MED ED LABS
Nevada Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 7 | |
Judge: | Hilary L Barnes |
Case #: | 2:24-bk-11210 |
Case Filed: | Mar 15, 2024 |
Creditor Meeting: | Apr 17, 2024 |
Debtor
MED ED LABS
1631 E Sunset Rd Ste C104
Las Vegas, NV 89119-4965 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
Trustee
SHELLEY D KROHN
PO Box 34690
LAS VEGAS, NV 89133 |
|
U.S. Trustee
U.S. TRUSTEE - LV - 7
300 LAS VEGAS BOULEVARD, SO. SUITE 4300
LAS VEGAS, NV 89101 |
Docket last updated: 03/16/2024 12:22 AM PDT |
Friday, March 15, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 7 Voluntary Petition Non-Individual. Fee Amount $338. Filed by ZACHARIAH LARSON on behalf of MED ED LABS Appointment of Health Care Ombudsman due by 04/15/2024 (LARSON, ZACHARIAH) |
|
2 | 2
![]() Declaration Re: Electronic Filing Filed by ZACHARIAH LARSON on behalf of MED ED LABS (LARSON, ZACHARIAH) |
|
3 | 3
crditcrd
Auto-docket of online payment
Fri 03/15 12:11 PM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Voluntary Petition 7([LINK 24-11210 ) [misc,volp7pb] ( 338.00). Receipt number A21649847, fee amount $ 338.00 (U.S. Treasury) |
|
4 | 4
![]() |