Member Case
Lead case is: 8:24-bk-73697

New York Eastern Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 11
Judge:Louis A Scarcella
Case #: 8:24-bk-73698
Case Filed:Sep 25, 2024

TypeCorporation
Tax IDsubscribers only
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $50,000,001 to $100 million
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
32 W. 39th Midtown Properties
11 Sunrise Plz Ste 305
Valley Stream, NY 11580-6111
Represented By
Charles Wertman
Law Offices Of Charles Wertman P.C.
contact info
Last checked: never
U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
Long Island Federal Courthouse 560 Federal Plaza - Room 560
Central Islip, NY 11722


Docket last updated: 6 hours ago
Thursday, May 08, 2025
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned BK) Thu 05/08 11:27 AM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearance: Charles Wertman, Stan Yang, Michael Yellin Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 07/10/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. (DianeCorsini)
Related: [-] 5 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
Monday, May 05, 2025
38 38 order Set Last Day To File Proofs of Claim Mon 05/05 10:25 AM
Order Establishing Deadline for Filing Proofs of Claim and Manner of Notice Thereof. Proofs of Claims due by 6/2/2025. Government Proof of Claim due by 6/2/2025. Signed on 5/5/2025 (dhc)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, April 09, 2025
37 37 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Wed 04/09 12:28 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 03/31/2025 Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of 32 W. 39th Midtown Properties, LLC (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-]
36 36 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Wed 04/09 12:27 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 02/28/2025 Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of 32 W. 39th Midtown Properties, LLC (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-]
Tuesday, April 08, 2025
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned BK) Tue 04/08 12:01 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearance: Charles Wertman, Michael Yellin, Stan Yang, David Goldwasser. Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 05/08/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. (DianeCorsini)
Related: [-] 5 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP) Tue 04/08 12:02 PM
Hearing Held; Appearance: Charles Wertman, Michael Yellin, Stan Yang, David Goldwasser. Proposed Order to be submitted for review Related [+] (DianeCorsini)
Related: [-] 21 Application to Employ filed by 32 W. 39th Midtown Properties, LLC
Monday, April 07, 2025
35 35 motion Employ (Application) Mon 04/07 12:59 PM
Application to Employ Lar-Dan Affidavit Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of 32 W. 39th Midtown Properties, LLC Related [+]. (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-] 21 Application to Employ filed by Debtor 32 W. 39th Midtown Properties, LLC,22 Application to Employ filed by Debtor 32 W. 39th Midtown Properties, LLC
Saturday, March 08, 2025
34 34 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Consolidation and Amend Caption Sun 03/09 12:08 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Consolidation and Amend Caption Notice Date 03/08/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 07, 2025
33 33 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Amended Caption Sat 03/08 12:11 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Amended Caption Notice Date 03/07/2025. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, March 06, 2025
32 32 order Joint Administration Thu 03/06 9:23 AM
Order Granting Motion For Joint Administration on Lead Case: 24-73697 28 W. 36 Herald Properties, LLC with Member Cases: 24-73698 32 W. 39th Midtown Properties, LLC; 24-74854 32 W. 39th Street Sole Member, LLC; 24-74848 28 W. 36th Street Sole Member, LLC Related [+] Signed on 3/6/2025. (dhc)
Related: [-] 15
court Entry Thu 03/06 11:44 AM
An order has been entered in this case directing the joint administration, for procedural purposes only, of the chapter 11 cases of 28 W. 36 Herald Properties, LLC, 32 W. 39th Midtown Properties, LLC, 32 W. 39th Street Sole Member, LLC, and 28 W. 36th Street Sole Member, LLC. The docket in chapter 11 case of 28 W. 36 Herald Properties, LLC, Case No. 24-73697 (las), should be consulted for all matters affecting these jointly administered cases. (dhc)
Related: [-]
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned BK) Thu 03/06 11:55 AM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; - Appearance: Charles Wertman, Stan Yang, Michael Yellin, David Goldwasser, Ted Donovan. Status hearing to be held on 04/08/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. Related [+] (dhc)
Related: [-] 5 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Document BK & AP) Thu 03/06 11:56 AM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; - Appearance: Charles Wertman, Stan Yang, Michael Yellin, David Goldwasser, Ted Donovan. 'Hearing scheduled for 04/08/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY Related [+] (dhc)
Related: [-] 21 Application to Employ Filed by Debtor 32 W. 39th Midtown Properties, LLC
Wednesday, March 05, 2025
31 31 order Amending Caption (Name) Wed 03/05 2:42 PM
Order Amending Caption from 32 W. 39th Midtown Properties to 32 W. 39th Midtown Properties, LLC. (30 Amend Caption). Signed on 3/5/2025 (dhc)
Related: [-]
30 30 motion Amend Caption (Name ONLY) Wed 03/05 2:20 PM
Motion to Amend Caption Amend Caption from 32 W39th Midtown Properties to 32 W39th Midtown Properties LLC Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of 32 W. 39th Midtown Properties. (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-]
Monday, March 03, 2025
29 29 motion Amend Caption (Name ONLY) Mon 03/03 8:07 PM
Motion to Amend Caption amend name from 32 W39th Midtown Properties to 32 W39th Midtown Properties LLC Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of 32 W. 39th Midtown Properties. (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Wednesday, February 26, 2025
28 28 misc Letter Wed 02/26 3:24 PM
Letter Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of 32 W. 39th Midtown Properties (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-]
27 27 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Wed 02/26 2:51 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 01/31/2025 Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of 32 W. 39th Midtown Properties (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-]
26 26 misc Letter Wed 02/26 10:52 AM
Letter Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of 32 W. 39th Midtown Properties (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-]
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Case Owned BK) Wed 02/26 4:31 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Status hearing to be held on 03/06/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. (DianeCorsini)
Related: [-] 5 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Adjourned Without Hearing (Document BK & AP) Wed 02/26 4:31 PM
Adjourned Without Hearing Related [+] Hearing scheduled for 03/06/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. (DianeCorsini)
Related: [-] 21 Application to Employ filed by 32 W. 39th Midtown Properties
Monday, February 24, 2025
25 25 misc Affidavit Mon 02/24 8:55 PM
Affidavit Re: Lar Dan Affidavit Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of 32 W. 39th Midtown Properties Related [+] (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-] 21 Application to Employ filed by Debtor 32 W. 39th Midtown Properties,22 Application to Employ filed by Debtor 32 W. 39th Midtown Properties
Friday, February 14, 2025
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Withdrawn/Denied/Marked Off Without Hearing - Text (Case Owned BK & AP) Fri 02/14 1:22 PM
Withdrawn without hearing by letter Related [+] (DianeCorsini)
Related: [-] 12 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by LSC West 36th & 39th LLC
Thursday, February 13, 2025
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Document BK & AP) Thu 02/13 12:04 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearance: Charles Wertman, David Goldwasser, Stan Yang, Michael Yellin. Hearing scheduled for 02/27/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY Related [+] (dhc)
Related: [-] 5 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held (Document BK & AP) Thu 02/13 12:05 PM
Hearing Held; Appearance: Charles Wertman, David Goldwasser, Stan Yang, Michael Yellin. Motion Granted, Submit Order Related [+] (dhc)
Related: [-] 15 Motion for Joint Administration Filed by Debtor 32 W. 39th Midtown Properties
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Document BK & AP) Thu 02/13 12:06 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearance: Charles Wertman, David Goldwasser, Stan Yang, Michael Yellin. Hearing scheduled for 02/27/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY Related [+] (dhc)
Related: [-] 21 Application to Employ Filed by Debtor 32 W. 39th Midtown Properties
Tuesday, January 28, 2025
24 24 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Tue 01/28 3:24 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of 32 W. 39th Midtown Properties Related [+] (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-] 21 Application to Employ filed by Debtor 32 W. 39th Midtown Properties
23 23 misc Affidavit/Certificate of Service Tue 01/28 3:23 PM
Affidavit/Certificate of Service Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of 32 W. 39th Midtown Properties Related [+] (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-] 15 Motion for Joint Administration filed by Debtor 32 W. 39th Midtown Properties
Monday, January 27, 2025
22 22 motion Employ (Application) Mon 01/27 10:45 AM
Application to Employ Amended Notice of Hearing Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of 32 W. 39th Midtown Properties Related [+]. Hearing scheduled for 2/13/2025 at 10:00 AM (check with court for location). (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-] 21 Application to Employ filed by Debtor 32 W. 39th Midtown Properties
Sunday, January 26, 2025
21 21 0 pgs motion Employ (Application) Sun 01/26 10:27 AM
Application to Employ Charles Wertman, Esq. as Attorney for Debtor Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of 32 W. 39th Midtown Properties. Hearing scheduled for 2/13/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 7 pgs Application
Att: 2 declaration
Att: 3 Proposed Order
Thursday, January 16, 2025
20 20 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Thu 01/16 12:36 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 12/31/2024 Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of 32 W. 39th Midtown Properties (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-]
19 19 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Thu 01/16 12:35 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 11/30/2024 Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of 32 W. 39th Midtown Properties (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-]
18 18 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Thu 01/16 12:34 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 10/31/2024 Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of 32 W. 39th Midtown Properties (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-]
17 17 misc Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report UST Form 11-MOR Thu 01/16 12:32 PM
Chapter 11 Monthly Operating Report for the Month Ending: 09/30/2024 Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of 32 W. 39th Midtown Properties (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-]
16 16 misc Letter Thu 01/16 8:36 AM
Letter Withdrawing Motion Filed by Michael R Yellin on behalf of LSC West 36th & 39th LLC Related [+] (Yellin, Michael)
Related: [-] 12 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Creditor LSC West 36th & 39th LLC
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned BK) Fri 01/17 12:02 PM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearance: Stan Yang, Charles Wertman, Michael Yellin, David Goldwasser. Status hearing to be held on 02/13/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY Related [+] (DianeCorsini)
Related: [-] 5 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
Wednesday, January 15, 2025
15 15 motion Joint Administration Wed 01/15 3:40 PM
Motion for Joint Administration of Case 24-73697 with Case(s) 24-73698 24-74854 24-74848 Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of 32 W. 39th Midtown Properties. Hearing scheduled for 2/13/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Application
Att: 2 Proposed Order
Monday, January 06, 2025
14 14 misc Declaration Mon 01/06 6:55 PM
Declaration Filed by Michael R Yellin on behalf of LSC West 36th & 39th LLC Related [+] (Yellin, Michael)
Related: [-] 12 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Creditor LSC West 36th & 39th LLC,13 Declaration filed by Creditor LSC West 36th & 39th LLC
Att: 1 Exhibit Dickenson A (1 of 2) - Loan Agreement
Att: 2 Exhibit Dickenson A (2 of 2) - Loan Agreement
Att: 3 Exhibit Dickenson B - Promissory Note
Att: 4 Exhibit Dickenson C - Mortgage (CEMA)
Att: 5 Exhibit Dickenson D - Assignment of Leases and Rents
Att: 6 Exhibit Dickenson E - W. 36 & W. 39 - Pledge Agreement
Att: 7 Exhibit Dickenson F - W. 36 & W. 39 - Pledge Agreement
Att: 8 Exhibit Dickenson G - 2022 Allonge
Att: 9 Exhibit Dickenson H - W. 36 & W. 39 - Loan Modification Agreement
Att: 10 Exhibit Dickenson I - August 2 2023 Letter
Att: 11 Exhibit Dickenson J - Dec 11 2023 Letter
Att: 12 Exhibit Dickenson K - Feb 23 Email
Att: 13 Exhibit Dickenson L - 2023 Allonge
13 13 misc Declaration Mon 01/06 6:44 PM
Declaration Filed by Michael R Yellin on behalf of LSC West 36th & 39th LLC Related [+] (Yellin, Michael)
Related: [-] 12 Motion to Dismiss Case filed by Creditor LSC West 36th & 39th LLC
Att: 1 Exhibit Yellin A - Notice of UCC Sale
Att: 2 Exhibit Yellin B - Notice of Adjournment
Att: 3 Exhibit Yellin C - 39th St. Petition
Att: 4 Exhibit Yellin D - 36th St. Petition
12 12 motion Dismiss Case Mon 01/06 6:38 PM
Motion to Dismiss Case /LSC West 36th & 39th St LLCs Motion for Entry of an Order: (I) Dismissing 28 W. Herald Properties, LLCs and 32 W. 39th Midtown Properties, LLCs Chapter 11 Cases Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 1112(B) or, Alternatively, (II) Granting Lender Relief from the Automatic Stay Pursuant to 11 U.S.C. § 362(d) Filed by Michael R Yellin on behalf of LSC West 36th & 39th LLC. Hearing scheduled for 2/27/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 963 (LAS), MM Conf Hrgs-Mtns to Dismiss. (Yellin, Michael)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Proposed Order for Motion to Dismiss Mezz Entity Bankruptcy
Wednesday, December 18, 2024
11 11 misc Statement Wed 12/18 1:06 PM
Corporate Resolution Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of 32 W. 39th Midtown Properties (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Action By Written Consent
Thursday, November 21, 2024
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned BK) Fri 11/22 8:21 AM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearance: Charles Wertman, David Goldwasser, Stan Yang, Michael Yellin. Status hearing to be held on 01/16/2025 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. Related [+] (dhc)
Related: [-] 5 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
Monday, November 04, 2024
trustee Statement Adjourning 341(a) Meeting of Creditors Mon 11/04 1:25 PM
Trustee's Notice of Continued Meeting of Creditors Filed by United States Trustee. 341(a) Meeting Adjourned to 11/7/2024 at 10:00 AM at Telephonic Meeting: Phone 1 (877) 929-0538, Participant Code 4551117, Enter # sign. (Yang, Stan)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 24, 2024
10 10 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Filing of Official Transcript (BK) Fri 10/25 12:09 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Filing of Official Transcript (BK) Notice Date 10/24/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Monday, October 21, 2024
9 9 court Transcript (Attorney Ordered) Mon 10/21 5:31 PM
Transcript & Notice regarding the hearing held on 10/10/24. Pursuant to the new policy adopted by the Judicial Conference, transcripts are available for inspection only at the Office of the Clerk or may be purchased from the court transcriber. [Please see the court's website for contact information for the Transcription Service Agency].. Notice of Intent to Request Redaction Due By 10/28/2024. Redaction Request Due By 11/12/2024. Redacted Transcript Submission Due By 11/21/2024. TRANSCRIPT ACCESS WILL BE ELECTRONICALLY RESTRICTED THROUGH 01/21/2025 AND MAY BE VIEWED AT THE OFFICE OF THE CLERK. (Veritext)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
court zMinute Entry - Hearing Held and Adjourned (Case Owned BK) Thu 10/10 10:43 AM
Hearing Held and Adjourned; Appearance: Stan Yang, Charles Wertman, Michael YellinStatus hearing to be held on 11/21/2024 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. Related [+] (DianeCorsini)
Related: [-] 5 Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference
Saturday, September 28, 2024
8 8 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Sun 09/29 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice/Order Notice Date 09/28/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
7 7 court BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Sun 09/29 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing with Notice of Deficient Filing Notice Date 09/28/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
6 6 court BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Sun 09/29 12:10 AM
BNC Certificate of Mailing - Meeting of Creditors Notice Date 09/28/2024. (Admin.)
Related: [-]
Thursday, September 26, 2024
5 5 order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference (Ch 11) All Judges Thu 09/26 4:21 PM
Order Scheduling Initial Case Management Conference. Status hearing to be held on 10/10/2024 at 10:00 AM at Courtroom 970 (Judge Scarcella), CI, NY. Signed on 9/26/2024 (dhc)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Thu 09/26 3:54 PM
Notice of Appearance and Request for Notice Filed by Michael R Yellin on behalf of LSC West 36th & 39th LLC (Yellin, Michael)
Related: [-]
2 2 trustee Meeting of Creditors Chapter 11 - US Trustee Thu 09/26 9:18 AM
Meeting of Creditors Filed by United States Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held on 10/28/2024 at 10:00 AM at Telephonic Meeting: Phone 1 (877) 929-0538, Participant Code 4551117, Enter # sign. (Yang, Stan)
Related: [-]
court Case Related to a Chapter 11 Thu 09/26 7:46 AM
The above case is related to Case Number(s) 24-72586 las The Gateway at Wynwood LLC, 24-73697 las 28 W. 36 Herald Properties, LLC (drk)
Related: [-]
court Case Related to a Chapter 11 Thu 09/26 8:08 AM
The above case is related to Case Number(s) 24-72589 las, 2830 Wynwood Properties LLC (dng)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, September 25, 2024
3 3 court Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Thu 09/26 9:32 AM
Deficient Filing Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition [Pages 1-8] (TO INCLUDE NAICS CODE QUESTION #7) due by 9/25/2024. Statement Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1073-2b due by 9/25/2024. Affidavit Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1007-4 due 9/25/2024. Corporate Resolution Pursuant to E.D.N.Y. LBR 1074-1(a) due by 9/25/2024. Corporate Ownership Statement Pursuant to FBR 1007(a)(1) due 9/25/2024. Corporate Disclosure Statement Pursuant to FBR 1073-3 due 9/25/2024. Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non Individual Debtors Official Form 202 due 10/9/2024. List of Equity Security Holders due 10/9/2024. Incomplete Filings due by 10/9/2024. (dng)
Related: [-]
1 1 41 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Wed 09/25 10:41 PM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for Non-Individuals. Fee Amount $ 1738. Filed by Charles Wertman on behalf of 32 W. 39th Midtown Properties Chapter 11 Plan due by 01/23/2025. Disclosure Statement due by 01/23/2025. (Wertman, Charles)
Related: [-]
crditcrd Automatic docket of credit card/debit card Wed 09/25 10:48 PM
Receipt of Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11)([LINK:8 24-73698 ) [misc,volp11a] (1738.00) Filing Fee. Receipt number A22980965. Fee amount 1738.00. Related [+] (U.S. Treasury)
Related: [-] Doc#1