Consolidated
Lead case: 2:24-cv-01876

Pennsylvania Eastern District Court
Judge:Nitza I Quinones Alejandr
Case #: 2:24-cv-05419
Nature of Suit380 Torts - Personal Property - Other Personal Property Damage
Cause28:1332(d)(5)(B) Diversity of Citizenship under CAFA
Case Filed:Oct 09, 2024
Last checked: Monday Apr 07, 2025 4:50 AM EDT
Defendant
ELAN FINANCIAL SERVICES
Represented By
JENNIFER A. RILEY
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
RYAN T. GARIPPO
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
GERALD L. MAATMAN, JR.
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
LYNNE E. EVANS
Duane Morris LLP
contact info
Defendant
FINANCIAL BUSINESS AND CONSUMER SOLUTIONS, INC.
Plaintiff
DAVID ULBRICH
Represented By
CHARLES E. SCHAFFER
Levin Sedran & Berman
contact info
Nicholas Elia
Levin Sedran & Berman
contact info
ANDREW FERICH
Ahdoot & Wolfson, PC
contact info


Docket last updated: 10 hours ago
Friday, April 11, 2025
24 24 respoth Response Fri 04/11 11:15 PM
Response in Opposition to Plaintiffs' Brief in Support of Consolidation by ELAN FINANCIAL SERVICES. (MAATMAN, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Gerald L. Maatman, Jr.
Thursday, March 20, 2025
23 23 2 pgs order Order Fri 03/21 9:21 AM
ORDER THAT PLAINTIFFS' MOTION TO STAY IS GRANTED. ACCORDINGLY ALL DEADLINES IN THIS CASE AND THE RELATED CASES ARE STAYED UNTIL THIS COURT RULES ON THE POTENTIAL CONSOLIDATION ISSUE OUTLINED IN THIS COURT'S ORDER DATED 2/27/25. THE CERK OF COURT IS DIRECTED TO FILE THIS ORDER IN ALL RELATED CASES. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 3/20/25.3/21/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(mbh)
Related: [-]
Friday, March 14, 2025
22 22 respoth Response Fri 03/14 9:35 PM
Response to Plaintiff's Motion to Stay Deadlines by ELAN FINANCIAL SERVICES. (MAATMAN, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Exhibit 1 - Declaration of Gerald L. Maatman, Jr.
Thursday, February 27, 2025
21 21 2 pgs order Order Fri 02/28 11:10 AM
ORDER THAT A RULE IS HEREBY ISSUED FOR THE PARTIES TO ADDRESS A POTENTIAL CONSOLIDATION ISSUE NOTED IN THE STATUS REPORT. INTERIM CLASS COUNSEL AND PLAINTIFFS SHOULD PURSUE ACTIONS AGAINST FBCS AND FBCS CUSTOMERS IN SEPARATE ACTION. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 2/27/25. 2/27/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (mbh)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, February 05, 2025
20 20 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Answer Thu 02/06 9:58 AM
ORDER OF 2/5/25 THAT DEFENDANT ELAN FINANCIAL SERVICES' UNOPPOSED MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO ANSWER AMENDED COMPLAINT (ECF 19) IS GRANTED. DEFENDANT ELAN FINANCIAL SERVICES SHALL FILE AN ANSWER OR OTHERWISE PLEAD TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT BY MARCH 31, 2025. SIGNED BY JUDGE: NITZA I. QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 2/5/25. 2/6/25 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED. (DT)
Related: [-]
19 19 motion Extension of Time to File Answer Wed 02/05 1:51 PM
MOTION for Extension of Time to File Answer Or Other Responsive Pleading (Unopposed) filed by ELAN FINANCIAL SERVICES.Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service.(MAATMAN, GERALD)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
Tuesday, February 04, 2025
18 18 service Waiver of Service Executed Tue 02/04 10:19 AM
WAIVER OF SERVICE Returned Executed by DAVID ULBRICH. (FERICH, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 29, 2025
17 17 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Wed 01/29 1:26 PM
ORDER THAT THE MOTION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE FOR ATTORNEY RYAN T. GARIPPO ELAN FINANCIAL SERVICES IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 1/29/2025. 1/29/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
16 16 service Summons Issued Wed 01/29 6:11 AM
Summons Issued as to FINANCIAL BUSINESS AND CONSUMER SOLUTIONS, INC.. (rf, ) Modified on 1/29/2025 (lisad, )
Related: [-]
Monday, January 27, 2025
15 15 cmp Amended Complaint Mon 01/27 9:36 AM
AMENDED COMPLAINT against ELAN FINANCIAL SERVICES, FINANCIAL BUSINESS AND CONSUMER SOLUTIONS, INC., filed by DAVID ULBRICH.(FERICH, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Friday, January 24, 2025
14 14 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Mon 01/27 9:20 AM
ORDER THAT ATTORNEY GERALD L. MAATMAN, JR'S APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE FOR ELAN FINANCIAL SERVICES IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 1/24/2025. 1/27/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
13 13 1 pgs order Order ~Util - Add and Terminate Attorneys Mon 01/27 9:13 AM
ORDER THAT ATTORNEY JENNIFER A. RILEY'S APPLICATION FOR ADMISSION PRO HAC VICE FOR ELAN FINANCIAL SERVICES IS GRANTED. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 1/24/2025. 1/27/2025 ENTERED AND COPIES E-MAILED.(sg)
Related: [-]
12 12 misc Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Fri 01/24 4:21 PM
APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Ryan T. Garippo by ELAN FINANCIAL SERVICES. ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-18027766.). (EVANS, LYNNE)
Related: [-]
11 11 misc Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Fri 01/24 4:14 PM
APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Jennifer A. Riley by ELAN FINANCIAL SERVICES. ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-18027729.). (EVANS, LYNNE)
Related: [-]
10 10 misc Application for Admission Pro Hac Vice (Credit Card Payment) Fri 01/24 4:10 PM
APPLICATION for Admission Pro Hac Vice of Gerald L. Maatman, Jr. by ELAN FINANCIAL SERVICES. ( Filing fee $ 75 receipt number APAEDC-18027676.). (EVANS, LYNNE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 23, 2025
9 9 1 pgs order Order on Motion for Extension of Time to Amend Thu 01/23 5:08 PM
ORDER THAT THE PARTIES' JOINT7 MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME TO FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT IS GRANTED. ACCORDINGLY, PLAINTIFF SHALL FILE AN AMENDED COMPLAINT BY 2/6/25. DEFENDANT SHALL ANSWER OR OTHERWISE RESPOND TO THE AMENDED COMPLAINT WITHIN FOURTEEN (14) DAYS OF ITS FILING. SIGNED BY DISTRICT JUDGE NITZA I QUINONES ALEJANDRO ON 1/23/25.1/23/25 ENTERED & E-MAILED.(fdc)
Related: [-]
utility Set Deadlines/Hearings Fri 01/24 9:08 AM
Per #9 : AMENDED PLEADINGS DUE BY 2/6/2025. (lisad, )
Related: [-]
Wednesday, January 22, 2025
8 8 discov Disclosure Statement Form 7.1 Wed 01/22 10:25 PM
Disclosure Statement Form pursuant to FRCP 7.1 including U.S. Bancorp with Certificate of Service by ELAN FINANCIAL SERVICES.(EVANS, LYNNE)
Related: [-]
7 7 motion Extension of Time to Amend Wed 01/22 10:20 PM
Joint MOTION for Extension of Time to Amend (to File Amended Complaint) filed by ELAN FINANCIAL SERVICES.Certificate of Counsel, Certificate of Service.(EVANS, LYNNE)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Text of Proposed Order
6 6 notice Notice of Appearance Wed 01/22 10:13 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by LYNNE E. EVANS on behalf of ELAN FINANCIAL SERVICES with Certificate of Service(EVANS, LYNNE)
Related: [-]
Thursday, January 09, 2025
5 5 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/09 3:45 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by Nicholas Elia on behalf of DAVID ULBRICH with Certificate of Service(Elia, Nicholas)
Related: [-]
4 4 notice Notice of Appearance Thu 01/09 2:49 PM
NOTICE of Appearance by CHARLES E. SCHAFFER on behalf of DAVID ULBRICH with Certificate of Service(SCHAFFER, CHARLES)
Related: [-]
Monday, January 06, 2025
3 3 service Summons Returned Executed Mon 01/06 10:05 AM
SUMMONS Returned Executed by DAVID ULBRICH re: Dominic Playle served Summons and Complaint upon ELAN FINANCIAL SERVICES. ELAN FINANCIAL SERVICES served on 1/2/2025, answer due 1/23/2025. (FERICH, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Thursday, October 10, 2024
2 2 service Summons Issued Thu 10/10 10:42 AM
Summons Issued as to ELAN FINANCIAL SERVICES. Forwarded To: Counsel on October 10, 2024. (dt)
Related: [-]
Wednesday, October 09, 2024
1 1 44 pgs cmp Complaint (Attorney) Wed 10/09 10:22 PM
COMPLAINT against ELAN FINANCIAL SERVICES ( Filing fee $ 405 receipt number APAEDC-17802166.), filed by DAVID ULBRICH.(FERICH, ANDREW)
Related: [-]
Att: 1 Civil Cover Sheet,
Att: 2 Designation Form