Original Case: 1:24-cv-02056

D.C. Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cvus-05153
Typecivil us / united states
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Apr 28, 2025
Last checked: Tuesday Apr 29, 2025 4:16 AM EDT
Defendant - Appellee
United States of America
Represented By
Jane M. Lyons
U.S. Attorney's Office
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
John Does, Of the FBI
Defendant - Appellee
Federal Bureau of Investigation
Represented By
Jane M. Lyons
U.S. Attorney's Office
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
Saswot Dhakal
Represented By
Saswot Dhakal
contact info


Docket last updated: 04/29/2025 4:16 AM EDT
Monday, April 28, 2025
US CIVIL CASE docketed. 25-5153
Related: [-]
CERTIFIED AND FIRST CLASS MAIL SENT [2113313] with return receipt requested [Receipt No.9589 0710 5270 2357 8585 22] of order [2113307-6]. Certified Mail Receipt due 05/28/2025 from Saswot Dhakal. 25-5153
Related: [-]
9 pgs NOTICE OF APPEAL [2113299] seeking review of a decision by the U.S. District Court in 1:24-cv-02056-TNM filed by Saswot Dhakal. Appeal assigned USCA Case Number: 25-5153 25-5153
Related: [-]
2 pgs CLERK'S ORDER [2113307] filed directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLANT docketing statement due 05/28/2025. APPELLANT certificate as to parties due 05/28/2025. APPELLANT statement of issues due 05/28/2025. APPELLANT underlying decision due 05/28/2025. APPELLANT deferred appendix statement due 05/28/2025. APPELLANT entry of appearance due 05/28/2025. APPELLANT transcript status report due 05/28/2025. APPELLANT procedural motions due 05/28/2025. APPELLANT dispositive motions due 06/12/2025; directing party to file initial submissions: APPELLEE certificate as to parties due 05/28/2025. APPELLEE entry of appearance due 05/28/2025. APPELLEE procedural motions due 05/28/2025. APPELLEE dispositive motions due 06/12/2025; directing party to file appointment of counsel motion: APPELLANT motion for appointment of counsel due 05/28/2025. Failure to respond shall result in dismissal of the case for lack of prosecution. The Clerk is directed to mail this order to appellant by certified mail, return receipt requested and by 1st class mail. 25-5153
Related: [-]