Blink 130 W.G. Street, Inc.
Member Case
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-11686
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-11686
Delaware Bankruptcy Court | |
Chapter 11 | |
Judge: | J Kate Stickles |
Case #: | 1:24-bk-11802 |
Case Filed: | Aug 12, 2024 |
Type | Corporation |
Tax ID | subscribers only |
# of Creditors | 200-999 |
Est. Assets | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Est. Liabilities | $100,000,001 to $500 million |
Nature of Business | Other |
Nature of Debts | Primarily Business |
Debtor
Blink 130 W.G. Street, Inc.
45 W 45th St Fl 10
New York, NY 10036-4602 |
Represented By
|
Last checked: never |
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801 |
Docket last updated: 72 minutes ago |
Tuesday, September 10, 2024 | ||
4 | 4
![]() Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs, Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Blink 130 W.G. Street, Inc.. (Mielke, Allison) |
|
Wednesday, August 14, 2024 | ||
3 | 3
crditcrd
none
Wed 08/14 9:39 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-11802 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number A11739079, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury) |
|
Tuesday, August 13, 2024 | ||
2 | 2
![]() Order Authorizing Joint Administration An order has been entered in this case directing the procedural consolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Blink Holdings, Inc. (6354); 692 Broadway Fitness Club, Inc. (8592); Bergen Town Center Fitness Club, Inc (8809); Blink 101 W 87th Street, Inc. (3466); Blink 1060 W Alameda, Inc. (5606); Blink 1065 6th Avenue, Inc. (9542); Blink 108-14 Roosevelt, Inc. (7158); Blink 1134 Fulton, Inc. (0654); Blink 116th Street, Inc. (9666); Blink 12201 Victory Blvd, Inc. (1199); Blink 125 Park, Inc. (4457); Blink 125th Street, Inc. (2332); Blink 130 W.G. Street, Inc. (3849); Blink 16123 Bellflower Blvd., Inc. (5389); Blink 16th Street, Inc. (2999); Blink 18th Avenue, Inc. (9117); Blink 19500 Plummer, Inc. (4631); Blink 2192 Texas Parkway, Inc. (5470); Blink 229 E. Foothill Boulevard, Inc. (5426); Blink 2374 Grand Concourse, Inc. (7144); Blink 2465 Jerome Inc. (3660); Blink 2862 Fulton Street, Inc. (6152); Blink 287 Broadway, Inc. (9864); Blink 2883 3rd Avenue, Inc. (9327); Blink 3779 Nostrand, Inc. (1412); Blink 56-02 Roosevelt, Inc. (8357); Blink 600 Third Avenue, Inc. (5006); Blink 69th Street Inc. (3652); Blink 78-14 Roosevelt, Inc. (3657); Blink 79th Holdings Inc. (9310); Blink 8201 Broadway, Inc. (6273); Blink 833 Flatbush, Inc. (2397); Blink 886 Broadway, Inc. (7471); Blink 88th Street, Inc. (2665); Blink 97-01 Northern Blvd., Inc. (8749); Blink 98th Street, Inc. (2583); Blink 9901 S. Alameda, Inc. (1345); Blink Abrams Road Inc. (0711); Blink Airline Drive, Inc. (5358); Blink Amboy Road Inc. (7652); Blink Ashland Avenue, Inc. (8290); Blink Ashland Inc. (4185); Blink Atlantic Ave LB Inc. (5172); Blink Atlantic Avenue, Inc. (1483); Blink Avenue A, Inc. (0310); Blink Baldwin, Inc. (7913); Blink Beach Street, Inc. (7941); Blink Bedford, Inc. (4165); Blink Belleville Inc. (1832); Blink Bissonnet, Inc. (1686); Blink Braddock Avenue Inc. (2603); Blink Brentwood, Inc. (6468); Blink Broadway Marketplace, Inc. (0800); Blink Brookhurst, Inc. (4151); Blink Clifton, Inc. (6972); Blink Commercial Boulevard, Inc. (1645); Blink Company Intermediate Holdco Inc. (7929); Blink Compton & Central Avenue, Inc. (4958); Blink Concourse Holdings, Inc. (5698); Blink Courtesy Plaza Inc. (5160); Blink Deerwood Inc. (2616); Blink Diversey, Inc. (5520); Blink East 54th Street, Inc. (4661); Blink East Orange, Inc. (4847); Blink East Tremont Avenue, Inc. (5251); Blink Eighth Avenue, Inc. (9235); Blink Farmers Boulevard Inc. (7517); Blink Fitness Franchising, Inc. (8012); Blink Fitness Rialto Inc. (6020); Blink Flatlands Avenue, Inc. (7211); Blink Fourth Avenue, Inc. (2535); Blink Frankford Avenue, Inc. (3685); Blink Fulton Street, Inc. (3329); Blink Gage Park LLC (1110); Blink Gates, Inc. (9927); Blink Georgetown Inc. (2616); Blink Hawthorne, Inc. (2856); Blink Hicksville, Inc. (1155); Blink Highway 249, Inc. (2871); Blink Holdings II, Inc. (8470); Blink Irvington Inc. (1528); Blink Islandia, Inc. (2358); Blink Jamaica Avenue, Inc. (4871); Blink Jerome Avenue, Inc. (8960); Blink Journal Square, Inc. (4829); Blink Keller, Inc. (3569); Blink Kendall Market Place Inc. (8310); Blink Kenwood, Inc. (8594); Blink Knickerbocker, Inc. (8698); Blink KWT Holdco LLC (8279); Blink Liberty Avenue, Inc. (6505); Blink Linden, Inc. (8706); Blink Lodi, Inc. (0640); Blink Long Point, Inc. (7415); Blink Macombs Road, Inc. (8701); Blink Melville, Inc. (5999); Blink Metropolitan Avenue, Inc. (9721); Blink Miramar Parkway Inc. (2458); Blink Myrtle Avenue, Inc. (5639); Blink Nassau Street, Inc. (0767); Blink Newark, Inc. (8064); Blink Normandie Avenue, Inc. (4950); Blink North 10th Street Corp. (9850); Blink North Riverside LLC (6520); Blink Nostrand Avenue, Inc. (1259); Blink NRH, Inc. (0472); Blink Nutley, Inc. (8946); Blink Pacific Boulevard, Inc. (3403); Blink Parsippany, Inc. (9122); Blink Passaic, Inc. (3994); Blink Paterson, Inc. (7879); Blink Perth Amboy, Inc. (0715); Blink Plainfield, Inc. (0363); Blink Richmond Road, Inc. (5108); Blink Ridgeland Ave., Inc. (3664); Blink Riverdale, Inc. (0560); Blink Selden, Inc. (0221); Blink SER Portfolio, Inc. (6426); Blink South Orange, Inc. (9363); Blink Southern Boulevard, Inc. (7202); Blink St. Anns Avenue, Inc. (0908); Blink Steinway Street, Inc. (3766); Blink Stonebrook, Inc. (3967); Blink Sunset Park, Inc. (2888); Blink Union, Inc. (8825); Blink Utica Avenue, Inc. (0078); Blink Valley Stream, Inc. (7539); Blink Webster Avenue, Inc. (0528); Blink West 31st Street, Inc. (1806); Blink West 8th Street, Inc. (9404); Blink West Islip, Inc. (4932); Blink Westchase Inc. (2685); Blink White Plains, Inc. (2614); Blink Whitman, Inc. (8935); Blink Williamsbridge, Inc. (3963); Blink Willingboro, Inc. (0171); Blink Wissinoming, Inc. (3005); Cross County Fitness Club, Inc. (6540). The docket in the chapter 11 case of Blink Holdings, Inc., Case No. 24-11686 (JKS), should be consulted for all matters affecting this case.Signed on 8/13/2024 (AJL) |
|
Monday, August 12, 2024 | ||
1 | 1
![]() Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by Blink 130 W.G. Street, Inc.. (Greecher, Sean) |
|
court
Case Assigned
Mon 08/12 9:12 AM
Judge J Kate Stickles added to case (SH) |