Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:J Kate Stickles
Case #: 1:24-bk-11686
Case Filed:Aug 12, 2024
Plan Confirmed:Feb 28, 2025

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors200-999
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Blink Holdings, Inc.
45 West 45th Street, 10th Floor
New York, NY 10036
Represented By
Timothy R. Powell
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Allison S Mielke
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Sean T. Greecher
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor
contact info
Benjamin C. Carver
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Michael R. Nestor
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor
contact info
Rebecca L Lamb
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor LLP
contact info
Last checked: Friday Feb 07, 2025 11:27 AM EST
Claims Agent
Epiq Corporate Restructuring, LLC
www.epiqsystems.com 777 Third Avenue, 12th Floor
New York, NY 10017
Cred. Comm. Chair
GS FIT ILL-1 LLC
P.O.Box 9511
Jackson, WY 83001
Cred. Comm. Chair
Motionsoft, Inc.
600 University Park Place Suite 500
Birmingham, AL 35223
Cred. Comm. Chair
FW IL-Riverside/Rivers Edge, LLC
One Independent Drive Suite 114
Jacksonville, FL 32202
Cred. Comm. Chair
Johnson Health Tech NA, Inc.
1600 Landmark Drive
Cottage Grove, WI 53527
Cred. Comm. Chair
Johnson Health Tech North America, Inc.
1600 Landmark Drive
Cottage Grove, WI 53527
Cred. Comm. Chair
96 N. 10th Street Holdings LLC
100 Challenger Road Suite 105
Rigefield Park, NJ 07660
Creditor
KRE Broadway Owner LLC
Represented By
Gary Meltzer
contact info
Scott Adam Steinberg
Meltzer, Lippe, Goldstein & Breitstone, LLP
contact info
Karen C. Bifferato
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc.
Buchalter, a Professional Corporation c/o Shawn M. Christianson, Esq. 425 Market St., Suite 2900
San Francisco, CA 94105
Represented By
Shawn M. Christianson
Buchalter PC
contact info
Creditor
MBB Realty LImited Partnership
Sirlin Lesser & Benson, P.C. 123 South Broad Street, Suite 2100
Philadelphia, PA 19109
Represented By
Dana S. Plon
Sirlin Lesser & Benson, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Lodi Value Add II, LLC
Represented By
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Creditor
Linden Commons Retail LLC
Sirlin Lesser & Benson, P.C. 123 South Broad Street, Suite 2100
Philadelphia, PA 19109
Represented By
Dana S. Plon
Sirlin Lesser & Benson, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Levin Properties, LP
Represented By
Joseph H Lemkin
Stark & Stark
contact info
Joseph C. Barsalona II
Pashman Stein Walder Hayden, P.C.
contact info
Joseph Charles Barsalona II
Pashman Stein Walder Hayden, P.C.
contact info
Thomas Onder
C/o Stark & Stark, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Levin Management Corporation
Represented By
Joseph H Lemkin
Stark & Stark
contact info
Eric S. Goldstein
Shipman & Goodwin LLP
contact info
Thomas Onder
C/o Stark & Stark, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Kimco Realty Corporation
Represented By
Rachel B. Mersky
Monzack Mersky Mclaughlin & Browder, PA
contact info
Creditor
PSEG Long Island
Represented By
William F. Taylor, Jr
Whiteford, Taylor & Preston LLC
contact info
John M. Craig
Law Firm Of Russell R. Johnson Iii, PLC
contact info
Creditor
K/BTF Broadway LLC
Represented By
Scott Adam Steinberg
Meltzer, Lippe, Goldstein & Breitstone, LLP
contact info
Karen C. Bifferato
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Creditor
Houston ISD
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o Tara L. Grundemeier PO Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
Tara L. Grundemeier
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Houston Community College System
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o Tara L. Grundemeier PO Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
Tara L. Grundemeier
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Grand Baldwin Associates
Represented By
Richard Zucker
Lasser Hochman, L.L.C.
contact info
Creditor
Rancho Marketplace Gateway, LLC
Represented By
Dana Robbins
Burr & Forman LLP
contact info
Justin Cory Falgowski
Burr & Forman LLP
contact info
J. Ellsworth Summers, Jr.
Burr & Forman LLP
contact info
Creditor
5111 4th Ave Equity Realty
Represented By
Frederick Brian Rosner
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info
Creditor
Marlon Williams
1521 Concord Pike Suite 305
Wilmington, DE 19803
Represented By
Louis J. Rizzo, Jr.
Reger Rizzo & Darnall LLP
contact info
Creditor
Vornado 692 Broadway LLC
Represented By
Michael Joseph Joyce
The Law Offices Of Joyce, LLC
contact info
Creditor
UE Bergen Mall Owner LLC
Represented By
Laurel D. Roglen
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Margaret A. Vesper
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Creditor
Tarrant County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o John Kendrick Turner 2777 N. Stemmons Freeway Suite 1000
Dallas, TX 75207
Represented By
Tara L. Grundemeier
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP
contact info
John Kendrick Turner
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
TD Equipment Finance, Inc.
100 American Metro Blvd.
Hamilton, NJ 08619
Represented By
Timothy Duggan
Stark & Stark
contact info
Creditor
Southern California Edison Company
Represented By
William F. Taylor, Jr
Whiteford, Taylor & Preston LLC
contact info
John M. Craig
Law Firm Of Russell R. Johnson Iii, PLC
contact info
Creditor
Site Centers
100 American Metro Blvd.
Hamilton, NJ 08619
Represented By
Joseph H Lemkin
Stark & Stark
contact info
Joseph Lemkin
Stark & Stark, P.C.
contact info
Thomas Onder
C/o Stark & Stark, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Sam Spilkes, LLC
Represented By
Darren A. Pascarella
Farrell Fritz, P.C.
contact info
Patrick T. Collins
Farrell Fritz, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
PPC Commercial, LLC
UB Greensfelder LLP 1660 West 2nd Street, Suite 1100
Cleveland, OH 44113
Represented By
Michael S. Tucker
Ulmer & Berne LLP
contact info
Creditor
Public Service Electric And Gas Company
Represented By
William F. Taylor, Jr
Whiteford, Taylor & Preston LLC
contact info
John M. Craig
Law Firm Of Russell R. Johnson Iii, PLC
contact info
Creditor
Primestor Jordan Downs, LLC
Represented By
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Creditor
Platinum Gym Two, Inc.
Represented By
Albena Petrakov
Offit Kurman, P.A.
contact info
Brian J. McLaughlin
Offit Kurman, PA
contact info
Creditor
Platinum Gym One, Inc.
Represented By
Albena Petrakov
Offit Kurman, P.A.
contact info
Brian J. McLaughlin
Offit Kurman, PA
contact info
Creditor
Pinnacle US Holdings LLC
Represented By
Whit Morley
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Ted A. Dillman
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
G. David Dean
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
George A Davis
Latham & Watkins LLP
contact info
Norman L. Pernick
Cole Schotz P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Philadelphia Harbison, LP
Represented By
Monique Bair DiSabatino
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
Turner Falk
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
Creditor
Panos Fitness LLC
Represented By
Colin R. Robinson
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Creditor
Hartford Fire Insurance Company
Represented By
Gary D. Bressler
Mcelroy, Deutsch, Mulvaney & Carpenter, LLP
contact info
Michael R. Morano
Mcelroy, Deutsch, Mulvaney & Carpenter
contact info
Virginia T. Shea, Esq.
Mcelroy Deutsch Mulvaney & Carpenter LLC
contact info
Scott A. Levin
Mcelroy, Deutsch, Mulvaney & Carpenter, LLP
contact info
Creditor
GoodEarth Distribution, LLC
600 North King Street, Suite 800
Wilmington, DE 19801
Creditor
3560 WPR LLC
Represented By
Morgan L. Patterson
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Creditor
16302 Jamaica Avenue LLC
Represented By
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Creditor
3572 WPR LLC
Represented By
Morgan L. Patterson
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Creditor
480 Suffolk Avenue, LLC
Represented By
R. Grant Dick, IV
Cooch And Taylor, P.A.
contact info
Kevin Levitsky
Cooch And Taylor, P.A.
contact info
Sophia A Perna-Plank
C/o Jaspan Schlesinger LLP
contact info
Creditor
15519 Normandie, LLC
Represented By
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Creditor
78-14 Roosevelt LLC
Represented By
Charles E. Boulbol
Charles E. Boulbol, PC
contact info
Creditor
AI California LLC
Represented By
James E Rossow, Jr
Blackwell, Burke, Fowler & Rossow, P.C.
contact info
Karen C. Bifferato
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Creditor
Brixmor Holdings 12 SPE, LLC
Represented By
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Creditor
Brixmor Operating Partnership LP
Represented By
Laurel D. Roglen
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Leslie C. Heilman
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Margaret A. Vesper
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Creditor
125 Park Owner LLC, c/o SL Green Realty Corp.
Represented By
Andrew K Glenn
Glenn Agre Bergman & Fuentes LLP
contact info
Malak S. Doss
Glenn Agre Bergman & Fuentes LLP
contact info
Creditor
Broadhollow/Pinelawn CW NF LLC
Represented By
Damien Nicholas Tancredi
Flaster/greenberg P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Fort Bend Independent School District
Represented By
Melissa E. Valdez
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins & Mott
contact info
Tara L. Grundemeier
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Commonwealth Edison Company
Represented By
William F. Taylor, Jr
Whiteford, Taylor & Preston LLC
contact info
John M. Craig
Law Firm Of Russell R. Johnson Iii, PLC
contact info
Creditor
Consolidated Edison Company Of New York, Inc.
Represented By
William F. Taylor, Jr
Whiteford, Taylor & Preston LLC
contact info
John M. Craig
Law Firm Of Russell R. Johnson Iii, PLC
contact info
Creditor
DT Route 22 Retail, LLC
100 American Metro Blvd.
Hamilton, NJ 08619
Represented By
Joseph H Lemkin
Stark & Stark
contact info
Thomas Onder
C/o Stark & Stark, P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Fort Bend County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o Tara L. Grundemeier P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
Tara L. Grundemeier
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Equinox Group, LLC and Equinox Holdings Inc.
Represented By
Ricardo Palacio, Esq
Ashby & Geddes, P. A.
contact info
Lisa M. Schweitzer
Cleary Gottlieb Steen & Hamilton
contact info
Destiny A. Kosloske
Ashby & Geddes, P.A.
contact info
Thomas Kessler
contact info
Creditor
City of Houston
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o Tara L. Grundemeier PO Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
Tara L. Grundemeier
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Eclipse Capital LLC and BEC Capital Corp.
Represented By
Colin R. Robinson
Pachulski Stang Ziehl & Jones LLP
contact info
Creditor Committee
Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
Richard Gage
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Randall L. Morrison
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
John Ramirez
Kelly Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Siena Cerra
Morris James LLP
contact info
Brya Michele Keilson
Morris James LLP
contact info
William S. Gyves
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Andres Barajas
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Eric J. Monzo
Morris James LLP
contact info
Connie Y. Choe
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Eric R. Wilson
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Kristin Elliott
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Supreme Orange LLC
Represented By
Jonathan T. Koevary
Olshan Frome Wolosky LLP
contact info
Scott D. Cousins
Lewis Brisbois
contact info
Interested Party
HCL Long Point, LLC
Represented By
Susan E. Kaufman
Law Office Of Susan E. Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Interested Party
1413 Stathan Realty LLC
369 Lexington Avenue 12th Floor
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Douglas J Pick
Pick & Zabicki LLP
contact info
Interested Party
130-20 Farmers LLC
369 Lexington Avenue 12th Floor
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Douglas J Pick
Pick & Zabicki LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Varagon Capital Partners Agent, LLC, as Prepetition Agent and DIP Agent
Represented By
Avery Meng
Morris Nichols Arsht And Tunnell
contact info
Terence G. Banich
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Curtis S. Miller
Morris Nichols Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Echo Yi Qian
Morris Nichols Arsht And Tunnell
contact info
Allison E Yager
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Peter P. Knight
Katten Muchin Rosenman LLP
contact info
Interested Party
The Theatre Building Enterprises, LLC
Represented By
Frederick Brian Rosner
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info
Jay B. Solomon
Belkin Burden Goldman, LLP
contact info
Jay B Solomon
Belkin Burden Goldman, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Third Avenue Tower Owner LLC
Represented By
Frederick Brian Rosner
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info
Zhao Liu
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info
Interested Party
108-18 LLC
369 Lexington Avenue 12th Floor
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Douglas J Pick
Pick & Zabicki LLP
contact info
Interested Party
RW 5901 Flatlands LLC
369 Lexington Avenue 12th Floor
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Douglas J Pick
Pick & Zabicki LLP
contact info
Interested Party
5 Bryant Park Property Investors IV, LLC
Represented By
Bethany D. Simmons
Loeb & Loeb LLP
contact info
Joshua Brooks
Landis Rath & Cobb LLP
contact info
Interested Party
833 Flat LLC
369 Lexington Avenue 12th Floor
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Douglas J Pick
Pick & Zabicki LLP
contact info
Interested Party
BANK OF AMERICA, N.A.
Represented By
Jacob Johnson
Alston & Bird LLP
contact info
Stephen Mark Blank
Alston & Bird LLP
contact info
Matthew P. Ward
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Boerum Place LLC
Represented By
Frederick Brian Rosner
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Motionsoft, Inc.
Represented By
R. Grant Dick, IV
Cooch And Taylor, P.A.
contact info
Kevin D. Levitsky
Cooch And Taylor, P.A.
contact info
James B Bailey
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Brooks Shopping Centers, LLC
LeClairRyan 545 Long Wharf Drive, 9th Floor
New Haven, CT 06511
Represented By
Susan E. Kaufman
Law Office Of Susan E. Kaufman, LLC
contact info
Interested Party
CP Associates LLC
CP Associates LLC c/o Leech Tishman Robinson Brog, PLLC One Dag Hammarskjold Plaza 885 Second Avenue, 3rd Floor
New York, NY 10017
Represented By
Clement Yee
Leech Tishman Robinson Brog PLLC
contact info
Jeffrey M. Carbino
Pierson Ferdinand LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Chelsea W26 LLC
Represented By
Frederick Brian Rosner
The Rosner Law Group LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Daxko, LLC
Represented By
R. Grant Dick, IV
Cooch And Taylor, P.A.
contact info
James B Bailey
Bradley Arant Boult Cummings LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Johnson Health Tech NA, Inc.
Represented By
Jeffery P. Phillips
Murphy Desmond S.C.
contact info
John Henry Knight
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Zachary J. Javorsky
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Matthew P. Milana
Richards, Layton & Finger
contact info
John H. Knight
Richards Layton & Finger. P.A.
contact info
Transcriber
Reliable Companies
1007 North Orange Street Suite 110
Wilmington, DE 19801
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Benjamin A. Hackman
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 44 minutes ago
Friday, April 25, 2025
880 880 10 pgs misc Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report Fri 04/25 7:42 PM
Chapter 11 Post-Confirmation Report for the Quarter Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by Burton Hastings Advisors LLC. (Monzo, Eric)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 23, 2025
879 879 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Wed 04/23 12:12 PM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Omnibus Order Approving Final Fee Applications of the Debtors' Professionals for the Period From August 12, 2024 Through and Including February 28, 2025 Related [+] Filed by Blink Holdings, Inc.. (Powell, Timothy)
Related: [-] 865 ,866 ,867
Att: 1 4 pgs Exhibit