Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-md-03126

Montana District Court
Judge:Brian Morris
Case #: 2:24-cv-00115
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Oct 09, 2024
Case in other court:California Central, 2:24-cv-04580
Last checked: Monday Apr 07, 2025 2:35 AM MDT
Defendant
Live Nation Entertainment, Inc.
Represented By
James Michael Pearl
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Raymond Stockstill, IV
Paul Hastings, LLP
contact info
Raymond W. Stockstill
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
James Pearl
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
D. Scott Carlton
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Daniel Scott Carlton
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Defendant
Ticketmaster, LLC
Represented By
James Michael Pearl
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Raymond Stockstill, IV
Paul Hastings, LLP
contact info
Raymond W. Stockstill
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
James Pearl
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
D. Scott Carlton
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Daniel Scott Carlton
Paul Hastings LLP
contact info
Plaintiff
Stephanie Evangelista
Represented By
Edward Ciolko
Sterlington, PLLC
contact info
Edward W. Ciolko
Sterlington PLLC
contact info
Ryan J. Clarkson
Clarkson Law Firm PC
contact info
Tiara Avaness
Clarkson Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Jennifer S. Czeisler
Sterlington PLLC
contact info
Yana A. Hart
Clarkson Law Firm
contact info
Plaintiff
Amy Getman
Represented By
Edward Ciolko
Sterlington, PLLC
contact info
Edward W. Ciolko
Sterlington PLLC
contact info
Ryan J. Clarkson
Clarkson Law Firm PC
contact info
Tiara Avaness
Clarkson Law Firm, P.C.
contact info
Jennifer S. Czeisler
Sterlington PLLC
contact info
Yana A. Hart
Clarkson Law Firm
contact info

GPO Nov 01 2024
ORDER granting 35 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Edward Ciolko. Counsel shall file a notice of appearance in the master docket 2:24-md-3126-BMM. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/1/2024. (MMS)

Docket last updated: 5 hours ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
55 55 motion Leave to File Under Seal - SDM Fri 05/16 9:55 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits to Their Forthcoming Motion to Compel Arbitration Under Seal . Paul Anthony Werner, III appearing for MDL - Notice Only Lendingtree, LLC, QuoteWizard.com, LLC, Defendants Lendingtree, LLC, LendingTree, LLC, Lendingtree, LLC. Associated Cases: 2:24-md-03126-BMM-JTJ et al. (Werner, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit F,
Att: 6 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit G,
Att: 7 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit H