Original Case: 4:24-cv-00431

Tenth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv-05073
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:May 07, 2025
Last checked: Friday May 09, 2025 2:22 AM MDT
Defendant - Appellee
APRIL SEIBERT
Represented By
Stefanie Erin Lawson
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Oklahoma
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
TODD CHESBRO
Represented By
Stefanie Erin Lawson
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Oklahoma
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DEBORRAH LUDI LEITCH
Represented By
Stefanie Erin Lawson
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Oklahoma
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
KENNETH HARA
Represented By
Robert Ray Jones Jr.
Lytle Soule & Felty
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
BIRGIT FLADAGER
Defendant - Appellee
ROB BONTA
Represented By
Henry Adam Meyer III
Krahl Goerke Meyer & Behenna
contact info
Grant Lien
Office of the Attorney General for the State of California
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
PATRICIA GUERRERO
Represented By
Robert Ray Jones Jr.
Lytle Soule & Felty
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
GAVIN NEWSOM
Represented By
Henry Adam Meyer III
Krahl Goerke Meyer & Behenna
contact info
Grant Lien
Office of the Attorney General for the State of California
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
STEVE KUNZWEILER
Represented By
Jacy Chafin Sullivan
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Oklahoma
contact info
Lexie P. Norwood
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Oklahoma
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
GENTNER DRUMMOND
Represented By
Jacy Chafin Sullivan
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Oklahoma
contact info
Lexie P. Norwood
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Oklahoma
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
M. JOHN KANE, IV
Represented By
Stefanie Erin Lawson
Office of the Attorney General for the State of Oklahoma
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
WADE REEVES
Represented By
Wade Reeves
contact info


Docket last updated: 05/09/2025 2:22 AM MDT
Wednesday, May 07, 2025
[11179728] Civil case docketed. Preliminary record filed. DATE RECEIVED: 05/07/2025 Notice of appearance due on 05/21/2025 for Rob Bonta, Todd Chesbro, Gentner Drummond, Patricia Guerrero, Kenneth Hara, M. John Kane IV, Steve Kunzweiler, Deborrah Ludi Leitch, Gavin Newsom and April Seibert. and Notice of appearance and fee or ifp forms due 06/06/2025 for Wade Reeves. 25-5073
Related: [-]
Att: 1 31 pgs Main Document
Att: 2 2 pgs Case Opening Pro Civil/Habeas