Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:24-bk-11210

Nevada Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Hilary L Barnes
Case #: 2:24-ap-01068
Nature of Suit13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 06, 2024
Terminated:Mar 05, 2025
Last checked: never
Defendant
BARCLAYS BANK OF DELAWARE, A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION
125 SOUTH WEST STREET
WILMINGTON, DE 19801
Represented By
BARCLAYS BANK OF DELAWARE, A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION
contact info
Plaintiff
SHELLEY D KROHN, CHAPTER 7 TRUSTEE
PO Box 34690
LAS VEGAS, NV 89133
Represented By
JACOB L. HOUMAND
Houmand Law Firm, Ltd.
contact info
HOUMAND LAW FIRM LTD.
contact info
BRADLEY G SIMS
Houmand Law Firm, Ltd.
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 1:06 PM PDT
Friday, March 07, 2025
26 26 court BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Fri 03/07 9:41 PM
BNC Certificate of Notice - pdf Related [+] No. of Notices: 1. Notice Date 03/07/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-] 24 Order of Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (BNC)
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
25 25 court Close Adversary Case Wed 03/05 8:34 AM
Disposition and Closing of Adversary Case (ccc)
Related: [-]
24 24 orderad Dismissal of Adversary Proceeding (BNC) Wed 03/05 8:32 AM
Order Approving Stipulation To Dismiss Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice Pursuant ToFederal Rule Of Civil Procedure 41 And Federal Rule Of Bankruptcy Procedure 7041 (BNC) Related [+] (ccc)
Related: [-] 22 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff SHELLEY D KROHN.
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Tuesday, March 04, 2025
23 23 adv_misc Certificate of Service (ADV) Tue 03/04 7:13 AM
Certificate of Service of Stipulation to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 7041 with Certificate of Service Filed by JACOB L. HOUMAND on behalf of SHELLEY D KROHN Related [+] (HOUMAND, JACOB)
Related: [-] 22 Stipulation filed by Plaintiff SHELLEY D KROHN.
22 22 adv_misc Stipulation (Adv) Tue 03/04 7:11 AM
Stipulation By SHELLEY D KROHN and Between BARCLAYS BANK OF DELAWARE to Dismiss Adversary Proceeding With Prejudice Pursuant to Federal Rule of Civil Procedure 41 and Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 7041 Filed by JACOB L. HOUMAND on behalf of SHELLEY D KROHN (HOUMAND, JACOB)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
21 21 notice Entry of Order (Adv) Thu 01/23 5:56 PM
Notice of Entry of Order/Judgment Granting Motion to Approve Compromise Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 with Certificate of Service Filed by BRADLEY G SIMS on behalf of SHELLEY D KROHN Related [+](SIMS, BRADLEY)
Related: [-] 20 Order on Motion to Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019.
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
20 20 order Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 Thu 01/23 4:21 PM
Order Granting Motion to Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 Related [+](ccc)
Related: [-] 14
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
19 19 2 pgs orderad Order (generic) (Adv) Thu 01/23 8:52 AM
Order Directing Trustee To Submit Proposed Order Granting Relief Requested Related [+] (ccc)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 filed by Plaintiff SHELLEY D KROHN.
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
18 18 adv_misc Certificate of Service (ADV) Tue 01/14 3:04 PM
Certificate of Service Filed by BRADLEY G SIMS on behalf of SHELLEY D KROHN Related [+] (SIMS, BRADLEY)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 filed by Plaintiff SHELLEY D KROHN.
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
17 17 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Adv) Wed 12/11 11:48 AM
Hearing Scheduled/Rescheduled. Hearing scheduled 1/28/2025 at 02:30 PM at HLB Zoom Teleconference Line. Related [+] (ccc)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 filed by Plaintiff SHELLEY D KROHN.
Tuesday, December 10, 2024
16 16 notice Hearing (Adv) Tue 12/10 7:45 PM
Notice of Hearing Hearing Date: 01/28/2025 Hearing Time: 2:30 p.m. Filed by BRADLEY G SIMS on behalf of SHELLEY D KROHN Related [+](SIMS, BRADLEY)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 filed by Plaintiff SHELLEY D KROHN.
15 15 adv_misc Declaration (ADV) Tue 12/10 7:44 PM
Declaration Of: Shelley D. Krohn In Support of Motion to Approve Compromise Pursuant to Federal Rule of Bankruptcy Procedure 9019 Filed by BRADLEY G SIMS on behalf of SHELLEY D KROHN Related [+] (SIMS, BRADLEY)
Related: [-] 14 Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 filed by Plaintiff SHELLEY D KROHN.
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
14 14 motion Approve Compromise Under Rule 9019 Tue 12/10 7:43 PM
Motion to Approve Compromise under Rule 9019 Filed by BRADLEY G SIMS on behalf of SHELLEY D KROHN (SIMS, BRADLEY)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 19, 2024
13 13 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference) Tue 11/19 12:12 PM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 1/29/2025 at 10:30 AM at HLB Zoom Teleconference Line. Related [+] (ccc)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff SHELLEY D KROHN.
12 12 orderad Stipulated/Agreed Order (Adv) Tue 11/19 12:11 PM
Stipulated/Agreed Order Related [+] (ccc)
Related: [-] 10 Stipulation filed by Defendant BARCLAYS BANK OF DELAWARE, A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION.
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Stipulation to Continue Hearing
Friday, November 15, 2024
11 11 orderad Stipulated/Agreed Order (Adv) Fri 11/15 8:00 AM
Stipulated/Agreed Order Related [+] (ccc)
Related: [-] 9 Stipulation filed by Defendant BARCLAYS BANK OF DELAWARE, A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION.
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Stipulation Governing the Exchange and Protection of Confidential Information
Thursday, November 14, 2024
10 10 adv_misc Stipulation (Adv) Thu 11/14 2:00 PM
Stipulation By BARCLAYS BANK OF DELAWARE, A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION and Between Plaintiff-Trustee Shelley D. Krohn to Continue November 20, 2024 Scheduling Conference with Certificate of Service Filed by DAVID ERNESTO CHAVEZ on behalf of BARCLAYS BANK OF DELAWARE, A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION (CHAVEZ, DAVID)
Related: [-]
9 9 adv_misc Stipulation (Adv) Thu 11/14 1:33 PM
Stipulation By BARCLAYS BANK OF DELAWARE, A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION and Between Plaintiff-Trustee Shelley D. Krohn to Continue November 20, 2024 Scheduling Conference with Certificate of Service Filed by DAVID ERNESTO CHAVEZ on behalf of BARCLAYS BANK OF DELAWARE, A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION (CHAVEZ, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 13, 2024
8 8 misc Statement of Corporate Ownership Fri 09/13 8:17 AM
Corporate Ownership Statement Corporate parents added to case: Barclays Bank, PLC, Barclays Group US Inc., Barclays US LLC, Barclays, PLC. with Certificate of Service Filed by DAVID ERNESTO CHAVEZ on behalf of BARCLAYS BANK OF DELAWARE, A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION (CHAVEZ, DAVID)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 06, 2024
7 7 answer Answer to Complaint Fri 09/06 3:18 PM
Answer to Complaint Related [+] Filed by DAVID ERNESTO CHAVEZ on behalf of BARCLAYS BANK OF DELAWARE, A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION (CHAVEZ, DAVID)
Related: [-] 1
Thursday, August 08, 2024
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Thu 08/08 10:19 AM
Summons Service Executed on BARCLAYS BANK OF DELAWARE, A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION 8/8/2024 Filed by BRADLEY G SIMS on behalf of SHELLEY D KROHN Related [+] (SIMS, BRADLEY)
Related: [-] 5 Summons Issued.
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Wednesday, August 07, 2024
5 5 court Summons Issued Wed 08/07 3:14 PM
Summons Issued on BARCLAYS BANK OF DELAWARE, A NATIONAL BANKING ASSOCIATION (ccc)
Related: [-]
4 4 court Hearing Sched/Resched (Scheduling Conference) Wed 08/07 3:13 PM
Scheduling Conference scheduled for 11/20/2024 at 10:30 AM at Remote. Related [+] (ccc)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff SHELLEY D KROHN.
3 3 crditcrd Auto-docket of online payment Wed 08/07 7:49 AM
Receipt of Filing Fee for Complaint([LINK 24-01068 hlb] ) [cmp,cmp] ( 350.00). Receipt number A21932678, fee amount $ 350.00 Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1
Tuesday, August 06, 2024
2 2 cmp Request to Issue Summons Tue 08/06 2:32 PM
Request to Issue Summons On: BARCLAYS BANK OF DELAWARE, NA. Filed by BRADLEY G SIMS on behalf of SHELLEY D KROHN (SIMS, BRADLEY)
Related: [-]
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 08/06 2:22 PM
Adversary case 24-01068 Complaint FOR: (1) AVOIDANCE OF FRAUDULENT TRANSFER PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. § 544(b) AND NRS CHAPTER 112; (2) AVOIDANCE OF FRAUDULENT TRANSFER PURSUANT TO 11 U.S.C. § 548; AND (3) RECOVERY OF BANKRUPTCY ESTATE PROPERTY PURSUANT TO 11 US.C. § 550 Filed by SHELLEY D KROHN vs. BARCLAYS BANK OF DELAWARE, NA Fee Amount $350. (13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)(SIMS, BRADLEY)
Related: [-]