Original Case: 2:23-cv-02273

Third Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:24-cv-02737
Typecivil / private / civil rights
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Sep 18, 2024
Terminated:Jan 03, 2025
Last checked: Monday Jan 06, 2025 5:08 AM EST
Defendant - Appellee
WILLIAM P. MAHON
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MOTION'S JUDGE
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ROBERT J. MONGELUZZI
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
LAURA K. MOHNEY
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
TARA MOBLEY
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CHRISTOPHER M. MILLER
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JAMES MCCLOSKEY
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ANDREW E. MASICH, Ph. D.
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
RAMONA M. MARIANI
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
GRETCHEN A. MUNDORFF
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MARC LIEBERMAN
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JERRY M. LEHOCKY
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
BENJAMIN D. KOHLER, Esq.
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
WILLIAM JUDGE
Represented By
Michael B. Pullano
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Joseph F. Kampherstein III
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
RENEE C. JUBELIRER
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JESSE G. HEREDA
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
KIMBERLY M. HENDERSON
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JOHN HALL
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DANIEL E. ROLAND
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Joseph F. Kampherstein III
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
RAYMOND S. WIERCISZEWSKI
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
WILLIAM C. WENNER
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DAVID N. WECHT
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ANTHONY T. VERWEY
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
SHOHIN H VANCE
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DEBRA TODD
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ANTHONY P. SODROSKI
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DAVID S. SENOFF
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MARTIN G. GOCH
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ROBERT L. REPARD
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DION G. RASSIAS
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JOHN C. RAFFERTY, JR.
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
SUDHIR R. PATEL
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JACK A. PANELLA
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JANA M. PALKO
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
SALLIE UPDYKE MUNDY
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MATHIEU SHAPIRO
Represented By
Mathieu Shapiro
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Melissa Blanco
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DANA C. BELELLA
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
KRISTA K. BEATTY
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
STEVEN PARKINSON
Represented By
Guy A. Donatelli
Lamb McErlane
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
BRIDGET GALLOWAY OWEN
Represented By
Guy A. Donatelli
Lamb McErlane
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ENRICO PAGANELLI
Represented By
Paul C. Troy
Kane Pugh Knoell Troy & Kramer
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DAVID LADOV
Represented By
Mathieu Shapiro
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Melissa Blanco
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
NICHOLAS PODUSLENKO
Represented By
Mathieu Shapiro
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Melissa Blanco
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
THOMAS A. LEONARD
Represented By
Mathieu Shapiro
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Melissa Blanco
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MELISSA BLANCO
Represented By
Mathieu Shapiro
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Melissa Blanco
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DAVID A. NASATIR
Represented By
Mathieu Shapiro
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Melissa Blanco
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
HILLARY J. MOONAY
Represented By
Mathieu Shapiro
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Melissa Blanco
Obermayer Rebmann Maxwell & Hippel
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DEBBIE HUNTER
Represented By
Guy A. Donatelli
Lamb McErlane
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ROSANA CASTRO
Represented By
Guy A. Donatelli
Lamb McErlane
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
FREDDA MADDOX
Represented By
Guy A. Donatelli
Lamb McErlane
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
DEB RYAN
Represented By
Michael B. Pullano
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
Joseph F. Kampherstein III
Lewis Brisbois Bisgaard & Smith
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
BRET M. BINDER
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
SCOTT B. COOPER
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
SUSAN P. GANTMAN
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JAMES M. FOX
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
THOMAS J. FARRELL, Esq.
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
LAURA E. ELLSWORTH
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
AMY DREIBELBIS
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
KEVIN M. DOUGHERTY
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CHRISTINE L. DONOHUE
Represented By
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
CELESTE L. DEE
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
NANCY L. CLEMENS
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
ANNA M. CIARDI
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
HAROLD E. CIAMPOLI, JR.
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JOHN P. CAPUZZI, SR.
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
MICHAEL BRUNELLE
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
P. KEVIN BROBSON
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Defendant - Appellee
JOSHUA M. BLOOM
Represented By
Michael Daley
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Nicole A. Feigenbaum
Supreme Court of Pennsylvania
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellant
URVE MAGGITTI
Represented By
Urve Maggitti
contact info


Docket last updated: 01/06/2025 5:08 AM EST
Wednesday, September 18, 2024
RECORD available on District Court CM/ECF. (TMM)
Related: [-]
CIVIL CASE DOCKETED. Notice filed by Appellant Urve Maggitti in District Court No. 2-23-cv-02273. (TMM)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 10 pgs Civil Case Docketed
Att: 2 5 pgs DC Order 9/10/24
Att: 3 1 pgs caption
Att: 4 2 pgs Case Opening Letter
1 pgs ORDER (Clerk) for all parties represented by Michael Daley, Esq. or any other attorney from the Administrative Office of the Pennsylvania Courts, the designated filer shall be Bret M. Binder. Counsel is advised that the designated filer for cm/ecf filing purposes only. Names of all represented parties must be listed on all forms, motions, and briefs. Attorneys representing smaller groups of parties must select all individual persons or entities as filers in cm/ecf. (TMM)
Related: [-]
1 pgs NOTICE Pursuant to 3d Cir. L.A.R. 26.1, a document is timely filed if received by 5:00 p.m. ET on the last day for filing unless the Court sets a different time, the document has been submitted by an inmate pursuant to Fed. R. App. P. 25(a)(2)(A)(iii), or otherwise specified in L.A.R. 26.1 (TMM)
Related: [-]