Montana District Court
Judge:Brian Morris
Referred: John Johnston
Case #: 2:24-md-03126
Nature of Suit190 Contract - Other Contract
Cause28:1332 Diversity-Other Contract
Case Filed:Oct 08, 2024
Defendant
Advance Stores Company, Incorporated
Defendant
Hot Topic, Inc.
Defendant
Lead Defense Counsel and Liaison Counsel
Defendant
Torrid, LLC
In Re
Debby Worley
In Re
Jolinda Murphy
In Re
Latosha Austin
In Re
Lauren Neve
In Re
LeVonne Madden
In Re
Linda Pierce
In Re
Molly O'Hara
In Re
Natasha McIntosh
In Re
Nathan Thomas
In Re
Roscoe Eldridge
In Re
Snowflake, Inc. Data Security Breach Litigation
In Re
Susie Garcia
In Re
Valerie Lozoya
Interested Party
AT&T Inc.
Interested Party
CHRIS SCHULTE
Interested Party
Lori Young
MDL - Notice Only
Aaron Macom
MDL - Notice Only
Adam Levy
MDL - Notice Only
Advance Auto Parts, Inc.
MDL - Notice Only
Advance Stores Company, Incorporated
MDL - Notice Only
Aisha Wright
MDL - Notice Only
Alessandra Conte
MDL - Notice Only
Alex Mirvis
MDL - Notice Only
Alex Petroski
MDL - Notice Only
Alexis Morgan
MDL - Notice Only
Alicia LeDuc Montgomery
MDL - Notice Only
Alin Pop
MDL - Notice Only
Alisa Smith
MDL - Notice Only
Allen Gaters
MDL - Notice Only
Amanda Schwartz
MDL - Notice Only
Amber Craig
MDL - Notice Only
Amy Getman
MDL - Notice Only
Andrea Burns
MDL - Notice Only
Angela Garrett
MDL - Notice Only
Angela Haughton
MDL - Notice Only
Antoun Nader
MDL - Notice Only
AT&T Inc.
MDL - Notice Only
AT&T Mobility, LLC
MDL - Notice Only
Box Lunch
MDL - Notice Only
Brendan Healy
MDL - Notice Only
Brian Riley
MDL - Notice Only
Bryan Curtis
MDL - Notice Only
Caleb Aaron Cook
MDL - Notice Only
Carla Bartz
MDL - Notice Only
Carly Leskovar
MDL - Notice Only
Caroline Anderson
MDL - Notice Only
Charles Fitzgerald
MDL - Notice Only
Charles McGee
MDL - Notice Only
Chastine Dickey-Johnson
MDL - Notice Only
Chris Rippel
MDL - Notice Only
CHRIS SCHULTE
MDL - Notice Only
Christina Fordham
MDL - Notice Only
Christina Xian
MDL - Notice Only
Christopher M Brain
MDL - Notice Only
Christopher M. Jones
MDL - Notice Only
CHRYSTAL PELOSI
MDL - Notice Only
Cindy Wallace
MDL - Notice Only
Collegedale Credit Union
MDL - Notice Only
Corey Poluk
MDL - Notice Only
Cricket Wireless, LLC
MDL - Notice Only
Cynthia Ryan
MDL - Notice Only
Daniel Pomeroy
MDL - Notice Only
Danielle James
MDL - Notice Only
David Freifeld
MDL - Notice Only
David Hornthal
MDL - Notice Only
Debbie Hale
MDL - Notice Only
Debby Worley
MDL - Notice Only
Dekima Thomas
MDL - Notice Only
Dina Winger
MDL - Notice Only
Don Smith
MDL - Notice Only
Dylan Joseph Dragone
MDL - Notice Only
Elaine Cheatwood
MDL - Notice Only
Elizabeth Quinby
MDL - Notice Only
Emmanuel Chaidez
MDL - Notice Only
Eric Anderson
MDL - Notice Only
Erin Lewis
MDL - Notice Only
Faisal Moledina
MDL - Notice Only
Financial Horizons Credit Union
MDL - Notice Only
First Choice Federal Credit Union
MDL - Notice Only
Gary Carr
MDL - Notice Only
Gerry McAuley
MDL - Notice Only
Gilbert Criswell
MDL - Notice Only
Gregory Vogel
MDL - Notice Only
Hao Zhe Wang
MDL - Notice Only
Hot Topic, Inc.
MDL - Notice Only
Iran Carranza
MDL - Notice Only
James Arkett
MDL - Notice Only
James Curry
MDL - Notice Only
Jamila A. Armstrong
MDL - Notice Only
Jamillah Sherman
MDL - Notice Only
Jane Doe
MDL - Notice Only
Janice Stewart
MDL - Notice Only
Jean Ann Smith
MDL - Notice Only
Jennifer Carter
MDL - Notice Only
Jennifer Nitti
MDL - Notice Only
Jeremiah Townsend
MDL - Notice Only
Jessica Miller
MDL - Notice Only
Jessie Leal
MDL - Notice Only
Jillian Clark
MDL - Notice Only
Jodi Caballero
MDL - Notice Only
John Doe
MDL - Notice Only
John Giangiulio
MDL - Notice Only
John R Wilkinson
MDL - Notice Only
Jolinda Murphy
MDL - Notice Only
Jonathan Marra
MDL - Notice Only
Jonathan Weaver
MDL - Notice Only
Jonathon Hollis
MDL - Notice Only
Joshua Bobbitt
MDL - Notice Only
Kathy Martin
MDL - Notice Only
Kelley Davis
MDL - Notice Only
Kimberly Blake
MDL - Notice Only
Lamibia Dunham
MDL - Notice Only
Latosha Austin
MDL - Notice Only
Lauren Neve
MDL - Notice Only
Lauren Woon
MDL - Notice Only
Lavonne Madden
MDL - Notice Only
Leigh Dundas
MDL - Notice Only
Lendingtree, LLC
MDL - Notice Only
LeVonne Madden
MDL - Notice Only
Linda Pierce
MDL - Notice Only
Lisa McIntosh
MDL - Notice Only
Live Nation Entertainment, Inc.
MDL - Notice Only
Live Nation Worldwide Inc
MDL - Notice Only
Lori Young
MDL - Notice Only
Lorie DuPreez
MDL - Notice Only
Maddalena Bowers
MDL - Notice Only
Marc Reichbart
MDL - Notice Only
Mari Miller
MDL - Notice Only
Matthew Miller
MDL - Notice Only
Mia Nitti
MDL - Notice Only
Michael Lawler
MDL - Notice Only
Michael Walters
MDL - Notice Only
Molly O'Hara
MDL - Notice Only
Morgan Murphy
MDL - Notice Only
Natalie Gianne
MDL - Notice Only
Natasha McIntosh
MDL - Notice Only
Nathan Thomas
MDL - Notice Only
Neiman Marcus Group, LLC
MDL - Notice Only
New Orleans Firemen's Federal Credit Union
MDL - Notice Only
Nicholas Layman
MDL - Notice Only
Nick Margeas
MDL - Notice Only
Omaha Federal Credit Union
MDL - Notice Only
Owen Conlan
MDL - Notice Only
Patricia Marshall
MDL - Notice Only
Peggy A. Williams
MDL - Notice Only
QuoteWizard.com, LLC
MDL - Notice Only
Raven Richardson
MDL - Notice Only
Raymond S. Moule
MDL - Notice Only
Raymond Swain
MDL - Notice Only
Richard Olivieri
MDL - Notice Only
Robert Jones
MDL - Notice Only
Rosalia Garcia
MDL - Notice Only
Roscoe Eldridge
MDL - Notice Only
Ryan Jossart
MDL - Notice Only
Santisha Bryant-Booker
MDL - Notice Only
Serena Chapman
MDL - Notice Only
Shannon Spencer
MDL - Notice Only
Sharon Wenze
MDL - Notice Only
Snowflake, Inc.
MDL - Notice Only
Sophia Nitti
MDL - Notice Only
Star Ghanaat
MDL - Notice Only
Stefondra Monroe
MDL - Notice Only
Stephanie Evangelista
MDL - Notice Only
Steven Jeffrey Howitt
MDL - Notice Only
Susie Garcia
MDL - Notice Only
Terry Lane Yates
MDL - Notice Only
Terry Neblock
MDL - Notice Only
Ticketmaster, LLC
MDL - Notice Only
Tiffany Moore
MDL - Notice Only
Tina Powell
MDL - Notice Only
Torrid, LLC
MDL - Notice Only
Traci Lively
MDL - Notice Only
Valerie Lozoya
MDL - Notice Only
Vanessa Rason
MDL - Notice Only
Veronica Ryan
MDL - Notice Only
Virginia Nickels
MDL - Notice Only
Wayne Pina
MDL - Notice Only
William Kirby
MDL - Notice Only
William Yarbough
Plaintiff
Advanced Auto Liaison Counsel
Plaintiff
Angela Garrett
Plaintiff
AT&T Liaison Counsel
Plaintiff
Consulting and Testifying Expert Committee
Plaintiff
Financial Institutions Claims
Plaintiff
LAUSD Liaison Counsel
Plaintiff
Law and Briefing Committee
Plaintiff
Lending Tree Liaison Counsel
Plaintiff
Offensive Discovery Committee
Plaintiff
Plaintiff Vetting and Defensive Discovery Team
Plaintiff
Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Counsel
Plaintiff
Plaintiffs' Executive Committee
Plaintiff
Plaintiffs' Steering Committee
Plaintiff
Settlement Team
Plaintiff
Snowflake Liaison Counsel
Plaintiff
Third-Party and Investigative Committee
Plaintiff
Ticketmaster Liaison Counsel
Special Master
John Johnston

GPO Oct 08 2024
CERTIFIED COPY OF TRANSFER ORDER from Judicial Panel on Multidistrict Litigation pursuant to 28 USC 1407 that the actions pending in districts other than the District of Montana are transferred to the District of Montana, creating MDL 3126. Case assigned to Judge Brian Morris. (MMS)
GPO Oct 16 2024
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-1). (MMS)
GPO Oct 18 2024
ORDER REINSTATING STAY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER. (WANG) (MMS)
GPO Oct 18 2024
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-2) (MMS)
GPO Oct 21 2024
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-3). (MMS)
GPO Oct 21 2024
ORDER REGARDING INITIAL CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/21/2024. (MMS)
GPO Oct 23 2024
ORDER REGARDING NOTICE: The Court has set an initial case management conference for November 14, 2024, at 10:00 a.m. Parties are instructed to send a notice via email to: mtd_publicinquires@mtd.uscourts.gov by November 1, 2024, regarding: 1. Whether they intend to appear in person or by Zoom. 2. Whether they intend to address the Court at the conference on November 14, 2024. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/23/2024. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 10/23/2024. (MMS)
GPO Nov 01 2024
ORDER granting 155 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Gregory Egleston. Counsel shall file a notice of appearance in the master docket 2:24-md-3126-BMM. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/1/2024. (MMS)
GPO Nov 07 2024
/a>.. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/7/2024. (MMS)ORDER granting 211 Motion to Appear Pro Hac Vice for Attorney Jason S. Rathod. NOTE: Instructions to request Montana CM/ECF registration through PACER are found here<
GPO Nov 13 2024
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-4) (MMS)
GPO Nov 15 2024
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-5) (MMS)
GPO Nov 27 2024
ORDER Adopting Plaintiffs' Proposed Leadership Structure re 253. Plaintiffs' Co-Lead Counsel's Proposed Leadership Structure is adopted. Plaintiffs' Leadership shall perform the duties detailed in the Court's Order Appointing Leadership Counsel and Case Management Order 248, and other tasks assigned in future case management orders. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 11/27/2024. (MMS)
GPO Dec 12 2024
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-6) (MMS)
GPO Dec 20 2024
ORDER ON NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL OF MEMBER CASE re 268 Notice filed by Angela Garrett. The hearing on the motion to sever currently set for January 9, 2025, is VACATED. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 12/20/2024. (MMS)
GPO Dec 20 2024
ORDER REGARDING ISSUES IDENTIFIED IN THE PARTIES' JOINT MEMORANDUM. IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that: The Parties will submit simultaneous briefs of no more than 10 pages by January 3, 2025, addressing each partys position on the Modified Initial Disclosures described in Appendix B (Doc. 266 at 2831); The Parties will meet and confer regarding the issue of the form of the complaint and use of a representative complaint and submit a joint briefing schedule by January 8, 2025; and The Parties will meet and confer regarding the timing for submitting motions to compel arbitration and Rule 12 motions to dismiss and submit a jointbriefing schedule by January 8, 2025. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 12/20/2024. (MMS)
GPO Jan 03 2025
ORDER regarding 271 Motion to Clarify: IT IS HEREBY ORDERED that:1)The Parties will submit simultaneous briefs of no more than 10 pages addressing the whether the Plaintiffs should file a representative complaint or a superseding complaint. The Parties will submit these briefs by the close of business on Tuesday, January 7, 2025. The Parties should be prepared to address these issues at the hearing on January 9, 2025. 2)The Parties will file motions to compel arbitration and Rule 12 motions to dismiss sequentially. The Parties will meet and confer and submit a joint proposed schedule for filing motions to compel arbitration and accompanying briefs in support no later than January 8, 2025. The joint schedule also should propose a timeline for filing Rule 12 motions to dismiss within a date certain after the Court has resolved all issues related to any motions to compel arbitration. This Order supersedes items Number 2 and Number 3 in the Courts Order on December 20, 2024 (Doc. 270). Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/3/2025. (SLL)
GPO Jan 08 2025
NOTICE OF AGENDA FOR CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE: The Court has set a case management conference for January 9, 2025, at 1:30 p.m. (Doc. 248.) This Notice serves to alert Parties to the topics of discussion at the case management conference. Modified Initial Disclosures described in Appendix B of the 266 Parties Joint Memorandum; Form of the Complaint; Initial Proposed Schedule (Doc. 266 at 25-26); the Parties' Joint Proposed Schedule for motions to compel arbitration and Rule 12 motions to dismiss; Any other pressing issues counsel wish to address. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 1/8/2025. (SLL) Modified on 1/8/2025 to update text(ACC).
GPO Feb 03 2025
ORDER GRANTING 318 MOTION to Stay all Deadlines Pending Approval of Class Action Settlement. All deadlines involving Defendants Neiman and Neiman Marcus Group LLC are stayed pending the filing of Plaintiffs' Motion for Preliminary Approval and thereafter Plaintiffs' Motion for Final Approval of the settlement. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/3/2025. (MMS)
GPO Feb 05 2025
The Court has set a case management conference for February 6, 2025, at 10:00 a.m. (Doc. 285.) The Court requests that the Parties, or a representative from Plaintiffs Leadership Counsel and Defendants Lead Counsel, submit today a short notice containing a list of any remaining outstanding areas of disagreement. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/5/2025. (SLL)
GPO Feb 06 2025
STIPULATED PROTECTIVE ORDER CONCERNING CONFIDENTIALITY. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 2/6/2025. (Attachments: # (1) Attachment A) (MMS)
GPO Feb 12 2025
CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-9). (MMS) Modified on 2/12/2025 to correct docket text of CTO 9 not 8 (MMS).
GPO Mar 04 2025
ORDER granting 354 Motion for an Extension of Time to File a Representative Complaint. The Plaintiff Leadership Committee and Co-Leads of the Financial Institution Spoke have up to and including April 7, 2025, to file the Representative Complaint. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 3/4/2025. (MMS)
GPO Mar 07 2025
ORDER CERTIFIED COPY OF CONDITIONAL TRANSFER ORDER (CTO-10). (MMS) (Main Document 359 replaced on 3/7/2025) (MMS). Modified on 3/7/2025 to reflect original CTO order did not have the MDL Certified Stamp, this updated order has both court's certified stamps (MMS).
GPO Mar 12 2025
ORDER. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 3/12/2025. (SLL)
GPO Apr 01 2025
CERTIFIED COPY OF TRANSFER ORDER (TO-Wright) re 261 Conditional Transfer Order. (MMS)
GPO Apr 15 2025
ORDER granting 396 Motion for Leave to File Overlength Brief. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 4/15/2025. (MMS)

Docket last updated: 3 hours ago
Friday, May 16, 2025
425 425 respm Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT Fri 05/16 10:27 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support re424 MOTION to Compel Arbitration filed by Lendingtree, LLC, QuoteWizard.com, LLC. (Werner, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Exhibit 1 -Declaration of Joel Peterson
424 424 motion Compel Fri 05/16 10:21 PM
MOTION to Compel Arbitration . Paul Anthony Werner, III appearing for MDL - Notice Only Lendingtree, LLC, QuoteWizard.com, LLC. (Werner, Paul)
Related: [-]
423 423 misc Lodged Sealed Document - MT Fri 05/16 10:15 PM
Lodged Sealed Document re:422 MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits to Their Forthcoming Motion to Compel Arbitration Under Seal filed by Lendingtree, LLC, QuoteWizard.com, LLC . (Werner, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit Non-Redacted Exhibit A,
Att: 2 Exhibit Non-Redacted Exhibit B,
Att: 3 Exhibit Non-Redacted Exhibit C,
Att: 4 Exhibit Non-Redacted Exhibit F,
Att: 5 Exhibit Non-Redacted Exhibit G,
Att: 6 Exhibit Non-Redacted Exhibit H
422 422 motion Leave to File Under Seal - SDM Fri 05/16 9:55 PM
MOTION for Leave to File Under Seal Certain Exhibits to Their Forthcoming Motion to Compel Arbitration Under Seal . Paul Anthony Werner, III appearing for MDL - Notice Only Lendingtree, LLC, QuoteWizard.com, LLC, Defendants Lendingtree, LLC, LendingTree, LLC, Lendingtree, LLC. Associated Cases: 2:24-md-03126-BMM-JTJ et al. (Werner, Paul)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order,
Att: 2 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit A,
Att: 3 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit B,
Att: 4 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit C,
Att: 5 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit F,
Att: 6 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit G,
Att: 7 Exhibit Redacted Exhibit H
421 421 respm Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT Fri 05/16 4:10 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support re420 MOTION Request for Judicial Notice and Incorporation by Reference ISO Snowflake Motion to Dismiss re417 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Representative Class Action Complaint ,417 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Representative Class Action Complaint filed by Snowflake, Inc.. (McClafferty, Brianne)
Related: [-]
420 420 motion Miscellaneous Relief Fri 05/16 4:05 PM
MOTION Request for Judicial Notice and Incorporation by Reference ISO Snowflake Motion to Dismiss re417 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Representative Class Action Complaint . Brianne C. McClafferty appearing for MDL - Notice Only Snowflake, Inc.. (McClafferty, Brianne)
Related: [-]
419 419 respm Affidavit in Support of Motion Fri 05/16 3:45 PM
AFFIDAVIT in Support re417 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Representative Class Action Complaint filed by Snowflake, Inc.. (McClafferty, Brianne)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1-Snowflake Shared Responsibility Model,
Att: 2 Exhibit 2-Security Addendum,
Att: 3 Exhibit 3-FTC Article,
Att: 4 Exhibit 4-Mandiant Report,
Att: 5 Exhibit 5-PCI Guidelines,
Att: 6 Exhibit 6-CIS Guide,
Att: 7 Exhibit 7-Vermont Letter,
Att: 8 Exhibit 8-QW Individual Breach Notices Redacted,
Att: 9 Exhibit 9-TM Breach Notices Redacted,
Att: 10 Exhibit 10-Notice to Snowflake,
Att: 11 Exhibit 11-CCPA Legislative History
418 418 respm Brief/Memorandum in Support - MT Fri 05/16 3:38 PM
Brief/Memorandum in Support re417 MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Representative Class Action Complaint filed by Snowflake, Inc.. (McClafferty, Brianne)
Related: [-]
417 417 motion Dismiss - SDM Fri 05/16 3:32 PM
MOTION to Dismiss Plaintiffs' Second Amended Representative Class Action Complaint . Brianne C. McClafferty appearing for MDL - Notice Only Snowflake, Inc.. (McClafferty, Brianne)
Related: [-]
Thursday, May 15, 2025
416 416 motion Miscellaneous Relief Thu 05/15 11:55 AM
MOTION Joint Status Report and Proposed schedule to govern resolution of threshold issues . Emma L. Mediak appearing for MDL - Notice Only Live Nation Entertainment, Inc., Ticketmaster, LLC. (Mediak, Emma)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order Proposed Order
415 415 motion Approve Settlement Agreement - MT Thu 05/15 10:26 AM
MOTION to Approve Settlement Agreement with Advance Auto Parts, Inc. and Advance Stores Company Incorporated . John C. Heenan appearing for MDL - Notice Only Jamillah Sherman. (Heenan, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Joint Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order
Tuesday, May 13, 2025
414 414 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages Tue 05/13 11:36 AM
ORDER granting411 Motion for Leave to File Excess Pages. Plaintiffs may file a brief in support of their Motion for Preliminary Approval of Class Action Settlement of up to 8,000 words in length. Signed by Judge Brian Morris on 5/13/2025. (MMS)
Related: [-]
utility Terminate Deadlines and Hearings Tue 05/13 8:04 AM
Terminate Deadlines as to404 Redaction rqst ddl 5/12/25. (ACC)
Related: [-]
Friday, May 09, 2025
413 413 motion Approve Settlement Agreement - MT Fri 05/09 10:12 AM
MOTION to Approve Settlement Agreement . John C. Heenan appearing for MDL - Notice Only Jamillah Sherman. (Heenan, John)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit A - Settlement Agreement,
Att: 2 Exhibit B - Joint Declaration,
Att: 3 Exhibit C - Proposed Order