Original Case: 2:23-cv-02273

Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv-02556
Typecivil / private / civil rights
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Aug 23, 2024
Terminated:Jan 03, 2025
Last checked: Monday Jan 06, 2025 5:08 AM EST
Defendant - Appellee
THOMAS A. LEONARD
Represented By
Mathieu Shapiro
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
WILLIAM JUDGE
Represented By
Joseph F. Kampherstein III
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
Michael B. Pullano
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
STEVEN PARKINSON
Represented By
Guy A. Donatelli
Lamb McErlane
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
BRIDGET GALLOWAY OWEN
Represented By
Guy A. Donatelli
Lamb McErlane
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
FREDDA MADDOX
Represented By
Guy A. Donatelli
Lamb McErlane
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ENRICO PAGANELLI
Represented By
Paul C. Troy
Kane Pugh Knoell Troy & Kramer
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DAVID LADOV
Represented By
Mathieu Shapiro
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MELISSA BLANCO
Represented By
Mathieu Shapiro
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
NICHOLAS PODUSLENKO
Represented By
Mathieu Shapiro
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MATHIEU SHAPIRO
Represented By
Mathieu Shapiro
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DAVID A. NASATIR
Represented By
Mathieu Shapiro
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
HILLARY J. MOONAY
Represented By
Mathieu Shapiro
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DEBBIE HUNTER
Represented By
Guy A. Donatelli
Lamb McErlane
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ROSANA CASTRO
Represented By
Guy A. Donatelli
Lamb McErlane
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DEB RYAN
Represented By
Joseph F. Kampherstein III
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
Michael B. Pullano
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
BRET M. BINDER
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
URVE MAGGITTI
Represented By
Urve Maggitti
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/06/2025 5:08 AM EST
Friday, August 23, 2024
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (LMR)
Related: [-]
Notice received from the district court that the docketing and filing fees were paid by the appellant on 08/21/2024. (LMR)
Related: [-]
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Urve Maggitti in District Court No. 2-23-cv-02273. (LMR)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 3 pgs Case Opening Letter
Att: 2 1 pgs Case Caption
Att: 3 11 pgs Notice of Appeal
Att: 4 6 pgs ORDER
1 pgs NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (LMR)
Related: [-]
9 pgs Copy of Amended Notice of Appeal filed 08/21/2024 received from Clerk of District Court. (LMR)
Related: [-]
1 pgs ORDER (Clerk) for all parties represented by Michael Daley, Esq. the designated filer shall be Bret M. Binder. (LMR)
Related: [-]