Member Case
Lead case is: 5:24-bk-02216

Pennsylvania Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Mark J Conway
Case #: 1:24-bk-02245
Case Filed:Sep 09, 2024

Debtor
Cambridge Pointe, LLC
160 Chapel Road
Beaver, PA 15009
Represented By
Ronald V. Santora
Bresset And Santora
contact info
Last checked: never
Asst. U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
US Courthouse 1501 N. 6th St
Harrisburg, PA 17102
Represented By
Gregory Benjamin Schiller
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Joseph P Schalk
Doj-Ust
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/08/2024 8:00 PM EDT
Monday, September 09, 2024
1 1 5 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 09/09 10:39 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for a Non-Individual . Filing fee due in the amount of $1738.00. Filed by Ronald V. Santora of Bresset and Santora on behalf of Cambridge Pointe, LLC. Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 10/9/2024 (Santora, Ronald)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Appearance (Entry and/or Withdrawal) Mon 09/09 10:52 AM
Entry of Appearance of Gregory B. Schiller, Esquire Filed by Gregory Benjamin Schiller of US Department of Justice on behalf of United States Trustee. (Schiller, Gregory)
Related: [-]
3 3 misc Appearance (Entry and/or Withdrawal) Mon 09/09 10:54 AM
Entry of Appearance of Joseph P. Schalk, Esquire Filed by Joseph P Schalk of DOJ-Ust on behalf of United States Trustee. (Schalk, Joseph)
Related: [-]
4 4 8 pgs motion Employ (do NOT use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner, Ombudsman, Trustee) Mon 09/09 11:01 AM
Application to Employ Bresset & Santora, LLC as Attorney (nunc pro tunc). Notice served on 9/9/2024. Filed by Ronald V. Santora of Bresset and Santora on behalf of Cambridge Pointe, LLC. Objections due by 09/23/2024. (Santora, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order proposed order
Att: 2 Affidavit of Disinterestedness Declaration of Stephen G. Bresset, Esq.
Att: 3 Affidavit Declaration of Steven Atlass
5 5 7 pgs motion Employ (do NOT use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner, Ombudsman, Trustee) Mon 09/09 11:28 AM
Application to Employ PLC Cambridge Management, LLC as Professional (Manager) (nunc pro tunc). Notice served on 9/9/2024. Filed by Ronald V. Santora of Bresset and Santora on behalf of Cambridge Pointe, LLC. Objections due by 09/23/2024. (Santora, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Management Contract
Att: 2 Exhibit Declaration of Steven Atlass
Att: 3 Proposed Order
6 6 misc Appearance (Entry and/or Withdrawal) Mon 09/09 11:33 AM
Entry of Appearance of STEVEN G. BRESSET, ESQ. AS CO-COUNSEL FOR DEBTOR Filed by Ronald V. Santora of Bresset and Santora on behalf of Cambridge Pointe, LLC. (Santora, Ronald)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Chapter 11 First Day Motion Mon 09/09 11:51 AM
Chapter 11 First Day Motion re: Motion for Interim and Final Order Authorizing Debtor's proposed adequate assurance of payment to utilities companies and prohibiting the discotinuance of service Filed by Ronald V. Santora of Bresset and Santora on behalf of Cambridge Pointe, LLC. (Santora, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Interim Order
Att: 2 Proposed Order proposed final order
8 8 court Incomplete and/or Deficient Filing (f/k/a Missing documents) Mon 09/09 3:23 PM
Notice of Incomplete and/or Deficient Filing. Request submitted to BNC for mailing. Related [+]. (Wojtowicz, Courtney)
Related: [-] 1
9 9 court Creditors Uploaded Mon 09/09 3:23 PM
Creditors were uploaded by Attorney Ronald V. Santora. This entry has been made by the Clerks Office because the entry Creditor List Uploaded was not docketed by the filing party. (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) Related [+]. (Wojtowicz, Courtney)
Related: [-] 1
10 10 order Filing Fee Due Mon 09/09 3:38 PM
Order filing fee due in the amount of $ 1738.00 for Bankruptcy Petition Related [+]. Amount due on: 9/16/2024. (Wojtowicz, Courtney)
Related: [-] 1
11 11 order Notice not filed Mon 09/09 3:53 PM
A Notice was not filed with the court for the document at docket entry #4. Failure to file the Notice with a Certificate of Service on or before September 11, 2024 may result in the denial of the Application to Employ Bresset & Santora, LLC as Attorney, without prejudice, and without further notice. IT IS SO ORDERED on 9/9/2024. /s/Mark J. Conway (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) Related [+]. (Wojtowicz, Courtney)
Related: [-] 4
12 12 order Notice not filed Mon 09/09 3:55 PM
A Notice was not filed with the court for the document at docket entry #5. Failure to file the Notice with a Certificate of Service on or before September 11, 2024 may result in the denial of the Application to Employ PLC Cambridge Management, LLC as Professional, without prejudice, and without further notice. IT IS SO ORDERED on 9/9/2024. /s/Mark J. Conway (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) Related [+]. (Wojtowicz, Courtney)
Related: [-] 5