Adversary Proceeding
Lead BK case is: 2:24-bk-20002

Maine Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Peter G Cary
Case #: 2:24-ap-02006
Nature of Suit2 Bankruptcy - Other
12 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §547 preference
13 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - §548 fraudulent transfer
14 Bankruptcy - Recovery of money/property - other
Case Filed:Aug 09, 2024
Terminated:Oct 02, 2024
Last checked: never
Defendant
Green SIP Construction Inc.
110 Marginal Way Unit 193
Portland, ME 04101
Represented By
Green SIP Construction Inc.
contact info
Defendant
James F Schmidt
4 Middle Road
Cumberland, ME 04021
Represented By
James F Schmidt
contact info
Defendant
Marlene H Eaton
4 Middle Road
Cumberland, ME 04021
Represented By
Marlene H Eaton
contact info
Plaintiff
Nathaniel R. Hull, Esq., Plaintiff
Represented By
Randy J. Creswell, Esq.
Creswell Law
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/16/2025 1:07 PM EDT
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
9 9 court Close Adversary Case Wed 10/02 12:33 PM
Adversary Case 2:24-ap-2006 has been closed administratively, but not pursuant to 11 U.S.C. 350(a). Additional pleadings, motions and other papers may be filed in this adversary proceeding without filing a motion to re-open. (rmp)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Stipulation of Dismissal Wed 10/02 9:40 AM
Stipulation of Dismissal with Certificate of Service Filed by Nathaniel R. Hull, Esq. Related [+]. (Creswell, Randy)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Nathaniel R. Hull, Esq.
utility Disposition of Adversary Wed 10/02 12:30 PM
Disposition of Adversary. (rmp)
Related: [-]
Saturday, August 10, 2024
7 7 cmp Summons Service Executed Sat 08/10 8:55 AM
Summons Service Executed on Marlene H Eaton 8/10/2024 .. (Creswell, Randy)
Related: [-]
6 6 cmp Summons Service Executed Sat 08/10 8:55 AM
Summons Service Executed on James F Schmidt 8/10/2024 .. (Creswell, Randy)
Related: [-]
5 5 cmp Summons Service Executed Sat 08/10 8:54 AM
Summons Service Executed on Green SIP Construction Inc. 8/10/2024 .. (Creswell, Randy)
Related: [-]
Friday, August 09, 2024
4 4 court Summons Issued Fri 08/09 2:33 PM
Summons Issued on Marlene H Eaton Date Issued 8/9/2024, Answer Due 9/9/2024; Green SIP Construction Inc. Date Issued 8/9/2024, Answer Due 9/9/2024; James F Schmidt, dba Capital Structures Date Issued 8/9/2024, Answer Due 9/9/2024 Related [+]. Pre-Trial Conference set for 10/29/2024 at 09:00 AM at Bankruptcy Courtroom, Portland. Rule 26(f) Report due by 10/22/2024. (rmp) Modified on 8/9/2024 (rmp)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Nathaniel R. Hull, Esq.
3 3 misc Document Fri 08/09 2:18 PM
Adversary Cover Sheet (signed) Filed by Nathaniel R. Hull, Esq. Related [+]. (Creswell, Randy)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Nathaniel R. Hull, Esq.
2 2 court Entry Fri 08/09 1:59 PM
Entry - The adversary cover sheet has been filed without plaintiff's counsel's signature. Related [+]. (rmp)
Related: [-] 1 Complaint filed by Plaintiff Nathaniel R. Hull, Esq.
1 1 cmp Complaint ** Use Open an AP Case to Open Adversary ** Fri 08/09 9:05 AM
Adversary case 24-02006 Complaint by Nathaniel R. Hull, Esq. against Green SIP Construction Inc., James F Schmidt, Marlene H Eaton. Fee Amount $ 350.. (12 (Recovery of money/property - 547 preference)),(13 (Recovery of money/property - 548 fraudulent transfer)),(14 (Recovery of money/property - other)),(02 (Other (e.g. other actions that would have been brought in state court if unrelated to bankruptcy))) (Creswell, Randy)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A (547 Green SIP)
Att: 2 Exhibit B (547 Schmidt)
Att: 3 Exhibit C (544 & 548 Green SIP)
Att: 4 Exhibit D (544 & 548 Schmidt)
Att: 5 Adv Proc Cover Sheet