Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Karen B Owens
Case #: 1:24-bk-11985
Case Filed:Sep 09, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Edgio, Inc.
11811 North Tatum Boulevard Suite 3031
Phoenix, AZ 85028
Represented By
Dennis F Dunne
Milbank LLP
contact info
Colin Meehan
Richards, Layton & Finger
contact info
Andrew M. Leblanc
Milbank LLP
contact info
Emily Rae Mathews
Richards, Layton & Finger
contact info
Erin E. Dexter
Milbank LLP
contact info
Russell C. Silberglied
Richards, Layton & Finger
contact info
Eric S. Siegel
Dechert LLP
contact info
Lauren C. Doyle
Milbank LLP
contact info
Huiqi Liu
Richards, Layton & Finger
contact info
Matthew P. Milana
Richards, Layton & Finger
contact info
Brendan Joseph Schlauch
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Brett Philip Lowe
Milbank, Tweed, Hadley & Mccloy LLP
contact info
Jordan Rosen
Milbank LLP
contact info
Kerri Matulis
Milbank LLP
contact info
Mark D. Collins
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Benjamin Max Schak
Milbank LLP
contact info
Tyson M. Lomazow
Milbank LLP
contact info
Gabrielle Colson
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
contact info
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 15, 2025 5:26 PM EDT
Attorney
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
Represented By
William E. Chipman, Jr.
Chipman Brown Cicero & Cole, LLP
contact info
Attorney
Chipman Brown Cicero & Cole, LLP
Represented By
William E. Chipman, Jr.
Chipman Brown Cicero & Cole, LLP
contact info
Attorney
Richards, Layton & Finger, P.A.
Attorney
Milbank LLP
Claims Agent
Omni Agent Solutions, Inc.
www.omniagentsolutions.com 5955 DeSoto Avenue, Suite #100
Woodland Hills, CA 91367
Cred. Comm. Chair
NTT America f/k/a NTT Data
One Penn Plaza Suite 4920 1 Pennsylvania Plaza
New York, NY 10119
Cred. Comm. Chair
EdgeUno, Inc
1200 Ponce de Leon Unit 900
Miami, FL 33134
Represented By
Dennis A. Meloro
Greenberg Traurig, P.A
contact info
Nathan A. Haynes
Greenberg Traurig, LLP
contact info
Cred. Comm. Chair
Computacenter United States, Inc
6025 The Corners Parkway Suite 100
Norcross, GA 30032
Cred. Comm. Chair
Encore Technologies
4620 Wesley Avenue
Cincinnati, OH 45212
Represented By
Jason V. Stitt
Keating Muething & Klekamp Pll
contact info
Cred. Comm. Chair
Tencent Cloud, LLC
2140 S. Dupont Hwy
Camden, DE 19934
Cred. Comm. Chair
Equinix, Inc.
1133 Avenue of the Americas 16th Floor
New York, NY 10036
Cred. Comm. Chair
Verizon Sourcing LLC
22001 Loudoun County Parkway
Ashburn, VA 20147
Creditor
Seabras 1 USA, LLC
Represented By
AnnElyse Scarlett Gains
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Michael G. Farag
Gibson, Dunn & Crutcher LLP
contact info
Creditor
Netrality Properties LP
Jeffrey Kurtzman,Esquire 101 N Washington Avenue 101 N Washington Avenue
Margate, NJ 08402
Represented By
Jeffrey Kurtzman
Kurtzman Steady LLC
contact info
Creditor
Life Insurance Company of North America
Represented By
Jeffrey C. Wisler
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Creditor
North Broad Lessee, LLC
Jeffrey Kurtzman,Esquire 101 N Washington Avenue 101 N Washington Avenue
Margate, NJ 08402
Represented By
Jeffrey Kurtzman
Kurtzman Steady LLC
contact info
William J. Burnett
Flaster/greenberg P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Lexon Insurance Company
Represented By
Laurel LaLone
The Powell Firm, LLC
contact info
Brian D. Roy
Harris Beach PLLC
contact info
Lee Woodard
Harris Beach PLLC
contact info
Jason Custer Powell
The Powell Firm
contact info
Creditor
KC Telco LLC
Jeffrey Kurtzman,Esquire 101 N Washington Avenue 101 N Washington Avenue
Margate, NJ 08402
Represented By
Jeffrey Kurtzman
Kurtzman Steady LLC
contact info
William J. Burnett
Flaster/greenberg P.C.
contact info
Creditor
Operating Subsidiaries of Verizon Communications Inc.
Represented By
Darrell W. Clark
Stinson Morrison Hecker LLP
contact info
Tracey Michelle Ohm
Stinson LLP
contact info
William F. Taylor, Jr
Whiteford, Taylor & Preston LLC
contact info
Creditor
Oracle America, Inc.
Buchalter, a Professional Corporation c/o Shawn M. Christianson, Esq. 425 Market St., Suite 2900
San Francisco, CA 94105
Represented By
Mark Magnozzi
The Magnozzi Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Benjamin Rachelson
The Magnozzi Law Firm PC
contact info
Amish R. Doshi
Doshi Legal Group, P.C.
contact info
James E. Huggett
Margolis Edelstein
contact info
Shawn M. Christianson
Buchalter PC
contact info
Creditor
Microsoft Corporation
Fox Rothschild LLP c/o David P. Papiez 1001 4th Ave Suite 4400
Seattle, WA 98154
Represented By
Stephanie Slater Ward
Fox Rothschild LLP
contact info
Creditor
Sony Interactive Entertainment, Inc. f/k/a Sony Computer Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By
Kurt F. Gwynne
Reed Smith LLP
contact info
Cameron A. Capp
contact info
Creditor
State of Michigan Department of Treasury
3030 W. Grand Blvd. Suite 10-200
Detroit, MI 48202
Represented By
Jeanmarie Miller
Michigan Department Of Treasury
contact info
Creditor
TN Dept of Revenue
Bankruptcy Division P.O. Box 20207
Nashville, TN 37202
Represented By
Laura L. McCloud
Tennessee Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Creditor
Texas Comptroller of Public Accounts, Revenue Accounting Division
Represented By
Jamie Kirk
Texas Office Of Attorney General
contact info
Creditor
Texas Taxing Authorities
Represented By
Melissa E. Valdez
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins & Mott
contact info
Creditor
Verizon Entities
Represented By
William F. Taylor, Jr
Whiteford, Taylor & Preston LLC
contact info
Creditor
Comcast Cable Communiations Management, LLC
Represented By
Matthew G. Summers
Ballard Spahr LLP
contact info
Creditor
Proximus PLC
Represented By
Morgan L. Patterson
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Creditor
You Cast Comrcio de Equipamentos Eletrnicos Ltda
Represented By
Michael Joseph Joyce
The Law Offices Of Joyce, LLC
contact info
Creditor
Hivelocity LLC
Represented By
Katherine Devanney
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Katherine M. Devanney
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Shanti M. Katona
Polsinelli PC
contact info
Creditor
AmTrust North America, Inc. on behalf of Wesco Insurance Company
23611 Chagrin Blvd. Suite 207
Beachwood, OH 44122
Represented By
Alan C. Hochheiser
Maurice Wutscher LLP
contact info
Creditor
CITY OF HOUSTON
Represented By
Melissa E. Valdez
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins & Mott
contact info
Creditor
Cigna Health and Life Insurance Company
Represented By
Jeffrey C. Wisler
Connolly Gallagher LLP
contact info
Creditor
Computacenter Fusionstorm Inc. FKA FusionStorm
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC c/o Geoffrey G. Grivner 500 Delaware Avenue, Ste. 720
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Geoffrey G. Grivner
Buchanan Ingersoll & Rooney PC
contact info
Creditor
Cypress-Fairbanks ISD
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o Tara L. Grundemeier P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
Tara L. Grundemeier
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP
contact info
Creditor
Dallas County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP c/o John K. Turner 2777 N. Stemmons Fwy, Ste. 1000
Dallas, TX 75207
Represented By
Tara L. Grundemeier
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP
contact info
John Kendrick Turner
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson, LLP
contact info
Creditor
Digital Realty Trust, Inc.
Represented By
Tara L. Lattomus
Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott LLC
contact info
Alexandra Dixon Rogin
Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellot, LLC
contact info
Creditor
Digital Realty Trust, L.P.,
Represented By
Tara L. Lattomus
Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellott LLC
contact info
Alexandra Dixon Rogin
Eckert Seamans Cherin & Mellot, LLC
contact info
Creditor
EdgeConneX Holdings, LLC
Represented By
Mark Iver Duedall
Baker, Donelson, Bearman, Caldwell & Berkowitz, PC
contact info
Creditor
EdgeNext North America Corporation
Attn: Debra A. Dandeneau 452 Fifth Avenue
New York, NY 10018
Represented By
Debra A Dandeneau
Baker & Mckenzie LLP
contact info
Creditor
Endurance American Insurance Company
Represented By
Laurel LaLone
The Powell Firm, LLC
contact info
Lee Woodard
Harris Beach PLLC
contact info
Jason Custer Powell
The Powell Firm
contact info
Creditor
EdgeUno, Inc.
Represented By
Michael Joseph Joyce
The Law Offices Of Joyce, LLC
contact info
Creditor
Equinix, Inc.
Represented By
Lucian Borders Murley
Saul Ewing LLP
contact info
Creditor
JCOM Co., Ltd
Represented By
Charles Stephen Kelley
Mayer Brown LLP
contact info
Creditor
Harris County
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP c/o Tara L. Grundemeier P.O. Box 3064
Houston, TX 77253
Represented By
Tara L. Grundemeier
Linebarger Goggan Blair & Sampson LLP
contact info
Creditor Committee
Committee of Unsecured Creditors
Represented By
James S. Carr
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Jason R. Adams
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Connie Y. Choe
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
William E. Chipman, Jr.
Chipman Brown Cicero & Cole, LLP
contact info
Jason Adams
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
John Ramirez
Kelly Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Philip A. Weintraub
Kelley Drye & Warren LLP
contact info
Mark D. Olivere
Chipman Brown Cicero & Cole, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
BCE Nexxia Corporation
Represented By
Siena Cerra
Morris James LLP
contact info
Brya Michele Keilson
Morris James LLP
contact info
Jonathan S. Hawkins
Thompson Hine LLP
contact info
Aleia M. Hornsby
Thompson Hine LLP
contact info
Interested Party
MongoDB, Inc.
Represented By
Marcy J. McLaughlin Smith
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Interested Party
AT&T Services, Inc., AT&T Mobility II, LLC, and their affiliates
Represented By
Tamara K. Mann
Morris, Nicholas, Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Austin Park
Morris Nichols Arsht And Tunnell
contact info
James W. Grudus
At&t Services, Inc.
contact info
Nicole Gladden Matthews
contact info
Derek C. Abbott
Morris, Nichols, Arsht & Tunnell
contact info
Interested Party
John Ruggiano
152 Irwin St
Brooklyn, NY 11235
Interested Party
Commonwealth of Pennsylvania
Department of Labor and Industry Collections Support Unit P.O. Box 68568
Harrisburg, PA 17121
Interested Party
PwC US Tax LLP
Interested Party
Akamai Technologies Inc
Represented By
Garvan F. McDaniel
Hogan Mcdaniel
contact info
Edward J McNeilly
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
Todd M. Schwartz
Hogan Lovells Us LLP
contact info
George Hofmann
Cohne Kinghorn, P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
DRNC Holdings, Inc., an affiliate of InterDigital Inc.
Represented By
Eric S. Siegel
Dechert LLP
contact info
Robert S. Brady
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Eric Hilmo
Dechert LLP
contact info
Allan S. Brilliant
Dechert LLP
contact info
Robert F. Poppiti, Jr.
Young, Conaway, Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Stuart Steinberg
Dechert LLC
contact info
Christopher M Lambe
Young Conaway Stargatt & Taylor, LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Wind Tre S.p.A. con Socio Unico
Represented By
Scott D. Cousins
Lewis Brisbois
contact info
Interested Party
Deutsche Telekom North America, Inc.
Represented By
David M. Klauder
Bielli & Klauder, LLC
contact info
Interested Party
Bell Canada
Represented By
Siena Cerra
Morris James LLP
contact info
Brya Michele Keilson
Morris James LLP
contact info
Jonathan S. Hawkins
Thompson Hine LLP
contact info
Aleia M. Hornsby
Thompson Hine LLP
contact info
Interested Party
U.S. Bank Trust Company, National Association, as Trustee and Collateral Agent
One Constitution Plaza
Hartford, CT 06103
Represented By
Anthony Scarcella
Shipman & Goodwin LLP
contact info
David B. Stratton
Pashman Stein Walder Hayden, P.C.
contact info
Kathleen M. LaManna
Shipman & Goodwin LLP
contact info
Alexis R. Gambale
Pashman Stein Walder Hayden, P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
Peter Frouws
Represented By
Christopher Page Simon
Cross & Simon, LLC
contact info
Cornelia Gordon
Scott + Scott
contact info
Emilie B Kokmanian
Scott + Scott
contact info
Michael Seth Etkin
Lowenstein Sandler LLP
contact info
Deborah Clark-Weintraub
Scott + Scott
contact info
Nicole M. Fulfree
Lowenstein Sandler
contact info
Interested Party
Tencent Cloud LLC
Represented By
Matthew P. Ward
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Todd Allan Atkinson
Womble Bond Dickinson (us) LLP
contact info
Interested Party
LiquidPixels, Inc.
Represented By
Scott J. Leonhardt
Esbrook P.C.
contact info
Interested Party
Lynrock Lake Master Fund LP
Represented By
Joseph Szydlo
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Meredith A. Lahaie
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
David B. Stratton
Pashman Stein Walder Hayden, P.C.
contact info
Alexis R. Gambale
Pashman Stein Walder Hayden, P.C.
contact info
Michael S. Stamer
Akin Gump Strauss Hauer & Feld LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Jason Meinzer
Represented By
Carl N. Kunz, III
Morris James LLP
contact info
Interested Party
Deutsche Telekom North America
Represented By
Matthew E. Wilkins
Brooks Wilkins Sharkey & Turco PLLC
contact info
Interested Party
Richardson ISD
Perdue Brandon Fielder et al 500 E Border Street, Suite 640
Arlington, TX 76010
Represented By
Elizabeth Banda Calvo
Perdue Brandon Fielder Collins & Mott
contact info
Other Prof.
PwC US Business Advisory LLP
Other Prof.
Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC
Represented By
William E. Chipman, Jr.
Chipman Brown Cicero & Cole, LLP
contact info
Other Prof.
Riveron RTS, LLC
Other Prof.
TD Securities (USA) LLC
Transcriber
Reliable Companies
1007 North Orange Street Suite 110
Wilmington, DE 19801
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801
Represented By
Richard L. Schepacarter
Office Of The United States Trustee
contact info
Jane M. Leamy
Office Of The U.S. Trustee
contact info


Docket last updated: 7 minutes ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
963 963 misc Transcript Thu 05/08 10:03 AM
Transcript regarding Hearing Held 05/06/25 RE: Omnibus/ Disclosure Statement Hearing. Remote electronic access to the transcript is restricted until 8/6/2025. The transcript may be viewed at the Bankruptcy Court Clerk's Office after 8/6/2025. For information about how to obtain a transcript, Contact the Court Reporter/Transcriber, Reliable, at Telephone number 302-654-8080. Filed by Edgio, Inc. . Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Deadline Due By 5/15/2025. Redaction Request Due By 5/29/2025. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 6/9/2025. Transcript access will be restricted through 8/6/2025. (KAR)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
962 962 misc Affidavit/Declaration of Service Wed 05/07 7:30 PM
Affidavit/Declaration of Service re: Certification of Counsel Regarding Order Authorizing the Debtors to Reject Certain Executory Contracts and/or Unexpired Leases [Docket No. 936] and Order Authorizing the Debtors to Reject Certain Executory Contracts and/or Unexpired Leases [Docket No. 941] . Filed by Omni Agent Solutions, Inc.. Related [+] (Lowry, Randy)
Related: [-] 936 ,941
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
961 961 claims Objection to Claim Tue 05/06 5:53 PM
Objection to Claim by Claimant(s) (Debtors' Objection to Proofs of Claim Filed by CoolTVNetwork.com, Inc. and Franz Wakefield).. Filed by Edgio, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 6/13/2025 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. Objections due by 5/27/2025. (Mathews, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit A
Att: 3 Exhibit B
Att: 4 Exhibit C
Att: 5 Exhibit D
Att: 6 Exhibit E
Att: 7 Exhibit F
Att: 8 Exhibit G
Att: 9 Exhibit H
960 960 9 pgs notice Confirmation Hearing(Chapter 11) - Notice Tue 05/06 2:57 PM
Notice of Confirmation Hearing (Notice of (I) Approval of Disclosure Statement; (II) Establishment of Voting Record Date; (III) Hearing on Confirmation of the Plan; (IV) Confirmation Objection Procedures; and (V) Procedures and Deadline for Voting on the Plan) Filed by Edgio, Inc.. Confirmation Hearing scheduled for 6/13/2025 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Schlauch, Brendan)
Related: [-]
959 959 121 pgs plan Amended Disclosure Statement Tue 05/06 2:36 PM
Amended Disclosure Statement (Disclosure Statement for Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization of Edgio, Inc. and Its Affiliated Debtors) - Solicitation Version Related [+] Filed by Edgio, Inc. (Schlauch, Brendan)
Related: [-] 852 ,951 ,958
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
958 958 plan Amended Chapter 11 Plan Tue 05/06 2:12 PM
Amended Chapter 11 Plan (Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization of Edgio, Inc. and Its Affiliated Debtors) - Solicitation Version Related [+] Filed by Edgio, Inc. (Schlauch, Brendan)
Related: [-] 851 ,950
957 957 18 pgs order Approve Tue 05/06 1:46 PM
Order (I) Approving Disclosure Statement, (II) Establishing Solicitation and Voting Procedures, (III) Scheduling Confirmation Hearing, (IV) Establishing Notice and Objection Procedures for Confirmation of Plan, (V) Approving Assumption and Cure Procedures and (VI) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Order Signed on 5/6/2025. (Mml)
Related: [-] 893 ,947 ,950 ,951 ,952 ,956
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
Att: 5 Exhibit 5
Att: 6 Exhibit 6
Att: 7 Exhibit 7
956 956 misc Certification of Counsel(Aty) Tue 05/06 11:51 AM
Certification of Counsel Regarding Further Revised Order (I) Approving Disclosure Statement, (II) Establishing Solicitation and Voting Procedures, (III) Scheduling Confirmation Hearing, (IV) Establishing Notice and Objection Procedures for Confirmation of Plan, (V) Approving Assumption and Cure Procedures and (VI) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Filed by Edgio, Inc.. (Liu, Huiqi)
Related: [-] 851 ,852 ,893 ,947 ,950 ,951
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
955 955 1 pgs audio Tue 05/06 10:00 AM
Court Date & Time [05/06/2025 09:31:35 AM]. File Size [ 7008 KB ]. Run Time [ 00:14:44 ]. (admin)
Related: [-]
954 954 court Hearing Held Tue 05/06 9:55 AM
In-Person/Zoom Hearing Held Related [+] (Mml)
Related: [-] 953
Friday, May 02, 2025
953 953 5 pgs notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice Fri 05/02 8:00 PM
Amended Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Related [+] Filed by Edgio, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/6/2025 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Liu, Huiqi)
Related: [-] 948
952 952 misc Exhibit Fri 05/02 6:51 PM
Exhibit(s) (Notice of Filing of Blacklines of (I) Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization of Edgio, Inc. and Its Affiliated Debtors and (II) Disclosure Statement for Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization of Edgio, Inc. and Its Affiliated Debtors) Related [+] Filed by Edgio, Inc.. (Meehan, Colin)
Related: [-] 851 ,852 ,950 ,951
Att: 1 74 pgs Exhibit A
Att: 2 127 pgs Exhibit B
951 951 121 pgs plan Amended Disclosure Statement Fri 05/02 6:19 PM
Amended Disclosure Statement (Disclosure Statement for Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization of Edgio, Inc. and Its Affiliated Debtors) Related [+] Filed by Edgio, Inc. (Schlauch, Brendan)
Related: [-] 852 ,950
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
Att: 2 Exhibit 2
Att: 3 Exhibit 3
Att: 4 Exhibit 4
950 950 73 pgs plan Amended Chapter 11 Plan Fri 05/02 6:00 PM
Amended Chapter 11 Plan (Joint Chapter 11 Plan of Reorganization of Edgio, Inc. and Its Affiliated Debtors) Related [+] Filed by Edgio, Inc. (Schlauch, Brendan)
Related: [-] 851
949 949 notice Withdrawal of Appearance - Notice Fri 05/02 3:39 PM
Notice of Withdrawal of Appearance. James E. Huggett, Esq. has withdrawn from the case. Filed by Oracle America, Inc.. (Huggett, James)
Related: [-]
948 948 5 pgs notice Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing - Notice Fri 05/02 11:54 AM
Notice of Agenda of Matters Scheduled for Hearing Filed by Edgio, Inc.. Hearing scheduled for 5/6/2025 at 09:30 AM at US Bankruptcy Court, 824 Market St., 6th Fl., Courtroom #3, Wilmington, Delaware. (Liu, Huiqi)
Related: [-]
947 947 3 pgs misc Exhibit Fri 05/02 11:28 AM
Exhibit(s) (Notice of Filing of Revised Order (I) Approving Disclosure Statement, (II) Establishing Solicitation and Voting Procedures, (III) Scheduling Confirmation Hearing, (IV) Establishing Notice and Objection Procedures for Confirmation of Plan, (V) Approving Assumption and Cure Procedures and (VI) Granting Related Relief) Related [+] Filed by Edgio, Inc.. (Meehan, Colin)
Related: [-] 893
Att: 1 72 pgs Exhibit 1
Att: 2 71 pgs Exhibit 2
946 946 2 pgs misc Exhibit Fri 05/02 10:28 AM
Exhibit(s) (Notice of Filing of Letter from the Official Committee of Unsecured Creditors Regarding Debtors' Chapter 11 Plan) Related [+] Filed by Edgio, Inc.. (Meehan, Colin)
Related: [-] 851
Att: 1 3 pgs Exhibit A
Thursday, May 01, 2025
945 945 misc Exhibit Thu 05/01 6:13 PM
Exhibit(s) (Amended Notice of Filing Amendments to Schedule E/F (Creditors Who Have Unsecured Claims) of Debtor Edgio, Inc. (Case No. 24-11985 ) Related [+] Filed by Edgio, Inc.. (Liu, Huiqi)
Related: [-] 140 ,195 ,196 ,845 ,846
944 944 motion Compensation - Application (Attorney) Thu 05/01 4:18 PM
Monthly Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Chipman Brown Cicero & Cole, LLP for the period from March 1, 2025 to March 31, 2025 (Sixth) Filed by Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Objections due by 5/21/2025. (Chipman, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Application
Att: 2 Exhibit A - Summary of Services Rendered
Att: 3 Exhibit B - Time Detail
Att: 4 Certificate of Service
943 943 order Authorize Thu 05/01 3:59 PM
Order (I) Authorizing Shareholder Consents to Local Proceedings of Certain Non-Debtor Subsidiaries and (II) Granting Related Relief Related [+] Order Signed on 5/1/2025. (Mml)
Related: [-] 897 ,934
942 942 motion Compensation - Application (Attorney) Thu 05/01 2:54 PM
Application for Compensation Seventh Monthly Application of Riveron RTS, LLC for Allowance of Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses for the period March 1, 2025 to March 31, 2025 Filed by Riveron RTS, LLC. Objections due by 5/21/2025. (Mathews, Emily)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice
Att: 2 Exhibit A
941 941 4 pgs order Order Thu 05/01 1:09 PM
Order Authorizing the Debtors to Reject Certain Executory Contracts and/or Unexpired Leases Related [+] Order Signed on 5/1/2025. (Mml)
Related: [-] 603 ,888 ,936
Att: 1 Exhibit 1
940 940 motion Compensation - Application (Attorney) Thu 05/01 1:02 PM
Monthly Application for Compensation and Reimbursement of Expenses of Alvarez & Marsal North America, LLC as Financial Advisor for the period from March 1, 2025 to March 31, 2025 (Sixth) Filed by Committee of Unsecured Creditors. Objections due by 5/21/2025. (Chipman, William)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Notice of Application
Att: 2 Exhibits A through E
Att: 3 Certificate of Service