Member Case
Lead case is: 5:24-bk-02216

Pennsylvania Middle Bankruptcy Court
Chapter 7
Judge:Mark J Conway
Case #: 4:24-bk-02454
Case Filed:Sep 27, 2024

TypeCorporation
# of Creditors1-49
Est. Assets$0 to $50,000
Est. Liabilities $0 to $50,000
Nature of Business Other
Nature of Debts Primarily Business

Debtor
Cambridge Warren, LLC
706 Pennsylvania Avenue
Warren, PA 16365
Represented By
Ronald V. Santora
Bresset And Santora
contact info
Last checked: never
Asst. U.S. Trustee
United States Trustee
US Courthouse 1501 N. 6th St
Harrisburg, PA 17102
Represented By
Gregory Benjamin Schiller
Us Department Of Justice
contact info
Joseph P Schalk
Doj-Ust
contact info


Docket last updated: 09/26/2024 8:00 PM EDT
Friday, September 27, 2024
1 1 4 pgs misc Voluntary Petition (Chapter 11) Fri 09/27 8:22 AM
Chapter 11 Voluntary Petition for a Non-Individual . Filing fee due in the amount of $1738.00. Filed by Ronald V. Santora of Bresset and Santora on behalf of Cambridge Warren, LLC. (Santora, Ronald)
Related: [-]
2 2 misc Schedules A-J and/or Summary of Assets and Liabilities (do NOT use this for Amendments) Fri 09/27 8:25 AM
Schedule A-B; Schedule D; Schedule E-F; Schedule G; Schedule H; Summary of Assets and Liabilities; Filed by Ronald V. Santora of Bresset and Santora on behalf of Cambridge Warren, LLC Related [+]. (Santora, Ronald)
Related: [-] 1
3 3 misc Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors (Form 202) Fri 09/27 8:26 AM
Declaration Under Penalty of Perjury for Non-Individual Debtors Filed by Ronald V. Santora of Bresset and Santora on behalf of Cambridge Warren, LLC Related [+]. (Santora, Ronald)
Related: [-] 2
4 4 misc Statement of Financial Affairs (Form 107) or (Form 207) (do NOT use this for Amendments) Fri 09/27 8:27 AM
Statement of Financial Affairs for Non-Individuals Filing for Bankruptcy Filed by Ronald V. Santora of Bresset and Santora on behalf of Cambridge Warren, LLC Related [+]. (Santora, Ronald)
Related: [-] 1
5 5 misc List of Creditors Who Have the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Fri 09/27 8:30 AM
For Non-Individual Chapter 11 Cases: List of Creditors Who Have the 20 Largest Unsecured Claims Filed by Ronald V. Santora of Bresset and Santora on behalf of Cambridge Warren, LLC. (Santora, Ronald)
Related: [-]
6 6 misc Appearance (Entry and/or Withdrawal) Fri 09/27 8:40 AM
Entry of Appearance of STEVEN G. BRESSET, ESQ. AS CO-COUNSEL FOR DEBTOR Filed by Ronald V. Santora of Bresset and Santora on behalf of Cambridge Warren, LLC. (Santora, Ronald)
Related: [-]
7 7 9 pgs motion Employ (do NOT use to Employ/Appoint an Examiner, Ombudsman, Trustee) Fri 09/27 8:59 AM
Application to Employ Bresset & Santora, LLC as Attorney. Filed by Ronald V. Santora of Bresset and Santora on behalf of Cambridge Warren, LLC. (Santora, Ronald)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Proposed Order
Att: 2 Affidavit of Disinterestedness Declaration of Stephen G. Bresset, Esq.
Att: 3 Exhibit Declaration of Steven Atlass
8 8 misc Appearance (Entry and/or Withdrawal) Fri 09/27 8:59 AM
Entry of Appearance of Gregory B. Schiller, Esquire Filed by Gregory Benjamin Schiller of US Department of Justice on behalf of United States Trustee. (Schiller, Gregory)
Related: [-]
9 9 misc Appearance (Entry and/or Withdrawal) Fri 09/27 9:01 AM
Entry of Appearance of Joseph P. Schalk, Esquire Filed by Joseph P Schalk of DOJ-Ust on behalf of United States Trustee. (Schalk, Joseph)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor (Form 2030) or Petition Preparer (Form 2800) Fri 09/27 9:13 AM
Disclosure of Compensation of Attorney for Debtor Filed by Ronald V. Santora of Bresset and Santora on behalf of Cambridge Warren, LLC Related [+]. (Santora, Ronald)
Related: [-] 1
11 11 court Creditors Uploaded Fri 09/27 1:45 PM
Creditors were uploaded by Attorney Ronald V. Santora. This entry has been made by the Clerks Office because the entry Creditor List Uploaded was not docketed by the filing party. (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) Related [+]. (Wojtowicz, Courtney)
Related: [-] 1
12 12 order Filing Fee Due Fri 09/27 1:51 PM
Order filing fee due in the amount of $ 1738.00 for Bankruptcy Petition Related [+]. Amount due on: 10/4/2024. (Wojtowicz, Courtney)
Related: [-] 1
13 13 trustee Meeting of Creditors Scheduled (Ch. 11) Fri 09/27 4:08 PM
Clerk to provide notice of meeting of creditors to all parties in interest. (There is no image or paper document associated with this entry.) Filed by U.S. Trustee. 341(a) meeting to be held 10/29/2024 at 03:30 PM - for Ch 11 only. The 341 meeting will be conducted by telephone. Refer to the call-in instructions. (Schalk, Joseph)
Related: [-]