Iowa Southern District Court
Judge:Stephen H Locher
Referred: William P Kelly
Case #: 4:24-cv-00336
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Cause42:1983dp Civil Right Denial of Due Process
Case Filed:Sep 24, 2024
Last checked: Sunday Mar 23, 2025 4:22 AM CDT
Defendant
James Martin Arganbright
Represented By
Ryan Tunink
Lamson, Dugan & Murray, Llp (dsm)
contact info
Jason C. Palmer
Lamson, Dugan & Murray, Llp (dsm)
contact info
Defendant
Jeremy Bennett
Represented By
Ryan Tunink
Lamson, Dugan & Murray, Llp (dsm)
contact info
Jason C. Palmer
Lamson, Dugan & Murray, Llp (dsm)
contact info
Plaintiff
Matthew Harmann
Represented By
Robert G. Rehkemper
Gourley Rehkemper & Lindholm PLC
contact info
TERMINATED PARTIES
Defendant
Dana Minteer
Terminated: 02/06/2025
Represented By
Ryan Tunink
Lamson, Dugan & Murray, Llp (dsm)
contact info
Jason C. Palmer
Lamson, Dugan & Murray, Llp (dsm)
contact info


Docket last updated: 30 minutes ago
Friday, March 14, 2025
20 20 appeal USCA Scheduling Order Fri 03/14 10:01 AM
USCA Scheduling Order as to17 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jeremy Bennett, James Martin Arganbright. (nla)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 10, 2025
19 19 appeal USCA Case Number Mon 03/10 9:54 AM
USCA Case Number 25-1467 for17 Notice of Appeal, filed by Jeremy Bennett, James Martin Arganbright. (nla)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
18 18 appeal Notification of Appeal to USCA Fri 03/07 10:49 AM
NOTIFICATION OF APPEAL and NOA Supplement by District Court Clerk to USCA re17 Notice of Appeal, filed on 3/6/2025. (vr)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
17 17 appeal Notice of Appeal Thu 03/06 10:27 AM
NOTICE OF APPEAL as to16 Order on Motion to Dismiss,,, ORDER on Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision,, by James Martin Arganbright, Jeremy Bennett. Fee paid in the amount of $605 receipt number AIASDC-5689007.(Palmer, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Supplement Notice of Appeal
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
16 16 order Dismiss Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision Wed 02/05 10:52 AM
ORDER Granting in Part and Denying in Part3 Motion to Dismiss and Sustaining15 Appeal of Magistrate Judge Decision. Harmann has stated viable claims against Arganbright in Divisions One and Five and both Arganbright and Bennett as to Divisions Two and Three. He has not stated any viable claims against Minteer, nor has he stated a viable claim against Arganbright or Bennett in Division Four. The Thomas report [3-1] shall be unsealed. See Order for further particulars. Signed by Judge Stephen H. Locher on 2/5/2025. (mm)
Related: [-]
Friday, December 06, 2024
15 15 misc Objections - Generic Fri 12/06 11:45 AM
OBJECTIONS to 10 Order on Motion for Miscellaneous Relief, by James Martin Arganbright, Jeremy Bennett, Dana Minteer. (Palmer, Jason)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 27, 2024
14 14 order Status Report Order ~Util - Set Hearings Wed 11/27 2:30 PM
ORDER FOR STATUS REPORT AND SETTING STATUS CONFERENCE. Telephonic Status Conference set for 6/27/2025 at 10:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly. Counsel shall call 833-990-9400 and enter ID 667-254-134 and code 6500 at the prompts to be connected to the call. Status Report due by 6/25/2025. See Order for particulars. Signed by Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly on 11/27/2024. (rls)
Related: [-]
13 13 2 pgs order Order Wed 11/27 2:24 PM
ORDER REGARDING FINAL PRETRIAL CONFERENCE REQUIREMENTS. See Order for particulars. Signed by Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly on 11/27/2024. (rls)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Fillable FPTO,
Att: 2 JERS Attorney Instructions
12 12 order Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan Wed 11/27 2:19 PM
ORDER adopting9 REGARDING PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN: Initial Disclosures Deadline 12/11/2024. Motions to Add Parties due by 1/17/2025. Motions to Amend Pleadings due by 1/17/2025. Plaintiffs Expert Witness Disclosures due by 2/18/2025. Defendants Expert Witness Disclosures due by 4/18/2025. Plaintiffs Rebuttal Witness Disclosures due by 5/19/2025. Discovery Deadline 7/18/2025. Dispositive Motion Deadline 9/12/2025. Final Pretrial Conference set for 3/13/2026 at 11:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 265 - 2nd Floor before Judge Stephen H. Locher. Jury Trial set for 3/30/2026 at 9:00 AM in Des Moines - Room 265 - 2nd Floor before Judge Stephen H. Locher. Estimated length of 4 days. Signed by Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly on 11/27/2024. (rls)
Related: [-]
11 11 minutes Scheduling Conference Wed 11/27 2:05 PM
TEXT MINUTE ENTRY for proceedings held before Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly: Telephonic Scheduling Conference held on 11/27/2024. Attorney Robert G. Rehkemper appeared on behalf of Plaintiff. Attorney Ryan Tunink appeared on behalf of Defendants. Status of case discussed. Defendants objected to proceeding with discovery based upon Defendants' Pre-Answer Motion to Dismiss3 , which is pending before Judge Locher. Plaintiff resisted Defendants objection. The Court did not find good cause to stay discovery and proceeded with scheduling trial and a discovery plan. Separate orders to follow. Total Court Time: 18 minutes. (rls)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, November 26, 2024
10 10 order Miscellaneous Relief Tue 11/26 4:10 PM
TEXT ORDER granting6 Plaintiff's Motion to Raise Security Level for Defendant's Attachment to Pre-Answer Motion to Dismiss. The Court finds good cause to seal the internal investigation report attached to Defendant's Motion to Dismiss, [3-1]. The Clerk of Court may seal ECF [3-1]. Subject to further review by the District Judge. Signed by Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly on 11/26/2024. (rls)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, November 20, 2024
9 9 motion Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan Wed 11/20 9:05 AM
PROPOSED SCHEDULING ORDER AND DISCOVERY PLAN . Related [+]
Related: [-] hkemper, Robert
Thursday, November 14, 2024
8 8 respm Response/Resistance to Motion Thu 11/14 11:28 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re6 MOTION re3 MOTION to Dismiss Pre-Answer increase security level of attachment 3-1 filed by James Martin Arganbright, Jeremy Bennett, Dana Minteer. Replies due by 11/21/2024.(Palmer, Jason)
Related: [-]
7 7 respm Reply Thu 11/14 11:25 AM
REPLY to Plaintiffs Resistance re3 MOTION to Dismiss Pre-Answer filed by James Martin Arganbright, Jeremy Bennett, Dana Minteer.(Palmer, Jason)
Related: [-]
Thursday, November 07, 2024
6 6 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 11/07 10:10 AM
MOTION re3 MOTION to Dismiss Pre-Answer increase security level of attachment by Matthew Harmann.Motions referred to William P. Kelly. Responses due by 11/21/2024. Related [+]
Related: [-] hkemper, Robert
5 5 respm Response/Resistance to Motion Thu 11/07 10:09 AM
RESPONSE to Motion re3 MOTION to Dismiss Pre-Answer filed by Matthew Harmann. Replies due by 11/14/2024. Related [+]
Related: [-] hkemper, Robert
Att: 1 Brief in Support,
Att: 2 Exhibit Original Notice of Administrative Investigation,
Att: 3 Exhibit 1st modified notice of administrative investigation,
Att: 4 Exhibit 2nd modified notice of administrative investigation
Tuesday, October 29, 2024
4 4 order Order ~Util - Set Hearings Tue 10/29 4:07 PM
TEXT ORDER SETTING SCHEDULING CONFERENCE. A Telephonic Scheduling Conference is set for 11/27/2024 at 11:00 AM before Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly. Counsel shall call 1-877-411-9748 and enter code 1376500 at the prompt to join the call. The parties shall file a Proposed Scheduling Order and Discovery Plan as provided under Local Rule 16 by 11/20/2024. Signed by Magistrate Judge William P. Kelly on 10/29/2024. (rls)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
3 3 motion Dismiss Thu 10/24 3:59 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Pre-Answer by James Martin Arganbright, Jeremy Bennett, Dana Minteer. Responses due by 11/7/2024.(Palmer, Jason)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Internal Investigation Report
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
2 2 notice Summons/Corporate Disclosure Packet Wed 09/25 9:50 AM
Summons Note: Counsel should download the attached summons in compliance with Rule 4 of the Rules of Civil Procedure for summons. (nla)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, September 24, 2024
1 1 cmp Complaint Tue 09/24 11:44 AM
COMPLAINT AND REQUEST FOR INJUNCTIVE RELIEF, AND JURY DEMAND against All Defendants Filing fee paid in the amount of $ 405, receipt number AIASDC-5560860., filed by Matthew Harmann. Notice of Dismissal for lack of Service deadline set for 12/23/2024. Rule 16 Notice of Dismissal set for 12/23/2024 Related [+]
Related: [-] hkemper, Robert