. (ccc)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference) Wed 08/07 3:44 PM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 11/20/2024 at 10:30 AM at Remote. Related [+] (ccc)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff SHELLEY D KROHN.
3 3 crditcrd Auto-docket of online payment Wed 08/07 7:49 AM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Complaint([LINK 24-01066 hlb] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number A21932678, fee amount $ 350.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
2 2 cmp Request to Issue Summons Tue 08/06 2:12 PM
Request to Issue Summons On: JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A.. Filed by BRADLEY G SIMS on behalf of SHELLEY D KROHN (SIMS, BRADLEY)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 08/06 2:11 PM
Adversary case 24-01066 Complaint FOR: (1) AVOIDANCE OF PREFERENTIAL TRANSFER PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. § 547; (2) AVOIDANCE OF FRAUDULENT TRANSFER PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. § 544(b) AND NRS CHAPTER 112; (3) AVOIDANCE OF FRAUDULENT TRANSFER PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. § 548; AND (4) RECOVERY OF BANKRUPTCY ESTATE PROPERTY PURSUANT TO 11 US.C. § 550 Filed by SHELLEY D KROHN vs. JP MORGAN CHASE BANK, N.A. Fee Amount $350. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)(SIMS, BRADLEY)
Related: [-]