Original Case: 4:24-cv-00336

Eighth Circuit U.S. Court of Appeals
Case #: 0:25-cv-01467
Typecivil / private
Nature of Suit440 Civil Rights - Other Civil Rights
Case Filed:Mar 07, 2025
Last checked: Monday Mar 10, 2025 3:58 AM CDT
Defendant
Dana Minteer, in her individual capacity
Represented By
Jason Palmer
LAMSON & DUGAN
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
James Martin Arganbright, in his individual capacity, also known as Marty
Represented By
Jason Palmer
LAMSON & DUGAN
contact info
Ryan Tunink
LAMSON & DUGAN
contact info
Defendant - Appellant
Jeremy Bennett, in his individual capacity
Represented By
Jason Palmer
LAMSON & DUGAN
contact info
Ryan Tunink
LAMSON & DUGAN
contact info
Plaintiff - Appellee
Matthew Harmann
Represented By
Robert G. Rehkemper III
GOURLEY & REHKEMPER
contact info


Docket last updated: 03/10/2025 3:58 AM CDT
Friday, March 07, 2025
4 pgs Civil case docketed. [5493466] 25-1467 (RDB)
Related: [-]
28 pgs Originating court document filed consisting of notice of appeal, docket entries, Order dated 2/5/2025 [5493468] 25-1467 (RDB)
Related: [-]
2 pgs BRIEFING SCHEDULE SET AS FOLLOWS:
Appendix due on 04/16/2025. BRIEF OF APPELLANT James Martin Arganbright and Jeremy Bennett due 04/16/2025.
Appellee brief is due 30 days from the date the court issues the Notice of Docket Activity filing the brief of appellant.
[5493470] 25-1467 (RDB)
Related: [-]
1 pgs APPEARANCE filed by Robert G. Rehkemper for Appellee Matthew Harmann w/service 03/07/2025 [5493506] 25-1467 (RGR)
Related: [-]
1 pgs APPEARANCE filed by Jason C. Palmer for Appellants James Martin Arganbright, Jeremy Bennett and Not Party Dana Minteer w/service 03/07/2025 [5493541] 25-1467 (JP)
Related: [-]