Pennsylvania Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Mark J Conway
Case #: 5:24-bk-02216
Case Filed:Sep 06, 2024

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $0 to $50,000
Nature of Business Health Care Business
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Cambridge Riverview LLC
100 Narrow Road
Larksville, PA 18651
Represented By
Ronald V. Santora
Bresset And Santora
contact info
Last checked: never
Asst. U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
US Courthouse 1501 N. 6th St
Harrisburg, PA 17102
Represented By
Joseph P Schalk
Doj-Ust
contact info
Gregory Benjamin Schiller
Us Department Of Justice
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/05/2024 8:00 PM EDT
Friday, September 06, 2024
crditcrd Auto-docket of credit card Fri 09/06 11:46 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:5:24-bk-02216] ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A11184033, amount $ 1738.00. Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 4 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 09/06 11:17 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for a Non-Individual . Filing fee due in the amount of $1738.00. Filed by Ronald V. Santora of Bresset and Santora on behalf of Cambridge Riverview LLC. Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 10/6/2024 (Santora, Ronald)
Related: [-]
2 2 8 pgs motion Employ (do NOT use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner, Ombudsman, Trustee) Fri 09/06 11:36 AM
Application to Employ Bresset & Santora, LLC as Attorney (nunc pro tunc). Notice served on 9/9/2024. Filed by Ronald V. Santora of Bresset and Santora on behalf of Cambridge Riverview LLC. Objections due by 09/23/2024. (Santora, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 12 pgs Affidavit of Disinterestedness Declaration of Steven G. Bresset, Esq.
Att: 3 Affidavit Declaration of Steven Atlass
3 3 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) or Petition Preparer (Form 2800) Fri 09/06 11:37 AM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Ronald V. Santora of Bresset and Santora on behalf of Cambridge Riverview LLC Related [+]. (Santora, Ronald)
Related: [-] 1
4 4 7 pgs motion Employ (do NOT use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner, Ombudsman, Trustee) Fri 09/06 11:45 AM
Application to Employ PLC Cambridge Management, LLC as Professional (Manager) (nunc pro tunc). Notice served on 9/9/2024. Filed by Ronald V. Santora of Bresset and Santora on behalf of Cambridge Riverview LLC. Objections due by 09/23/2024. (Santora, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 44 pgs Exhibit Management Contract
Att: 2 4 pgs Affidavit Declaration of Steven Atlass
Att: 3 Proposed Order
5 5 misc Appearance (Entry and/or Withdrawal) Fri 09/06 12:02 PM
Entry of Appearance of Gregory B. Schiller, Esquire Filed by Gregory Benjamin Schiller of US Department of Justice on behalf of United States Trustee. (Schiller, Gregory)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Appearance (Entry and/or Withdrawal) Fri 09/06 12:04 PM
Entry of Appearance of Joseph P. Schalk, Esquire Filed by Joseph P Schalk of DOJ-Ust on behalf of United States Trustee. (Schalk, Joseph)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Appearance (Entry and/or Withdrawal) Fri 09/06 1:24 PM
Entry of Appearance of STEVEN G. BRESSET, ESQ. AS CO-COUNSEL FOR DEBTOR Filed by Ronald V. Santora of Bresset and Santora on behalf of Cambridge Riverview LLC. (Santora, Ronald)
Related: [-]
8 8 motion Chapter 11 First Day Motion Fri 09/06 1:39 PM
Chapter 11 First Day Motion re: Motion for Interim and Final Order Authorizing Debtor's proposed adequate assurance of payment to utilities companies and prohibiting the discotinuance of service Filed by Ronald V. Santora of Bresset and Santora on behalf of Cambridge Riverview LLC. (Santora, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Interim Order
Att: 2 Proposed Order Final Order