Member Case
Lead case is: 5:24-bk-02216

Pennsylvania Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Mark J Conway
Case #: 5:24-bk-02244
Case Filed:Sep 09, 2024

Debtor
Cambridge Falls, LLC

,
Represented By
Ronald V. Santora
Bresset And Santora
contact info
Last checked: never
Asst. U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
US Courthouse 1501 N. 6th St
Harrisburg, PA 17102
Represented By
Joseph P Schalk
Doj-Ust
contact info
Gregory Benjamin Schiller
Us Department Of Justice
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/08/2024 8:00 PM EDT
Monday, September 09, 2024
crditcrd Auto-docket of credit card Mon 09/09 10:27 AM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:5:24-bk-02244] ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) filing fee. Receipt number A11185803, amount $ 1738.00. Related [+]. (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] 1
1 1 5 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Mon 09/09 9:30 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for a Non-Individual . Filing fee due in the amount of $1738.00. Filed by Ronald V. Santora of Bresset and Santora on behalf of Cambridge Falls, LLC. Appointment of health care ombudsman due by 10/9/2024 (Santora, Ronald)
Related: [-]
2 2 9 pgs motion Employ (do NOT use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner, Ombudsman, Trustee) Mon 09/09 9:54 AM
Application to Employ Bresset & Santora, LLC as Attorney (nunc pro tunc). Notice served on 9/9/2024. Filed by Ronald V. Santora of Bresset and Santora on behalf of Cambridge Falls, LLC. Objections due by 09/23/2024. (Santora, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Affidavit of Disinterestedness Declaration of Stephen G. Bresset, Esq.
Att: 3 Affidavit Declaration of Steven Atlass
3 3 7 pgs motion Employ (do NOT use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner, Ombudsman, Trustee) Mon 09/09 10:11 AM
Application to Employ PLC Cambridge Management, LLC as Professional (Manager) (nunc pro tunc). Notice served on 9/9/2024. Filed by Ronald V. Santora of Bresset and Santora on behalf of Cambridge Falls, LLC. Objections due by 09/23/2024. (Santora, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 44 pgs Exhibit Management Contract
Att: 2 4 pgs Exhibit Declaration of Steven Atlass
Att: 3 Proposed Order
4 4 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) or Petition Preparer (Form 2800) Mon 09/09 10:12 AM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Ronald V. Santora of Bresset and Santora on behalf of Cambridge Falls, LLC Related [+]. (Santora, Ronald)
Related: [-] 1
5 5 motion Chapter 11 First Day Motion Mon 09/09 10:23 AM
Chapter 11 First Day Motion re: Motion for Interim and Final Order Authorizing Debtor's proposed adequate assurance of payment to utilities companies and prohibiting the discotinuance of service Filed by Ronald V. Santora of Bresset and Santora on behalf of Cambridge Falls, LLC. (Santora, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order Proposed Interim Order
Att: 2 Proposed Order Proposed Final Order
6 6 misc Appearance (Entry and/or Withdrawal) Mon 09/09 10:25 AM
Entry of Appearance of STEVEN G. BRESSET, ESQ. AS CO-COUNSEL FOR DEBTOR Filed by Ronald V. Santora of Bresset and Santora on behalf of Cambridge Falls, LLC. (Santora, Ronald)
Related: [-]
7 7 misc Appearance (Entry and/or Withdrawal) Mon 09/09 10:36 AM
Entry of Appearance of Gregory Schiller Filed by Gregory Benjamin Schiller of US Department of Justice on behalf of United States Trustee. (Schiller, Gregory)
Related: [-]
8 8 misc Appearance (Entry and/or Withdrawal) Mon 09/09 10:37 AM
Entry of Appearance of Joseph Schalk Filed by Joseph P Schalk of DOJ-Ust on behalf of United States Trustee. (Schalk, Joseph)
Related: [-]
9 9 court Incomplete and/or Deficient Filing (f/k/a Missing documents) Mon 09/09 1:33 PM
Notice of Incomplete and/or Deficient Filing. Request submitted to BNC for mailing. Related [+]. (Wojtowicz, Courtney)
Related: [-] 1
10 10 court Creditors Uploaded Mon 09/09 1:50 PM
Creditors were uploaded by Attorney Ronald V. Santora. This entry has been made by the Clerks Office because the entry Creditor List Uploaded was not docketed by the filing party. (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) Related [+]. (Wojtowicz, Courtney)
Related: [-] 1
11 11 court Incomplete and/or Deficient Filing (f/k/a Missing documents) Mon 09/09 3:19 PM
Duplicate entry of 9 Notice of Incomplete and/or Deficient Filing. Request submitted to BNC for mailing. Related [+]. (Wojtowicz, Courtney) Modified on 9/9/2024 (Wojtowicz, Courtney)
Related: [-] 1
12 12 order Notice not filed Mon 09/09 3:48 PM
A Notice was not filed with the court for the document at docket entry #2. Failure to file the Notice with a Certificate of Service on or before September 11, 2024 may result in the denial of the Application to Employ Bresset & Santora, LLC as Attorney, without prejudice, and without further notice. IT IS SO ORDERED on 9/9/2024. /s/Mark J. Conway (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) Related [+]. (Wojtowicz, Courtney)
Related: [-] 2
13 13 order Notice not filed Mon 09/09 3:49 PM
A Notice was not filed with the court for the document at docket entry #3. Failure to file the Notice with a Certificate of Service on or before September 11, 2024 may result in the denial of the Application to Employ PLC Cambridge Management, LLC, without prejudice, and without further notice. IT IS SO ORDERED on 9/9/2024. /s/Mark J. Conway (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) Related [+]. (Wojtowicz, Courtney)
Related: [-] 3