Texas Western Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Shad Robinson
Case #: 1:24-bk-10968
Case Filed:Aug 16, 2024
Creditor Meeting:Sep 20, 2024
Claims Deadline:Dec 20, 2024

Debtor
Classic Soft Trim, LLC
1841 S Lakeline Blvd
Cedar Park, TX 78613-4600
Represented By
Kannon Moore
contact info
Last checked: never
Trustee
Randolph N Osherow
342 W Woodlawn, Suite 100
San Antonio, TX 78212


Docket last updated: 03/18/2025 2:26 PM CDT
Friday, August 16, 2024
1 1 7 pgs misc Voluntary Petition Chapter 7 Fri 08/16 2:44 PM
Voluntary Petition under Chapter 7 (Non-Individual) Without Schedules, Without Statements, (Filing Fee: $ 338) Filed By Classic Soft Trim, LLC. -Declaration for Electronic Filing due by 08/23/2024 (Moore, Kannon) Modified on 8/19/2024 to edit text (without)(Benitez, Estella)
Related: [-]
2 2 court 341 Meeting 7 (Business No Asset) Fri 08/16 2:44 PM
Meeting of Creditors & Notice of Appointment of Interim Trustee Osherow, Randolph N added to the case. with 341(a) meeting to be held on 9/20/2024 at 09:00 AM at Zoom - Osherow: Meeting ID 366 703 6877, Passcode 8572973665, OR call 210-675-8716. (Moore, Kannon)
Related: [-]