Member Case
Lead case is: 1:24-bk-11985

Delaware Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Karen B Owens
Case #: 1:24-bk-11986
Case Filed:Sep 09, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1,000-5,000
Est. Assets$100,000,001 to $500 million
Est. Liabilities $100,000,001 to $500 million
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Edgio International, Inc.
11811 N Tatum Blvd Ste 3031
Phoenix, AZ 85028-1621
Represented By
Russell C. Silberglied
Richards, Layton & Finger
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
U.S. Trustee
Office of the United States Trustee J. Caleb Boggs Federal Building 844 King Street, Suite 2207 Lockbox 35
Wilmington, DE 19801


Docket last updated: 46 minutes ago
Tuesday, October 22, 2024
7 7 misc Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity Tue 10/22 9:45 PM
Amended Schedules/Statements - Jointly Administered Entity filed: Sch E-F, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Edgio International, Inc.. (Milana, Matthew)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
6 6 misc Schedules/Statements Thu 10/10 11:02 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: , Stmt of Financial Affairs,. Filed by Edgio International, Inc.. (Schlauch, Brendan)
Related: [-]
5 5 misc Schedules/Statements Thu 10/10 11:00 PM
Schedules/Statements filed: Sch A-B, Sch D, Sch E-F, Sch G, Sch H, , Sum of Assets and Liabilities, Decl Concerning Debtors Schs,. Filed by Edgio International, Inc.. (Schlauch, Brendan)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 09, 2024
4 4 5 pgs order Order Mon 09/09 5:01 PM
Order (I) Directing Joint Administration of the Debtors' Chapter 11 Cases and (II) Granting Related Relief. An order has been entered in accordance with rule 1015(b) of the Federal Rules of Bankruptcy Procedure directing the proceduralconsolidation and joint administration of the chapter 11 cases of Edgio, Inc. and its affiliated debtors. All further pleadings and papers shall be filed in, and all further docket entries shall be made in, the docket of Edgio, Inc., Case No. 24-11985 (KBO), and that docket should be consulted for all matters affecting this chapter 11 case. Related [+] Order Signed on 9/9/2024 (Mml)
Related: [-] 2
3 3 crditcrd none Mon 09/09 11:52 AM
Receipt of filing fee for Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK 24-11986 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00). Receipt Number A11776838, amount $1738.00. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-]
2 2 motion Joint Administration - Motion (Multi) Mon 09/09 10:07 AM
Motion for Joint Administration Filed by EdgeCast, Inc., Edgio International, Inc., Edgio, Inc., Limelight AcquisitionCo, Inc., Limelight Midco, Inc., Limelight Networks VPS, Inc., Mojo Merger Sub, LLC. (Colson, Gabrielle)
Related: [-]
1 1 23 pgs misc RETIRED - Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 09/09 9:12 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition . Fee Amount $1738. Filed by Edgio International, Inc.. (Silberglied, Russell)
Related: [-]
court Case Assigned Mon 09/09 9:56 AM
Judge Karen B. Owens added to case (SJS)
Related: [-]