District Of Columbia District Court
Judge:Trevor N Mcfadden
Case #: 1:24-cv-02056
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause28:1331 Federal Question: Bivens Act
Case Filed:Jul 16, 2024
Terminated:Mar 04, 2025
Last checked: Sunday Jan 12, 2025 3:59 AM EST
Defendant
JOHN DOES
Defendant
UNITED STATES OF AMERICA
Represented By
Kenneth A. Adebonojo
U.S. Attorney'S Office For The District Of Columbia
contact info
Defendant
FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION
Represented By
Kenneth A. Adebonojo
U.S. Attorney'S Office For The District Of Columbia
contact info
Plaintiff
SASWOT DHAKAL
9803 Tailspin Lane
Middle River, MD 21220

GPO Feb 28 2025
MEMORANDUM OPINION granting Defendant's 20 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice and denying Plaintiff's 24 Emergency Motion for Injunction as moot. See attached Opinion for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/28/2025. (lctnm2).

Docket last updated: 7 hours ago
Tuesday, April 29, 2025
35 35 appeal Supplemental ROA Sent to USCA Tue 04/29 2:49 PM
Supplemental Record on Appeal transmitted to US Court of Appeals re 4/28/2025 MINUTE Order granting Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis ; USCA Case Number 25-05153 (mg)
Related: [-]
Monday, April 28, 2025
34 34 motion Appeal In Forma Pauperis Mon 04/28 3:56 PM
MOTION for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis by SASWOT DHAKAL. (mg)
Related: [-]
33 33 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Relief from Judgment Order on Motion for Hearing Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Mon 04/28 3:19 PM
ORDER denying Plaintiff's31 Motion for Relief from Judgment,31 Motion for Hearing, and31 Motion to Appoint Counsel. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/28/25. (psu2)
Related: [-]
32 32 appeal Transmission of Notice of Appeal and Docket Sheet to USCA Mon 04/28 12:06 PM
Transmission of the Notice of Appeal, Order Appealed (Memorandum Opinion), and Docket Sheet to US Court of Appeals. The fee remains to be paid and another notice will be transmitted when the fee has been paid in the District Court or motion to proceed In Forma Pauperis has been decided re30 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court. (mg)
Related: [-]
appeal USCA Case Number Mon 04/28 3:59 PM
USCA Case Number 25-5153 for30 Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Court filed by SASWOT DHAKAL. (mg)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Leave to Appeal In Forma Pauperis Mon 04/28 4:42 PM
MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ordered that Plaintiff's34 Motion for Leave to Appeal in forma pauperis is granted. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 4/28/25. (psu2)
Related: [-]
Saturday, April 26, 2025
31 31 motion Relief from Judgment Hearing Appoint Counsel Mon 04/28 12:04 PM
MOTION for Relief from Judgment, MOTION for Hearing re26 Order,25 Order on Motion to Dismiss,, MOTION to Appoint Counsel by SASWOT DHAKAL. (mg)
Related: [-]
30 30 appeal Notice of Appeal to DC Circuit Mon 04/28 12:02 PM
NOTICE OF APPEAL TO DC CIRCUIT COURT as to26 Order,25 Order on Motion to Dismiss, by SASWOT DHAKAL. Fee Status: No Fee Paid. Parties have been notified. (mg)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 31, 2025
29 29 2 pgs order Order on Motion for Reconsideration Mon 03/31 6:09 PM
ORDER. Plaintiff's27 Motion for Reconsideration and28 Motion to Reopen Case are DENIED. For details, see the attached Order. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 3/31/2025. (lctnm2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 13, 2025
28 28 motion Reopen Case Fri 03/14 4:23 PM
MOTION to Reopen Case by SASWOT DHAKAL. (mg)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
27 27 motion Reconsideration Wed 03/12 9:17 AM
MOTION for Reconsideration re26 Order,25 Order on Motion to Dismiss, by SASWOT DHAKAL. (mg)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 28, 2025
26 26 order .Order Fri 02/28 4:31 PM
ORDER granting Defendant's20 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice and denying Plaintiff's24 Emergency Motion for Injunction as moot. See attached Order for details. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/28/2025. (lctnm2)
Related: [-]
25 25 2 pgs order Order on Motion to Dismiss Fri 02/28 4:29 PM
MEMORANDUM OPINION granting Defendant's20 Motion to Dismiss without prejudice and denying Plaintiff's24 Emergency Motion for Injunction as moot. See attached Opinion for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/28/2025. (lctnm2)
Related: [-]
Monday, February 24, 2025
24 24 motion Injunction Hearing Wed 02/26 11:42 AM
Emergency MOTION for Injunction, MOTION for Hearing by SASWOT DHAKAL.(mg)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 18, 2025
order Order on Motion for Injunction Tue 02/18 4:03 PM
MINUTE ORDER: The Plaintiff's23 Emergency Motion for Injunction is DENIED for lack of jurisdiction. See Tooley v. Napolitano, 586 F.3d 1006, 1009 (D.C. Cir. 2009) (dismissing for lack of jurisdiction when there was "no federal question suitable for decision"). SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 2/18/2025. (lctnm2)
Related: [-]
Friday, February 14, 2025
23 23 motion Injunction Tue 02/18 3:11 PM
Emergency MOTION for Injunction by SASWOT DHAKAL. (mg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, January 14, 2025
22 22 respm Response to motion Fri 01/17 8:29 AM
RESPONSE re20 MOTION to Dismiss filed by SASWOT DHAKAL. (mg)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 13, 2025
21 21 order .Order ~Util - Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 01/13 9:27 AM
ORDER advising Plaintiff to respond by January 24, 2025, and warning that if Plaintiff fails to do so without moving for an extension of time the Court may deem Defendants'20 Motion to Dismiss conceded. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 1/13/2025. (lctnm2)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 10, 2025
20 20 motion Dismiss Fri 01/10 9:31 PM
MOTION to Dismiss by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Adebonojo, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, December 11, 2024
order .Order Wed 12/11 12:20 PM
MINUTE ORDER: After considering the Plaintiff's19 Memorandum in Opposition to the government's18 Motion for Extension of Time to Respond, the Court GRANTS it in part and DENIES it in part. As before, the federal defendants must file their answer by or on January 9, 2025. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/11/2024. (lctnm2)
Related: [-]
Monday, December 09, 2024
order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Set/Reset Deadlines Mon 12/09 6:44 PM
MINUTE ORDER: After reviewing the Defendant's18 Motion for Extension of Time, the Court GRANTS it in part and DENIES it in part. The federal defendants' answer will be filed by or on January 9, 2025. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 12/9/2024. (lctnm2)
Related: [-]
Saturday, December 07, 2024
19 19 7 pgs respm Memorandum in opposition to motion Tue 12/10 10:32 AM
Memorandum in opposition to re18 Motion for Extension of Time filed by SASWOT DHAKAL. (mg)
Related: [-]
18 18 motion Extension of Time to Sat 12/07 3:47 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to Respond by UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION. (Adebonojo, Kenneth)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
17 17 motion Motion For Order Thu 10/24 2:48 PM
MOTION for Order by SASWOT DHAKAL. (mg)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 17, 2024
16 16 cmp Amended Complaint Fri 10/18 10:29 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against JOHN DOES, UNITED STATES OF AMERICA, FEDERAL BUREAU OF INVESTIGATION with Jury Demand filed by SASWOT DHAKAL.(mg)
Related: [-]
order .Order Thu 10/17 4:23 PM
MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's15 Motion to Amend Complaint is GRANTED. The Clerk of the Court is requested to docket the entry [15-2] document as the Amended Complaint. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/17/2024. (lctnm2)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 15, 2024
15 15 motion Amend/Correct Expedite Tue 10/15 11:35 AM
MOTION to Amend1 Complaint and MOTION for Expedited Service of Process by SASWOT DHAKAL.(zmtm) (Main Document 15 replaced on 10/15/2024) (zmtm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit,
Att: 2 Exhibit
Friday, October 11, 2024
order Order on Motion for Order Order on Motion to Amend/Correct Fri 10/11 9:04 AM
MINUTE ORDER: Plaintiff's13 Motion for Order, Motion to Amend Complaint is DENIED without prejudice. Local Civil Rule 7(i) requires that a "motion for leave to file an amended pleading" be "accompanied by an original of the proposed pleading as amended." This Court's standing order directs that amended pleadings also "shall be accompanied by a redline comparison of the original and amended pleading." SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/11/2024. (lctnm2)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
14 14 service Summons Returned Executed as to U.S. Attorney General Summons Returned Executed as to US Attorney Thu 10/10 12:15 PM
RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed on United States Attorney General. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney General 10/9/2024., RETURN OF SERVICE/AFFIDAVIT of Summons and Complaint Executed as to the United States Attorney. Date of Service Upon United States Attorney on 10/9/2024. ( Answer due for ALL FEDERAL DEFENDANTS by 12/8/2024.) (mg)
Related: [-]
13 13 motion Motion For Order Amend/Correct Thu 10/10 8:36 AM
MOTION for Order, MOTION to Amend Complaint by SASWOT DHAKAL. (mg)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, October 08, 2024
order Order on Motion for Order Order on Motion to Appoint Counsel Tue 10/08 9:06 AM
MINUTE ORDER: It is hereby ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Service of Process by U.S. Marshal11 is DENIED as moot. The Court already granted Plaintiff's prior motion, ECF No. 6, and on October 7, 2024, the Clerk of Court issued summonses for service by the U.S. Marshals Service on Plaintiff's behalf. It is further ORDERED that Plaintiff's Motion for Appointment of Counsel12 is DENIED WITHOUT PREJUDICE for the reasons set forth in the October 4, 2024, Order, ECF No. 9. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/08/2024. (lctnm2)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 07, 2024
10 10 service Summons Issued as to AUSA,USAG Mon 10/07 12:00 PM
SUMMONS (2) Issued as to U.S. Attorney and U.S. Attorney General (zmtm) (zmtm). Sent to the U.S. Marshals Service. Modified on 10/7/2024 (zmtm). Modified on 10/7/2024 (zmtm)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 (10/7/2024) Summons
Friday, October 04, 2024
9 9 order .Order Fri 10/04 5:18 PM
ORDER DENYING5 Motion to Correct Case Classification and Related Case Entry and DENYING7 Motion to Appoint Counsel. See attached order for details. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/04/2024. (lctnm2)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 03, 2024
8 8 order Standing Order Thu 10/03 10:49 AM
STANDING ORDER Establishing Procedures for Cases Before Judge Trevor N. McFadden. The parties are hereby ORDERED to read and comply with the directives in the attached standing order. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/03/2024. (lctnm2)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion for Order Thu 10/03 2:32 PM
MINUTE ORDER granting6 Motion for Order: Pursuant to 28 U.S.C. § 1915(d) and Fed. R. Civ. P. 4(c)(3), the Clerk is requested to prepare and issue a summons and coordinate with the U.S. Marshals Service to effect service of process on Defendant. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Trevor N. McFadden on 10/03/2024. (lctnm3) (lcrc) Modified to edit event title on 10/3/2024 (hmc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 02, 2024
12 12 motion Appoint Counsel Mon 10/07 1:40 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by SASWOT DHAKAL. (mg)
Related: [-]
11 11 motion Motion For Order Mon 10/07 1:34 PM
MOTION for Order by SASWOT DHAKAL. (mg)
Related: [-]
Monday, September 30, 2024
7 7 motion Appoint Counsel Wed 10/02 1:34 PM
MOTION to Appoint Counsel by SASWOT DHAKAL. (mg)
Related: [-]
6 6 motion Motion For Order Wed 10/02 1:31 PM
MOTION for Order by SASWOT DHAKAL. (mg)
Related: [-]
Friday, September 27, 2024
order Order on Motion for Leave to Proceed In Forma Pauperis Fri 09/27 10:38 AM
MINUTE ORDER. Upon consideration of2 Plaintiff's Motion for Leave to proceed in forma pauperis, the Court GRANTS the motion. The Clerk shall assign this case randomly to a district judge for further proceedings. SO ORDERED. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on 9/27/2024. (psu1)
Related: [-]
order Order on Motion to Expedite Fri 09/27 10:41 AM
MINUTE ORDER denying as moot4 Plaintiff's Motion to Expedite in forma pauperis ruling. Signed by Judge Jia M. Cobb on 9/27/2024. (psu1)
Related: [-]
utility Case Assigned/Reassigned Fri 09/27 11:13 AM
Case Assigned to Judge Trevor N. McFadden. (zmtm)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, July 16, 2024
misc Receipt of Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Mon 09/16 12:32 PM
Initiating Pleading & IFP Application Received on 7/16/2024. A copy of the docket sheet has been mailed to the address of record for the pro se party. (zmtm)
Related: [-]