Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Kelley Brisbon Hodge
Case #: 2:23-cv-02273
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983 Civil Rights Act
Case Filed:Jun 14, 2023
Last checked: Monday Dec 11, 2023 4:02 AM EST
Defendant
SHOHIN H. VANCE
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
SCOTT B. COOPER
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
BRIDGET GALLOWAY OWEN
Represented By
GUY A. DONATELLI
Lamb & Mcerlane, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
BRET M. BINDER
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
ANNA M. CIARDI
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
THOMAS J. FARRELL
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
THOMAS A. LEONARD III
Represented By
MELISSA M. BLANCO
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
MATHIEU J. SHAPIRO
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel LLP
contact info
Defendant
TARA MOBLEY
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
SUZANNE E. PRICE
Defendant
DAVID N. WECHT
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
DAVID S. SENOFF
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
ROSANA CASTRO
Represented By
GUY A. DONATELLI
Lamb & Mcerlane, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
HON. ROBERT L. REPARD
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
RAYMOND S. WIERCISZEWSKI
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
RAMONA M. MARIANI
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
NICHOLAS PODUSLENKO
Represented By
MELISSA M. BLANCO
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
MATHIEU J. SHAPIRO
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel LLP
contact info
Defendant
NANCY L. CLEMENS
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
MOTION'S JUDGE(S)
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
WILLIAM JUDGE
Represented By
MICHAEL B. PULLANO
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
JOSEPH F. KAMPHERSTEIN, III
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Defendant
WILLIAM C. WENNER
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
ANTHONY T. VERWEY
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
DEBRA TODD
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
STEVEN PARKINSON
Represented By
GUY A. DONATELLI
Lamb & Mcerlane, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
SALLIE UPDYKE MUNDY
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
SUDHIR R. PATEL
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
JACK A. PANELLA
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
P. KEVIN BROBSON
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
AMY DREIBELBIS
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
WILLIAM P. MAHON
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
MARC J. LIEBERMAN
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
BENJAMIN D. KOHLER
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
KEVIN M. DOUGHERTY
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
RENEE COHN JUBELIRER
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
JOHN HALL
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
MARTIN G. GOCH
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
SUSAN P. GANTMAN
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
DEBBIE HUNTER
Represented By
GUY A. DONATELLI
Lamb & Mcerlane, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
JERRY M. LEHOCKY
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
JANA M. PALKO
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
JAMES M. FOX
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
HILLARY J. MOONAY
Represented By
MELISSA M. BLANCO
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
MATHIEU J. SHAPIRO
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel LLP
contact info
Defendant
HAROLD E. CIAMPOLI, JR.
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
GRETCHEN A. MUNDORFF
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
FREDDA L. MADDOX
Represented By
GUY A. DONATELLI
Lamb & Mcerlane, P.C.
contact info
Defendant
ENRICO PAGANELLI
Represented By
PAUL C. TROY
Kane Pugh Knoell Troy & Kramer
contact info
Defendant
DION G. RASSIAS
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
DEB RYAN
Represented By
MICHAEL B. PULLANO
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
JOSEPH F. KAMPHERSTEIN, III
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Defendant
DAVID LADOV
Represented By
MELISSA M. BLANCO
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
MATHIEU J. SHAPIRO
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel LLP
contact info
Defendant
DAVID A. NASATIR
Represented By
MELISSA M. BLANCO
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
MATHIEU J. SHAPIRO
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel LLP
contact info
Defendant
DANIEL E ROLAND
Represented By
MICHAEL B. PULLANO
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
JOSEPH F. KAMPHERSTEIN, III
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith LLP
contact info
Defendant
DANA C. BELELLA
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
CHRISTOPHER M. MILLER
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
CELESTE L. DEE
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
ANTHONY P. SODROSKI
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
ANDREW E. MASICH, PH.D.
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
JESSE G. HEREDA
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
MICHAEL BRUNELLE
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
MELISSA BLANCO
Represented By
MELISSA M. BLANCO
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
MATHIEU J. SHAPIRO
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel LLP
contact info
Defendant
MATHIEU J. SHAPIRO
Represented By
MELISSA M. BLANCO
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
MATHIEU J. SHAPIRO
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel LLP
contact info
Defendant
LAURA K. MOHNEY
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
LAURA E. ELLSWORTH
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
KRISTA K. BEATTY
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
KIMBERLY M. HENDERSON
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
JOSHUA M. BLOOM
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
JOHN C. RAFFERTY, JR.
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Movant
Nancy L. Clemens
815 BOWERS BRIDGE ROAD
Manchester, PA 17345
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Plaintiff
URVE MAGGITTI
58 E. SWEDESFORD ROAD APT. 327
MALVERN, PA 19355
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
CHRISTINE DONOHUE
Terminated: 10/03/2023
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
REV. JAMES P. MCCLOSKEY
Terminated: 10/03/2023
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
JOHN P. CAPUZZI SR
Terminated: 10/03/2023
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court Of PA
contact info
Defendant
JOSEPH U. METZ
Terminated: 09/07/2023
Defendant
MARCEE D. SLOAN
Terminated: 09/07/2023
Defendant
JUDGE THOMAS E. FLAHERTY
Terminated: 09/07/2023
Defendant
JUDGE SONYA M. TILGHMAN
Terminated: 09/07/2023
Defendant
JUDGE RONALD S. MARSICO, PJ
Terminated: 09/07/2023
Defendant
JUDGE JILL RANGOS
Terminated: 09/07/2023
Defendant
JUDGE DANIEL E. BARANOSKI
Terminated: 09/07/2023
Defendant
JUDGE DANIEL D. MCCAFFERY
Terminated: 09/07/2023
Defendant
JUDGE CHARLES L. BECKER
Terminated: 09/07/2023

GPO Dec 01 2023
MEMORANDUM AND/OR OPINION. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 12/1/23. 12/1/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )
GPO Dec 01 2023
ORDER AS FOLLOWS THAT IN CIVIL ACTION NO. 23-1184, A. DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS (DOC. NOS. 16, 17) ARE GRANTED. B. PRO SE PLAINTIFFS COMPLAINT (DOC. NO. 1) IS DISMISSED. C. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CLOSE THE CASE. D. ALL REMAINING OPEN MOTIONS WILL BE DENIED AS MOOT. 2. IN CIVIL ACTION NO. 23-2273, A. DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS (DOC. NOS. 17, 21, 27, 33, 38, 39) ARE GRANTED. B. PLAINTIFFS PRO SE AMENDED COMPLAINT (DOC. NO. 5) IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. 3. IN CIVIL ACTION NO. 23-3185, A. DEFENDANTS MOTIONS TO DISMISS (DOC. NOS. 10, 12) ARE GRANTED. B. PLAINTIFFS PRO SE COMPLAINT (DOC. NO. 1) IS DISMISSED. C. THE CLERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO CLOSE THE CASE. D. ALL REMAINING OPEN MOTIONS WILL BE DENIED AS MOOT. 3 4. IN CIVIL ACTION NO. 23-4349, A. PLAINTIFFS PRO SE COMPLAINT (CIV. NO. 23-4359, DOC. NO. 1) IS DISMISSED WITHOUT PREJUDICE. 5. PLAINTIFF IS GRANTED LEAVE TO FILE ONE (1) AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN THIRTY (30) DAYS OF THIS ORDER ENCOMPASSING CIVIL ACTION NOS. 23-2273 AND 23-4349. BECAUSE THESE ACTIONS ARE CONSOLIDATED, PLAINTIFF SHOULD FILE THE AMENDED COMPLAINT ONLY UNDER CIVIL ACTION NO. 23-2273. SIGNED BY HONORABLE JOEL H. SLOMSKY ON 12/1/23. 12/1/23 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(jaa, )

Docket last updated: 2 hours ago
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
153 153 appeal USCA Order Tue 04/08 4:38 PM
ORDER of USCA as to137 Notice of Appeal filed by URVE MAGGITTI THAT THE APPEAL IS DISMISSED FOR LACK OF APPELLATE JURISDICTION. IN LIGHT OF OUR DISPOSITION, MAGGITTI'S MOTIONS FOR A STAY OF THE DISTRICT COURT PROCEEDINGS AND FOR EXPEDITED BRIEFING ARE DENIED. TO THE EXTENT THAT SHE REQUESTS ANY OTHER RELIEF, IT IS DENIED (ahf)
Related: [-]