Oklahoma Northern District Court
Judge:Sara E Hill
Referred: Susan E Huntsman
Case #: 4:24-cv-00431
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Fed. Question
Case Filed:Sep 12, 2024
Terminated:Jan 13, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Mar 11, 2025 3:32 AM CDT
Defendant
Rob Bonta
Represented By
Henry Adam Meyer, III
Krahl Goerke Meyer & Behenna
contact info
Grant Lien
California Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Todd Chesbro
Represented By
Stefanie Erin Lawson
contact info
Defendant
Gentner Drummond
Represented By
Lexie P Norwood
Oklahoma Attorney General
contact info
Jacy Chafin Sullivan
Oklahoma Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Birgit Fladager
Defendant
Patricia Guerrero
Represented By
Robert Ray Jones, Jr
Lytle Soule & Curlee, PC
contact info
Defendant
Kenneth J Hara
Represented By
Robert Ray Jones, Jr
Lytle Soule & Curlee, PC
contact info
Defendant
M John Kane, IV
Represented By
Stefanie Erin Lawson
contact info
Defendant
Steve Kunzweiler
Represented By
Lexie P Norwood
Oklahoma Attorney General
contact info
Jacy Chafin Sullivan
Oklahoma Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
Deborrah Ludi Leitch
Tulsa District Judge 500 S DENVER AVE
TULSA, OK 74103
Represented By
Stefanie Erin Lawson
contact info
Defendant
Gavin Newsom
Represented By
Henry Adam Meyer, III
Krahl Goerke Meyer & Behenna
contact info
Grant Lien
California Attorney General'S Office
contact info
Defendant
April Seibert
Represented By
Stefanie Erin Lawson
contact info
Plaintiff
Wade Reeves
one of the People 16802 S 11TH W AVE
GLENPOOL, OK 74033
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
California Department of Child Support Services
Terminated: 02/07/2025
Defendant
Oklahoma Department of Human Services
Terminated: 02/07/2025


Docket last updated: 05/12/2025 11:59 PM CDT
Thursday, May 08, 2025
75 75 3 pgs appeal Order from Circuit Court Thu 05/08 4:48 PM
ORDER from Circuit Court denying petition for writ of mandamus Related [+] (mm, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 72 Notice of Appeal to Circuit Court,,
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
74 74 appeal Appeal Number Information from Circuit Court Wed 05/07 12:41 PM
APPEAL NUMBER INFORMATION from Circuit Court assigning Case Number 25-5073 Related [+] (mm, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 72 Notice of Appeal to Circuit Court,,
73 73 appeal Preliminary Record Sent Wed 05/07 10:12 AM
PRELIMINARY RECORD Sent to Circuit Court Related [+] (With attachments) (mm, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 72 Notice of Appeal to Circuit Court,,
72 72 appeal Notice of Appeal to Circuit Court Wed 05/07 9:48 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL to Circuit Court Related [+] (mm, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-] 71 Order,, Ruling on Motion for Relief,, Ruling on Motion to Reopen Case,, Ruling on Motion to Vacate Order/Judgment,, Ruling on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief,, Ruling on Motion for Sanctions,, Ruling on Motion to Strike Document(s),,,46 Opinion and Order,,, Dismissing/Terminating Case,,, Ruling on Motion to Dismiss Party,,, Ruling on Motion for Preliminary Injunction,,, Ruling on Motion to Expedite Ruling,,,,,,,,,,,,,,, Ruling on Motion to Stay,,
Tuesday, May 06, 2025
71 71 order 01 - Order Ruling on Motion for Relief Ruling on Motion to Reopen Case Ruling on Motion to Vacate Order/Judgment Ruling on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief Ruling on Motion for Sanctions Ruling on Motion to Strike Document(s) Tue 05/06 2:19 PM
ORDER by Judge Sara E Hill ; denying49 Motion for Relief; denying49 Motion to Reopen Case; denying50 Motion to Vacate Order/Judgment; denying50 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief; denying58 Motion for Sanctions; denying60 Motion to Strike Document(s); finding as moot69 Motion for Miscellaneous Relief (ll, Dpty Clk)
Related: [-]